Rothman v. Lombardi et al
Plaintiff: |
Charles E. Rothman |
Defendant: |
George Lombardi, Joe Hoffmeister, Jeff Norman, Unknown Chastin, Unknown Webb, Patricia Cornell and Glen S. Babich |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv00639 |
Filed: |
April 11, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Carol E. Jackson |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 2, 2014 |
Filing
163
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.75 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/2/14. (KJS)
|
September 11, 2013 |
Filing
152
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER :IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Ronald Cowley, George Lombardi, and the Missouri Department of Corrections Doc. # 124 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Charles Chastain and Corizon, Inc. Doc. # 127 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to bifurcate the issues for trial filedby plaintiff Doc. # 138 is moot.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/11/13. (KKS)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
112
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss filed by defendant George Lombardi [Doc. # 93] is granted only as to the claim against defendant Lombardi in Count III of the second amended complaint. The motion is denied in al l other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss filed by the Missouri Department of Corrections [Doc. # 96] is denied. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed with this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/28/2013. (KMS)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Kyle Webb to dismiss and for summary judgment [Doc. 44 ] is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's claims against Webb in his official capacity, his claims regardi ng administrative segregation, and his claims regarding being denied a shower are dismissed. In all other respects, the motion is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant Charles Chastain to dismiss [Doc. 28 ] is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's claim against Chastain regarding his cell and bunk assignments is dismissed. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/27/2012; (DJO)
|
November 1, 2011 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel [Doc. 34] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve process on defendant Unknown Webb, Sergeant at Eastern Reception Diagnostic and Correctional Center, in accordance with the Court's Waiver of Service Agreement with the Missouri Department of Corrections. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 11/1/11. (KXS)
|
August 12, 2011 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to compel [Doc. 22] is denied without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 8/12/2011. (KMS)
|
July 25, 2011 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER :IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Dr. Chastin and Sergeant Webb. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendant s Chastin and Webb shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants John Doe and Glen Babich. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 7/25/11. (KKS)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [doc. # 2 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $28.70 within thirty (30) days of the date o f this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until June 6, 2011 in which to submit an amended complaint using the form provided by the Clerk of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" form; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 05/04/2011. (DJO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?