St. Charles Tower, Inc. v. County of Franklin, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: St. Charles Tower, Inc.
Defendant: County of Franklin, Missouri and Franklin County Board of Zoning Adjustment
Case Number: 4:2009cv00987
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Donald J. Stohr
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:332 Federal Telecommunications Act of 1996
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that intervenors motion for relief from the order granting the joint motion for consent judgment [Doc. # 22 ] is denied. Signed by Honorable Donald J. Stohr on 5/21/10. (KJF)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that potential intervenors Lawrence Kettenbach, Jr. and Mary A. Kettenbach's ("Kettenbachs") motion to join the motion of the Trustees [Doc. #25] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that potential intervenors R obert Kurtz, Paul Phillips, David Geile, Lawrence Kettenbach, Jr., and Mary A. Kettenbach's motion to intervene and motion for relief from judgment [Doc. #22] is granted, in part, as follows. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent Robert Kurtz , Paul Phillips, David Geile, Lawrence Kettenbach, Jr., and Mary A. Kettenbach seek to intervene as a matter of right, such is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenors' motion for relief from judgment shall be further briefed by the parti es, as follows. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenors shall file a memorandum in support of their motion for relief from judgment on or before March 12, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SCT, the County, and the BZA may file a memorandum stating a po sition on Intervenors' memorandum on or before March 26, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenors may file a reply memorandum on or before April 2, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SCT's motion to consolidate [Doc. #27] is denied without prejudice to refiling in the event the consent judgment is vacated. (Response to Court due by 3/26/2010.) Signed by Honorable Donald J. Stohr on 2/25/2010. (NCL)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to intervene [Doc. #16] of Robert Kurtz, Paul Phillips and David Geile, as Trustees of the Babler Forest Subdivision, is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the joint motion [Doc. #17] of plaintiff St. Charle s Tower, Inc. and defendants County of Franklin, Missouri and Franklin County Board of Zoning Adjustment is granted, and the parties' proposed consent judgment is separately entered herein this day. Signed by Honorable Donald J. Stohr on 11/17/2009. (NCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Charles Tower, Inc. v. County of Franklin, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Charles Tower, Inc.
Represented By: Jill A. Lens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Franklin, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Board of Zoning Adjustment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?