Alexander v. United States of America
Petitioner: Carl Alexander
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2007cv02103
Filed: December 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: M Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: M
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(6) [ECF No. 42 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 7/5/2017. (CBL)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movants Motion under Federal Civil Rules of Procedure Pursuant to Rule 60(d)(3) Requesting the Courts Pre-existing Power to Set Aside a Judgment for Fraud [ECF No. 37 ] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 7/18/12. (KJS)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) [doc. # 20 ] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 3/11/10. (KLH)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that Petitioner Carl Alexander's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody [doc. # 1 ] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 5/20/09. (KLH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Edward J. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?