Howard v. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Derrick Howard
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv02368
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Strike the Second Motion for Reconsideration, [Doc. No. 175], is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration, [Doc. No. 174], is stricken from the docket in this matter. 174 175 174 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/4/16. (CLA)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration [Doc. No. 158] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Courts March 17, 2015 Opinion, Memorandum and Order [Doc. No. 145] is VACATED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Opinion, Memorandum and Order SUPERSEDES the Courts March 17, 2015 Opinion, Memorandum and Order. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order was entered on March 17, 2015. 158 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/24/15. (CLA)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court finds that Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration [Doc. No. 149] raises a substantial issue. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/6/15. (CLA)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $6.80 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, an d to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an appellate proceeding. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 5/20/2015. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/20/15. (CLA)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 80 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce Subpoenas [Doc. No. 135 ] is DENIED. Plaintiff attached a letter to the Court from the correctional counselor confirming the veracity of these events. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/17/15. (KJS)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 80 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 80], is GRANTED. A separate judgment will be entered upon the conclusion of all pending issues herein.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 7/22/13. (CEL)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Court to Enter Scheduling Order and Motion for Appointment of Counsel [ECFNo. 48 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 08/14/2012. (CLK)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION, MEMORANDUM, AND ORDER re: 26 MOTION to Clarify 14 Order, 7 Opinion Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Derrick Howard: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion requesting clarification of order for payment of filing fees plaintiff's motion requesting clarification of order for payment of filing fees [doc. # 26 ] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 5/19/11. (TRC)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #1] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $16.67 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an origin al proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants shall reply to plaintiffs claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. (Response to Court due by 1/21/2011.) Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 12/22/2010. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Shawn T. Briner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?