Gray v. Dormire
Petitioner: Kenneth Gray
Respondent: David Dormire
Case Number: 4:2009cv01355
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Terry I. Adelman
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis Doc. 38 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for certificate of appealability Doc. 40 is GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court hereby issues a certificate of appealability on grounds one and two of the petition. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/16/12. (ARL)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Writ for Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is DENIED. Doc. 1 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. A separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/19/12. (ARL)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Petitioner Kenneth Grays motion for leave to file a second citation of supplemental authority in support of his petition for a writ of habeas corpus (Doc. 34) is granted. Petitioner's arguments will be incorporated with his original petition for a writ of habeas corpus for the Court's consideration. 34 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 4/9/12. (CLA)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER The Court, having been advised that Jeff Norman is now the Warden at Jefferson City Correctional Center in Jefferson City, Missouri, the facility in which Petitioner is incarcerated, hereby orders the Clerk of the Court to substitute Jeff Norman for David Dormire as the Respondent to this action. See Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 25(d); Rule 12 of Rules Governing § 2254 Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A Baker on 1/12/12. (CLA)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 30 29 28 ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. [Doc. 28]. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's First Motion for an Order Directing Respondent to Serve Petitioner with a Copy of Respondent s' Response to Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and Motion to Appoint Counsel, or in the alternative, that the Court send Petitioner a copy of the response should be DENIED as moot. [Doc. 29]. FURTHER ORDERED Petitioner's Se cond Motion for an Order Directing Respondent to Serve Petitioner with a Copy of Respondents' Response to Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and Motion to Appoint Counsel, or in the alternative, that the Court send Petitioner a cop y of the response should be DENIED as moot. [Doc. 30]. FURTHER ORDERED that an Amended Memorandum and Order will issuecontemporaneously with this Order amending the Court's September 26, 2011 Order as discussed on page three (3) of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A Baker on 12/8/11. (CEL)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing is DENIED. [Doc. 26]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. [Doc. 26] 26 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A Baker on 9/26/11. (CLA)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery (Docket No. 8) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 2/17/10. (KXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Dormire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Dormire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?