Golub & Associates, Inc. v. Long et al.

Plaintiff: Golub & Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Dan Long, Kirk Freels, Gateway Public Adjusters and Anna Pfalzgraf
Case Number: 4:2009cv00092
Filed: January 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Jean C. Hamilton
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending mtns. are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within 60 days from the date of this order, a stipulation for dismissal, a mtn. for leave to voluntary dismiss, or a proposed consent jgm. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 5/25/2010. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 3/25/10. (CLA)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pltff.'s mtn. to dismiss defts.' counterclaim is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pltff.'s mtn. for a more definite statement is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pltff. is granted until Thursday, 7/23/09, within which to file its answer to defts.' counterclaim. 24 ( Response to Court due by 7/23/2009.) Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 7/9/09. (CLA)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' various Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 3 6 8 10 are DENIED. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 3/11/09. (TRC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golub & Associates, Inc. v. Long et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Freels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Public Adjusters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Pfalzgraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golub & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence P. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?