Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Lake Asphalt Paving & Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Lake Asphalt Paving & Construction, LLC, Gaines Construction, Inc., Gaines Leasing & Investment, LLC, DGN, Inc., William Gaines, Patricia Gaines, Keith A. Denney, Jeannie M. Denney, Michael L. Rogers, Sandra Rogers, Harold E. Neumann and Donald G. Mantle
Case Number: 4:2010cv01160
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Americas Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I for Indemnity Against Defendants is GRANTED. [Doc. 111] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counter claimant McAninch Corporat ion shall file a memorandum with the Court by March 5, 2012, notifying the Court whether it will proceed to trial on April 2, 2012 with its counterclaim for breach of contract against counterclaim defendant Lake Asphalt Paving & Construction, LLC. An appropriate partial judgment will accompany this memorandum and order. re: 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I for Indemnity Against Defendants Lake Asphalt Paving & construction, LLC, Gaines Construction, Inc., Gaines Leasing & Investment, LLC, DGN, Inc., William Gaines, Patricia Gaines, Keith A. Denney, Jeannie M. e filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of America Response to Court due by 3/5/2012. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 2/28/12. (JWJ)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 JUDGMENT (Partial) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED in favor of third-party defendant McAninch Corporation and against third-party plaintiffs Lake Asphalt Paving & Construction, LLC, Gaines Construction, Inc., Gaines Leasing & Inves tment, LLC, DGN, Inc., William Gaines, Patricia Gaines, Keith A. Denney, Jeannie M. Denney, Michael L. Rogers, Sandra Rogers, and Harold E. Neumann on remaining Counts I and III of the third-party complaint Keith A. Denney, Patricia Gaines, William G aines, Gaines Construction, Inc., Gaines Leasing & Investment, LLC, Lake Asphalt Paving & Construction, LLC, McAninch Corporation, Harold E. Neumann, Michael L. Rogers, Sandra Rogers, DGN, Inc. and Jeannie M. Denney terminated.. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 1/25/2012. (KSM)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of America's motion for default judgment against defendant Donald G. Mantle is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 75] Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 8/5/2011. (NCL)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion for reconsideration of the Courts denial of defendants motion for extension of time in which to answer plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment on Count IV is DENIED. [Doc. 57]IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall respond to plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment by February 11, 2011. re: 57 MOTION for Reconsideration re 56 Memorandum & Order, MOTION for Reconsideration re 56 Memorandum & Order, filed by De fendant Patricia Gaines, Defendant Michael L. Rogers, Defendant Sandra Rogers, Defendant DGN, Inc., Defendant Jeannie M. Denney, Defendant William Gaines, Defendant Gaines Leasing & Investment, LLC, Defendant Keith A. Denney, Defendant Lake Asphalt Paving & Construction, LLC, Defendant Gaines Construction, Inc., Defendant Harold E. Neumann. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 1/27/11. (JWJ)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for extension of time in which to answer plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment on Count IV is DENIED. [Doc. 55] Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 12/10/2010. (NCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Lake Asphalt Paving & Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Carol Z. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Asphalt Paving & Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaines Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaines Leasing & Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGN, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A. Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie M. Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold E. Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald G. Mantle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?