Stanley v. Cottrell, Inc.
Plaintiff: Luther Stanley
Defendant: Cottrell, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv01505
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Bill of Costs is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall tax costs in favor of Defendant in the amount of $11,171.92.1 216 Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 2/10/14. (CLA)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - {see Order for complete details}... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 20], is denied.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 2/7/2013. (MRC)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Defendants Motion in Limine to Limit or Exclude Other Incidents, [Doc. No. 136]. The Motion is granted except to the extent that if the incident has a factual similarity in nextus between the incident to support notice. Post inci dent occurrences will be allowed for the purpose of notice, but will be limited in time and number.Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Punitive Damages, [Doc. No. 137] is denied; Defendants alternative motion to bifurcate is granted. Defendants Co nsolidated Motions in Limine, [Doc. No. 138]: The parties are to discuss the issues raised in this motion and advise the Court of any remaining matters at issue. Defendants Motion in Limine to Bar Reference to Various Litigation Reports, [Doc. No. 13 9]: This matter will be taken with the case. If the Litigation Reports are allowed, they will be admitted in a very limited fashion. Plaintiffs Motion in Limine, [Doc. No. 140]: The parties have agreed to the following items: 1, 6, 15, 17, and 19. It em 2: grantedItem 3: Defendant is prohibited from presenting evidence or arguing Plaintiffs weight, girth, or size. Item 4: agreed by the parties. Item 5: Granted to the extent that Defendant attempts to use medical evidence that is not relevant or o therwise related to the injury sustained by Plaintiff. Item 7: Granted Item 8: Granted except to the extent of warnings, etc. provided to Plaintiff. Item 9: Granted except to consumption of alcohol by Plaintiff on or contemporaneously with the occurr ence of the injury. Item 10: Granted. Item 11: To be taken with the case at trial. Item 12: Granted.Item 13: Denied. Item 14: Denied. Item 16: Granted, subject to appropriate evidence at trial Item 18: Granted. Item 20: Agreed by the parties. Item 21: Denied. Item 22: Moot. Item 23: Moot, in light of the Ruling on item 21. 140 136 138 137 139 Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 2/6/13. (CLA)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 29 Amended MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Cottrell, Inc. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 10/18/11. (CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Cottrell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottrell, Inc.
Represented By: Amy J. Lorenz-Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?