Monsanto Company et al v. Hargrove et al
Plaintiff: Monsanto Company and Monsanto Technology LLC
Defendant: Brent M. Hargrove and H & H Farms
Case Number: 4:2009cv01628
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion for Revival of Judgment. Doc. 63 . The Court will enter a separate Revival of Judgment. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/2/2021. (CLO)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees [Doc. # 59 ] is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall pay to the plaintiffs attorneys fees in the amount of $96,239.81 and costs in the amount of $6,295.39. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/24/12. (KJS)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion by plaintiffs for default judgment [Doc. #54] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall, not later than November 28, 2011, submit a statement of attorneys' fees and costs, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d). A separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will be entered this same date. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 11/7/11. (KXS)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for additional sanctions [Doc. # 48 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' answer [Doc. # 11 ] is stricken. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall, not la ter than February 1, 2011, submit such affidavits and documentation necessary for entering judgment against defendants Brent Hargrove and H & Farms. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the defendants as follows: Brent M. Hargrove and H & H Farms 701 Avenue Q Anso, Texas 79501 (copy mailed); Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 01/11/11;(DJO)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for sanctions [Doc. # 33 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall have until June 1, 2010, to produce all documents responsive to plaintiffs' requests for p roduction in compliance with the order entered on March 23, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall have until June 15, 2010, to submit a verified statement of attorney's fees and expenses incurred in preparing the motion for sanctions . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall have until June 22, 2010, to file objections to the plaintiffs' verified statement. The defendants and their counsel are warned that additional sanctions will be imposed if they continue to disobey the Court's orders. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 05/12/2010; (DJO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monsanto Company et al v. Hargrove et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monsanto Technology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent M. Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & H Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?