2302 N. Truman Entertainment Mgmt., LLC, v. City of Pevely, Missouri, et al
Plaintiff: 2302 N. Truman Entertainment Mgmt., LLC
Defendant: Happy Welch, City of Pevely, Missouri and John Knobloch
Case Number: 4:2011cv00171
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER--HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent shall issue Complainant it's business license applied for in November of 2010, allow Respondent to obtain building permits to complete build out of its store's interior and open and operate the entire store, connect water and sewer service to Respondent's 8600 Daniel Dunklin Drive facility, issue permit for signage comparable to other businesses in the area, and to dismiss at its costs all citations issued to Complainan t for operating without a business and/or sign license. FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent is enjoined from furtherprosecution of Complainant based upon its operation of business to date orotherwise based upon Ordinance #1244 FURTHER ORDERED that Respon dents Complaint for Injunction is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a new Joint Scheduling Plan with regard to Complainant's prayers for attorney's fees and damages within the next 30 days. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/21/2013. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 12/21/12. (CLK)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the City of Pevelys Motion to Remand, Doc. No. 15], is DENIED. 15 Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/27/12. (CLA)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION, MEMORANDUM, AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, [Doc. No. 8 ], is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall schedule a hearing onPlaintiff's application for a merchant's license before December 31, 2011. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 12/2/11. (TRC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2302 N. Truman Entertainment Mgmt., LLC, v. City of Pevely, Missouri, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Happy Welch
Represented By: David M. Korum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pevely, Missouri
Represented By: David M. Korum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Knobloch
Represented By: David M. Korum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2302 N. Truman Entertainment Mgmt., LLC
Represented By: Luke Charles Lirot
Represented By: Robert G. Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?