Webb v. Steele
Petitioner: Kenneth Webb
Respondent: Troy Steele
Case Number: 4:2010cv00758
Filed: April 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 20 Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Final Judgment under Rule 60(b)(1). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/25/15. (CAR)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Adelmans Report and Recommendation filed on August 28, 2013 is adopted and sustained in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Kenneth Webbs Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/21/14. (JWJ)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Adelman's Report and Recommendation filed on August 28, 2013 is adopted and sustained in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Kenneth Webb's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/18/13. (LGK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy Steele
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?