Geismann v. Byram Healthcare Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Radha Geismann
Defendant: Byram Healthcare Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv01980
Filed: December 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Donald J. Stohr
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 47:0227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that defendant may pursue discovery of the matters at issue in the motion by way of written response to interrogatories of Geismann and Middleton. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is denied in all other respects at this time. 55 Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/12/12. (CLA)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 40 49 ORDERED that Defendant Byram file a memorandum in writing, within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, outlining its position regarding Defendant Geismanns newly proposed stipulations offered in Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery [Doc. #48 at 3]. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will refrain from ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Discovery [Doc. #40] until it has reviewed Defendan t Geismann's memorandum regarding Defendant Byram's proposed stipulations. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order [Doc. #49] is DENIED, at this time, without prejudice.. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 6/22/11. (CEL)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 7/27/10. (CLA)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 13 ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 13], is denied.. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 5/10/10. (CEL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geismann v. Byram Healthcare Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radha Geismann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byram Healthcare Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Darci F. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?