United States of America v. Mask of Ka-Nefer-Nefer
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mask of Ka-Nefer-Nefer
Claimant: Art Museum Subdistrict of the Metropolitan Zoological Park and Museum District of the City of St. Louis and the County of St. Louis
Case Number: 4:2011cv00504
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: HEREBY ORDERED that The Governments Motion for Leave to File First Amended Verified Complaint for Forfeiture [ECF No. 49 ] is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Claimant Museum's Motion to Strike theMotion of The Government for Leave to File First Amended Verified Complaint forForfeiture [ECF No. 51 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 06/28/2012. (CLK)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 34 , 40 , 44 ORDERED that the Government's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's March 31, 2012 Memorandum and Order [ECF. No. 34] is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Claimant St. Louis Art Museum' ;s Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Reconsider Order and Opinion Dismissing Verified Complaint [ECF No. 40] is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Government's Motion to Clarify Orders [ECF No. 44] is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that The Government's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal [ECF No. 44] is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 5/30/12. (CEL)
March 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that claimants motion to dismiss the verified complaint [Doc. #11] is GRANTED.A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/31/12. (CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mask of Ka-Nefer-Nefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard E. Finneran
Represented By: Dianna R. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mask of Ka-Nefer-Nefer
Represented By: Patrick A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Art Museum Subdistrict of the Metropolitan Zoological Park and Museum District of the City of St. Louis and the County of St. Louis
Represented By: McClain E. Bryant
Represented By: Patrick A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?