Ceramic Tile and Marble Masons' Union No. 18 of Missouri Pension Plan, et al v. Jones
Plaintiff: Local 18 B.A.C. Tile, Marble, Terrazzo, Setters & Finishers, Local 18 Industry Advancement Fund Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Union, Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Ceramic Tile and Marble Masons' Union No. 18 of Missouri Pension Plan, Tile Finishers Local Union No. 18, St. Louis, Missouri Pension Plan, Tile Layers Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Masonry Institute Fund and Bricklayers & Allied Craft Workers International Health Fund
Defendant: Robert Jones
Case Number: 4:2008cv00885
Filed: June 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for default judgment [# 24 ] against defendant Robert Jones, doing business as Franklin County Tile and Stone, is granted in part and denied in part.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 11/18/09. (KKS)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ( Show Cause Response due by 1/16/2009.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for an order to show cause [#14] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Robert Jones, doing business as Franklin County Tile and Stone , shall, no later than January 16, 2009, show cause, in writing, why he should not be held in contempt of court for failing to comply with the Courts October 9, 2008 order directing defendant to produce certain payroll related documents to plaintiffs . THE DEFENDANT IS ADVISED THAT HE SHOULD NOT IGNORE THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY RESULT IN A FINDING OF CONTEMPT AND THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to defendant at the following address: Robert Jones c/o Franklin County Tile 1139 4 Mile Road Washington, Missouri 63090. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 12/22/08. (KMS)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for a default order to compel an accounting [#11] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Robert Jones, doing business as Franklin County Tile and Stone, shall, not later than November 10, 2008, produce for inspection by plaintiffs, or plaintiffs designated accountant, all payroll registers and other documents reflecting or pertaining to all hours worked by, and wages paid to, employees of Franklin County Tile & Stone, from May 1, 2007 to the present.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 10/9/08. (KMS)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for defaultjudgment 8 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for attorney fees 7 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for a bill of costs 9 is denied.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 9/15/08. (KKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceramic Tile and Marble Masons' Union No. 18 of Missouri Pension Plan, et al v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 18 B.A.C. Tile, Marble, Terrazzo, Setters & Finishers
Represented By: Patrick K. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 18 Industry Advancement Fund Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Union
Represented By: Rhona S. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Rhona S. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceramic Tile and Marble Masons' Union No. 18 of Missouri Pension Plan
Represented By: Patrick K. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tile Finishers Local Union No. 18, St. Louis, Missouri Pension Plan
Represented By: Patrick K. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tile Layers Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Patrick K. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Masonry Institute Fund
Represented By: Rhona S. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Allied Craft Workers International Health Fund
Represented By: Patrick K. Shinners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?