Froelker v. Franklin County et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Froelker
Defendant: Franklin County, Gary Toelke, John Doe #1, John Doe #2 and Bruce Gerard
Case Number: 4:2008cv01685
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann L. Medler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -........IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. re: 31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Froelker. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 8/11/2009. (MRC)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff is granted until August 10, 2009 to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended complaint is timely filed, the Court will dismiss plaintiffs claims against defendants John Doe #1 and John Doe #2 without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 7/8/09. (KJF, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Franklin County, Gary Toelke and Bruce Gerard shall file a Memorandum stating (1) the names of the two individuals sued in this matter as John Doe #1 and John Doe #2, and (2) whether they are still employed by Franklin County, Missouri, by July 15, 2009. Response to Court due by 7/15/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 6/30/2009. (NCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Froelker v. Franklin County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Froelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Toelke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Gerard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?