Washington v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Jeremiah R. Washington
Defendant: Unknown Doe, Lynn G. Calcote, Unknown Phillips, Unknown O'Neil, B. Hoskins, Unknown Wade, Unknown Novak, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4 and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2009cv02070
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Jean C. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Jury Trial set for 7/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10N before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. Pretrial Compliance due by 6/13/2012. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/27/12. (CLA)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 79 MOTION to Depose parties filed by Jeremiah R. Washington is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED 78 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Jeremiah R. Washington is denied without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/20/11. (CLA) Copy mailed to petitioner.
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 63 , 59 ORDERED that plaintiff's motions relating to the substitution of three of the John Doe defendants [Doc. #59 and #63] are GRANTED insofar as the Court will substitute Unknown Irby, Terry Atchison and Sergeant Dav id Novak for John Does 1-2 and John Doe Sergeant, respectively. TheClerk of the Court shall modify the docket in accordance with this request. ORDERED that due to plaintiff's pauper status, and in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Clerk of Co urt shall effectuate service on Unknown Irby, Terry Atchison and David Novak, correctional officers employed by the State of Missouri, as outlined in the waiver agreement between this Court andthe Office of the Missouri Attorney General. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/15/11. (CEL)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to amend his complaint by interlineation [Doc. #41] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time to respond to some unnamed deadline [Doc. #42 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #43] is DENIED, without prejudice, at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide to plaintiff, along with a copy of this Order, a b lank complaint form for the filing of a civil rights complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions set forth above, no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to timely file an amended complaint or fails to comply with the instructions set forth above relating to the filingof the amended complaint, the Court shall dismiss this action without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that upon the filing of the amended complaint,it will be subject to review under 28 U.S.C. § 1915. 43 42 41 ( Response to Court due by 11/1/2010.) Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 10/1/10. cc: copy of complaint mailed to pltff.(CLA)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Bryan Hoskins Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 10) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for States Provision of Funding for Access to Courts (Doc. No. 17) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Extension of Time (Doc. No. 19) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion Ordering Defendants Attorney to Provide the Court with the Current Contact Information on Defendants John Does 1-4 and John DoeSergeant (Doc. No. 21) is DENIED without prejudice. 10 19 21 17 Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/17/10. (CLA)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1915(e)(2)(B): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, as to defendants Unknown Doe, Lynn Calcote, Unknown Phillips, Unknown ONeil, Unknown Wade, Unknown Novak, Jane Doe, and John Doe (Lieutenant), plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/12/10. (TRC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah R. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn G. Calcote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?