v. Pan
Plaintiff: Hart A. Richard
Defendant: Yi Pan
Case Number: 4:2009cv01946
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall tax costs of this matter in favor of defendant United States of America in the amount of Three Thousand Four Hundred Ninety-Three Dollars and Twenty-One Cents ($3,493.21) [Doc. 107] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/15/2012. (KSM)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Richard Harts claims against defendant United States of America are DISMISSED. An appropriate judgment will accompany these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/19/2012. (KSM)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant United States of Americas motion to strike plaintiffs jury demand is GRANTED. [Doc. 69] granting 69 Motion to Strike Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 11/2/11. (JWJ)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Allergan USA, Inc.'s Motion For a Name Change is DENIED. re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Allergan, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 12/6/2010. (MRC)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Tenet HealthSystem SL, Inc.s motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and Defendant Tenet HealthSystem SL, Inc.s motion, in the alternative, for a more definite statement is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 7 ] Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 7/8/10. (KJF)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Richard A. Hart's motion to remand is DENIED.[Doc. 13] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Richard A. Hart's motion to stay all motions until the Court rules on t he motion to remand is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 17] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Yi Pan,M.D's motions to dismiss and for substitution of the United States of America as Defendant are GRANTED. [Docs. 3 and 8] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Yi Pan M.D.'s motion to dismiss for plaintiff's failure to file an affidavit is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 29] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall substitute the United States of America for defendant Y i Pan, M.D., and the caption of the case shall be Richard A. Hart v. United States of Americaa, Tenet Healthsystem SL, Inc. d/b/a St. Louis University Hospital, and Allergan USA Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant United States of America shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 5/17/2010. (MRC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yi Pan
Represented By: Christine A. Vaporean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hart A. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?