Evantigroup, LLC v. Mangia Mobile, LLC
Plaintiff: Evantigroup, LLC
Defendant: Mangia Mobile, LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv01328
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants motion for bifurcation [Doc. #304] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/14/2014. (KMS)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to modify plaintiffs subpoenas duces tecum [Doc. # 183] is granted in part. The documents to be produced by US Bank, the Business Bank of St. Louis, US Food Service, and Five Star I nsurance Agency shall be limited to the time period January 1, 2009 to the present. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for production of the documents responsive to the subpoenas is May 1, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to modify is denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/18/2013. (KMS)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant C.A.T. I, LLC to dismiss the third amended complaint [Doc. # 109 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/4/13. (KJS)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs cross-motion to compel the production of documents and deposition of Crystal Huff [Doc. # 126 ] is granted. Crystal Huff is ordered to produce all documents responsive to plaintiffs subpoen a by January 31, 2013, and to appear for a deposition at a mutually agreeable time and place. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants joint motion to quash plaintiffs subpoena to Mueller Prost PC [Doc. # 135 ] is denied. Mueller Prost PC is ordered to produce all documents responsive to plaintiffs subpoena by January 31, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Mangia Mobiles motion to compel plaintiffs responses to requests for production and answers to interrogatories [Doc. # 113 ] is denied as to interrogatory 19 and is otherwise moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/11/13. (KJS)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants joint motion for a protective order [Doc. # 154 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants joint motion for bifurcation [Doc. # 156 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/7/13. (KJS)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion for leave to file a second amended complaint [Doc. # 87 ] is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file and docket the second amended complaint [Doc. # 88 -1] submitted by plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/10/12. (KJS)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant shall appear before the Court on Thursday, October 6, 2011, at 1:30 p.m., to show cause why it should not be held in contempt for violation of the preliminary injunction entered in this case. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 09/26/2011; (DJO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evantigroup, LLC v. Mangia Mobile, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evantigroup, LLC
Represented By: Paul A. Maddock
Represented By: Michael J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mangia Mobile, LLC
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?