Horn et al v. St. Louis County
Plaintiff: Robert D. Horn and Marion Horn
Defendant: St. Louis County
Case Number: 4:2008cv01033
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Terry I. Adelman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Eric Austermann, Joseph Brandt, Kenneth Cox, Colin Foppe, Haefeli, Timothy Harrison, Jeffery Hoots, Joshua Lawrence, Christopher Most, Jason Nueman, William Ostendorf, Charlie Rodriguez, and Robert Shelvy's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 167 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Docket No. 132 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 4/15/15. (KKS)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant St. Louis Countys Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 163) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 3/5/2015. (KMS)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Robert Reinhold's Motion to Withdraw. (Docket No. 143 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 01/09/2013; (DJO)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs counsel shall state, in writing, the specific nature of the conflict, along with a showing of good cause for the apparent untimeliness of the motion to withdraw within seven days of this Or der. If requested information is privileged, counsel may file the brief under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall submit an affidavit from Plaintiffs wherein Plaintiffs aver that they consent to counsels withdrawing his representation and that they are aware of the fast-approaching jury trial date of April 15, 2012 in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 1/2/2013. (KMS)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Sever Case of Robert Horn from the Case of Marion Horn and Extend Time (Docket No. 87) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a jo int proposed Amended Case Management Order and a Status Report relating to the pending State court action no laterthan April 1, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a pleading setting forth the caption and the cause number of the pending State court action and a Status Report of the case no later than February 12, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 2/5/2010. (KMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn et al v. St. Louis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Horn
Represented By: Robert J. Reinhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Horn
Represented By: Robert J. Reinhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?