Anderson v. Johnson
Petitioner: Earl E. Anderson
Respondent: Jean Ann Johnson
Case Number: 4:2011cv00179
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: DeKalb
Presiding Judge: Lewis M. Blanton
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel [# 31 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/11/14. (JWD)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion under Rule 59(e) [# 29 -1] is denied, and petitioner's alternative motion for certificate of appealability [# 29 -2] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/23/14. (ARL)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation filed on December 9, 2013 # 14 is adopted and sustained, except as stated above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners objections to the Report and Recommendation # 24 are overruled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus # 1 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability.A separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/3/14. (ARL)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner shall until April 7, 2014 to file any objections to the Report and Recommendation and Judge Blanton's denial of the motion to amend. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/20/14. (KXS)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's Motion to Amend (Doc. No. 15) be and it is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton on 2/19/2014. (JMC)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is re-referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1), for ruling on petitioner's motion to amend [#15] and any other non- dispositive matters, and, if necessary, for reconsideration of the Report and Recommendation issued on December 9, 2013, in light of petitioner's motion for leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for an extension of time [#16] is granted, and petitioner need not file a response to the Report and Recommendation issued on December 9, 2013, until Judge Blanton decides whether to grant leave to amend and, if necessary, issues an amended or supplemental Report and Recommendatio n in light of his decision on his motion for leave to amend. If Judge Blanton denies leave to amend and reaffirms the Report and Recommendation issued on December 9, 2013, then petitioner shall have 45 days from the date of that Order to file any objections to the Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/23/13. (LAH)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM...The petitioner has written the clerk asking why it is taking so long for his habeas case to be decided. In the order of November 17, 2011, the court stated the reasons why both habeas cases and Social Security appeals take so long. As th e court stated in the order of November 17, 2011, the court handles the habeas cases assigned to it in the order they are filed. This is the only fair way. These cases are in addition to the regular civil and criminal cases headed for trial. The peti tioner's case is No. 17 out of 34 pending habeas cases. There are also a number of Social Security appeals that are ahead of petitioner's case. That is why there is the delay in resolving petitioner's case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lewis M. Blanton on 8/17/2012. (JMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jean Ann Johnson
Represented By: Andrew W. Hassell
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earl E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?