Van Gent v. Saint Louis Country Club et al
Plaintiff: Hubert Van Gent
Defendant: Saint Louis Country Club, James M. Snowden, Jr., Kelly B. Sullivan, A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., Wachovia Securities, LLC and William S. Simpson, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2008cv00959
Filed: July 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Frederick R Buckles
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion For SummaryJudgment Docket No. 143 is granted as provided herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick R. Buckles on 11/27/2013. (RAK)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion To Dismiss Count IXof Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (Docket No. 81) is granted as provided herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count IX of Plaintiffs SecondAmended Complaint is dismissed pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.granting 81 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick R. Buckles on 10/12/11. (JWJ)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts III - VII of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 26) is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss Count s III through VI of plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss Count VII is DENIED to the extent that, while Count VII is preempted by ERISA, the claims asserted therein are not subject to dismissal, inasmuch as they may state a claim under ERISA that is plausible on its face. Granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick R. Buckles on 9/29/2009. (NCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Gent v. Saint Louis Country Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Van Gent
Represented By: Jerald A. Hochsztein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Louis Country Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Snowden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly B. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?