Akers v. RSC Equipment Rental, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Akers
Defendant: RSC Equipment Rental, Inc., Bret Kasubke and Tony Toman
Case Number: 4:2009cv02022
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER 42 MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice - Stipulated filed by Edward Akers ; SO ORDERED HEA. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 6/29/11. (CLA)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the April 4, 2012 trial setting is vacated and all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED counsel shall file within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order a stipulation for dismissal, a moti on for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 7/2/2011. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 6/2/11. (CLA)
December 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,[Doc. No. 20 ], is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 12/31/10. (TRC)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 6], is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendants Kasubke and Toman, [Doc. No. 8], is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a motion to amend within 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order for the Courts consideration. (See Order for further details.) (Response to Court due by 7/26/2010.) Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 7/12/2010. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akers v. RSC Equipment Rental, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSC Equipment Rental, Inc.
Represented By: Scott J. Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Kasubke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Toman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?