Jones v. United States of America
Petitioner: James Jones
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2011cv00702
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant's Motion for Certificate of Appealability [ECF No. 59 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/30/2012. (CBL)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant's Motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody [ECF No. 1 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States of America's Motion to Strike [ECFNo. 47 ] is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on August 30, 2012. (BRP)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States's Motion for Pre-Hearing Determination 20 is GRANTED pursuant to the parties' on the record stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court adopts the parties' afore mentioned stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Court shall conduct an evidentiary hearing concerning Movant's claim of ineffective assistance of counsel based on his attorney's failure to call Clifford Williams as a witness or investiga te his potential as a witness. The hearing will be held on February 27, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. at the United States District Court in St. Louis, Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States's copy of the Taaffee file shall remain in the p ossession of the Clerk of the Court until the February 27, 2012 evidentiary hearing. At that time, it is anticipated tha the Taaffe file will be returned to Movant. ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/27/2012 09:00 AM before Honorable E. Richard Webber.) Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on February 14, 2012. (MCB)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that with the exception of Movant's claim of ineffective assistance of counsel based on his attorney's failure to call Mr. Williams as a defense witness or investigate his potential as a witness, Movant's Motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody [ECF No. 1 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall conduct an evidentiary hearing conc erning Movant's claim of ineffective assistance of counsel based on his attorney's failure to call Clifford Williams as a witness or investigate his potential as a witness. The hearing will be held on February 2, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. at the Un ited States District Court in St. Louis, Missouri, and it will be limited to determining whether Movant instructed his attorney to call Mr. Williams as a defense witness as well as the content and credibility of Mr. Williams's testimony. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal Service shall transport James Jones, Inmate #35343-044, from the Victorville Federal Correctional Complex in Adelanto, California, to the United States District Court in St. Louis, Missouri, in advance of and for the attendance at the Evidentiary Hearing scheduled for February 2, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 11/16/2011. (3 certified to USM) (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas J. Mehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?