A. et al v. Doe Run Resources Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kate Reid, Megan Heeney, A. O. A., M. C. A., Y. C. A., A. C. C., D. R. G., J. R. G., S. A. L., J. P.Q. M. and B. Q. M.
Defendant: Doe Run Resources Corporation, D.R. Acquisition Corp., Marvin K. Kaiser, Albert Bruce Neil, Jeffrey L. Zelms, Theodore P. Fox, III, Daniel L. Vornberg, The Renco Group, Inc., Renco Holdings, Inc. and Ira L. Rennert
Case Number: 4:2011cv00044
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2018 918 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 54(b) 914 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitat ion 915 is GRANTED. As the defendants' objections to the amount of plaintiffs' fee request remain under submission, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs must file any response to these objections no later than August 13, 2018. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/13/2018. (CBL)
March 12, 2018 837 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order for Complete Details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for sanctions 790 is granted in part as stated above. Defendants must pay plaintiffs' reasonable attorney's fees associated with the bringing of this motion for sanctions and incurred in the investigation of defendants non-compliance. Plaintiffs shall file their fee statement within thirty days of the date of this Order and defendants will have thirty days thereafter to fil e objections or to file a statement that they have paid the requested fee amount. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants must continue to attempt to restore and recover the materials on the back-up tapes, and produce all additional responsive evid ence. If the plaintiffs request access to the back-up tapes, defendants will make the tapes available for plaintiffs' review. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that defendants must forthwith produce to plaintiffs any complete or partial index to the boxes in the Earth City warehouse which they possess, and must make these boxes available for plaintiffs' inspection and review. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/12/18. (EAB)
February 6, 2018 805 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF SPECIAL MASTER. Presently before me are the Report and Recommendations of the Special Master. I will adopt and sustain all findings as set forth by the Special Master. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED t hat the Report and Recommendations of Special Master, filed January 8, 2018 767 ; the Report and Recommendations for Documents Submitted by Doe Run Resources Corporation by Special Master, filed January 9, 2018 768 ; the Report and Recommendations of Special Master, filed January 19, 2018 779 ; the Re-Review of Previously Reviewed Documents by Special Master at Plaintiffs' Request, filed January 23, 2018 781 ; Special Master Re-Review of Doe Run Resources Corporations In Camera Submi ssions to Special Master, filed January 23, 2018 782 ; and the Special Master Re-Review of Renco Group's In Camera Submission to Special Master, filed January 23, 2018 783 are SUSTAINED and ADOPTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/6/2018. (CBL)
December 8, 2017 749 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of 30(b)(6) Witnesses on Financial Topics 732 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (SEE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on December 8, 2017. (MCB)
November 15, 2017 721 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Renco defendants' Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 54(b) 662 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/15/17. (EAB)
October 30, 2017 713 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - (See Memorandum and Order for complete details.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal Documents 668 is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall UNSEAL t he following exhibits submitted with Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF 640) (see Order for details.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs are granted leave to SUBSTITUTE redacted versions of Exhibits OO (ECF 6 40-43), RR (ECF 640-46), and ZZ (ECF 640-54) and shall separately file the redacted versions in the public record no later than November 1, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall UNSEAL the following exhibits submitted with Plain tiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Sixth Request for Production of Documents (ECF 627): (See Order for details.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs are granted leave to SUBSTITUTE the redac ted version of Exhibit 13 (ECF 627-13) and shall separately file the redacted version in the public record no later than November 1, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than November 10, 2017, defendants shall: (See Order for details.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than November 17, 2017, plaintiffs shall file in the public record redacted versions of their Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Sixth Request for Production of Documents. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on October 30, 2017. (MCB)
October 26, 2017 704 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than Wednesday, November 1, 2017, each side will propose to one another the names of two candidates for Special Master. These proposals shall not be filed with the Court at that time. No later than Monday, November 6, 2017, the parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court either: 1) the name of their agreed-to candidate; or 2) in the event the parties are unable to agree to a candidate, the names and quali fications of the candidates proposed by each side. This submission shall include an explanation of the parties' efforts to agree to a candidate, each side's respective position regarding the suitability of their proposed candidates, and a statement regarding the availability and willingness of their proposed candidates to preside over the dispute. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/26/2017. (CBL)
August 29, 2017 636 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Sixth Request for Production of Documents 601 is GRANTED with the included limited exception. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, defendants must: 1) produce all documents requested in plaintiffs' motion to compel, with the only exception being possible limited production to Requests 9(d), 9(e), 12, and 13, as deter mined after counsel meet and confer regarding narrowing the scope of such production; and 2) supplement their production in response to Request 42 of plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents, including providing the certification requested by plaintiffs in their motion to compel. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/29/2017. (CBL)
July 5, 2017 593 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in each Member Case listed above, the Clerk of Court shall file and docket the Amended Complaint that is filed and docketed in the Lead Case at ECF #474. The docket entry in each Member Case shall reflect a file date of February 21, 2017, for the Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, upon docketing the Amended Complaint in each Member Case, the Clerk of Court shall administratively close that Member Case, subject to being reopened upon motion filed in the Lead Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in each of the Member Cases listed above. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/5/2017. (CBL)
March 28, 2016 389 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Consolidation 374 , filed on behalf of the Collins cases, is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this Memorandum and Order in the followin g cases: 4:15CV1704 RWS, J.Y.C.C., et al., v. Doe Run Res. Corp., et al.; 4:16CV59 JAR, L.B.H., et al., v. Doe Run Res. Corp., et al.; 4:16CV60 RLW, K.A.C.P., et al., v. Doe Run Res. Corp., et al.; and 4:16CV61 JAR, A.S.S.M., et al., v. Doe Run Res. Corp., et al. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/28/16. (EAB)
June 22, 2015 308 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for partial reconsideration [# 291 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 6/22/15. (EAB)
February 11, 2015 284 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for a determination of foreign law 148 is granted in part and denied in part. Mo. Rev. Stat. § 516.190, the state borrowing statute, does not apply and so Missouri' s statute of limitations applies to the plaintiffs claims. The court declines to make a choice-of-law determination at this time, but without prejudice to any party's right to move for such a ruling after more discovery has been completed. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/11/15. (EAB)
June 16, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (read order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to strike, or in the alternative, to stay [# 159 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion for clarification of case management order and for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to strike or stay [# 164 ] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 06/16/2014. (CBL)
April 7, 2014 190 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel [# 145 ] is granted to the extent that defendants may not refuse to produce Doe Run Peru documents on the basis that they are not in defendants' control. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on April 7, 2014. (BRP)
January 16, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to consolidate [#75] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following cases are consolidated for all pretrial purposes: 4:11CV44 CDP, 4:11CV45 CDP, 4:11CV46 CDP, 4:11CV47 CD P, 4:11CV48 CDP, 4:11CV49 CDP, 4:11CV50 CDP, 4:11CV52 CDP, 4:11CV55 CDP, 4:11CV56 CDP, 4:11CV59 CDP, 4:12CV1342 TCM, 4:12CV1345 AGF, 4:12CV1348 CDP, 4:12CV1352 ERW, 4:12CV1568 HEA, and 4:12CV2104 SNLJ. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that until further order from this court, all future documents in this matter shall be filed only in 4:11CV44 CDP. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on January 16, 2013. (MCB)
March 14, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to stay proceedings pending appeal [# 69 ] is GRANTED. (Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on March 14, 2012.) Associated Cases: 4:11-cv-00044-CDP et al.(BRP)
December 7, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to stay proceedings pending arbitration [# 56 ] is DENIED. These cases will be set for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by separate order. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 12/7/11. (KJS)
June 22, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Separate Orders consistent with this Memorandum and Opinion will be entered this same date. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 6/22/2011. (CBL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. et al v. Doe Run Resources Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Reid
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Heeney
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. O. A.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. C. A.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. C. A.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C. C.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. R. G.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. R. G.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. A. L.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. P.Q. M.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. Q. M.
Represented By: Kristine K. Kraft
Represented By: Elizabeth Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Run Resources Corporation
Represented By: Richard A. Ahrens
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James E. Crowe, III
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence J. O'Toole
Represented By: Theodore J. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin K. Kaiser
Represented By: Richard A. Ahrens
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Bruce Neil
Represented By: Richard A. Ahrens
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Zelms
Represented By: Richard A. Ahrens
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore P. Fox, III
Represented By: Richard A. Ahrens
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel L. Vornberg
Represented By: Richard A. Ahrens
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Renco Group, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James E. Crowe, III
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence J. O'Toole
Represented By: Theodore J. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renco Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James E. Crowe, III
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence J. O'Toole
Represented By: Theodore J. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira L. Rennert
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James E. Crowe, III
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence J. O'Toole
Represented By: Theodore J. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?