Watler v. United States of America
Petitioner: Lyndon Edward Watler
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2008cv00727
Filed: May 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Jean C. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because movant cannot make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, the court will not issue a certficate of appealability. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/25/10. (CLA)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief 67 is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner is granted until March 12, 2010 to file his supplemental 28 USC 2255 brief. Response to Court due by 3/12/2010. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/11/10. (copy of order mailed to petitioner) (TRC)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Continue 28 U.S.C. §2255 in Abeyance 59 is GRANTED, in part. Petitioner is granted until February 26, 2010 to file his supplemental 28 U.S.C. §2255 brief. If Petitioner does not file his brief by February 26, 2010, the Court will rule on his Motion under 28 U.S.C. §2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody 1 based upon the briefing already provided. Response to Court due by 2/26/2010. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 1/5/10. (TRC)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 7 is DENIED, without prejudice, as moot. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 9/14/09. (TRC)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 ORDERED that Petitioner shall file his brief in support of his motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence by a person in federal custody no later than October 1, 2009. FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent shall fi le its response to Plaintiff's motion under 28 U.S.C.2255 to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence by a person in federal custody no later than November 2, 2009. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall file his reply brief in support of his motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence by a person in federal custody no later than November 13, 2009. ( Response to Court due by 10/1/2009.). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 8/31/09. (CEL)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER : ORDERED that Defendant must file its Response to Plaintiff's Motion under 28 U.S.C. §2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody (Doc. No. 1) no later than Friday, October 31, 2008. Failure to do so will result in the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's unopposed motion. Response to Court due by 10/31/2008.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 10/15/08. (CEL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watler v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lyndon Edward Watler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Dean R. Hoag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?