Cross v. MHM Correctional Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Cross
Defendant: MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Michael Pinkert, Steven Wheeler, Unknown Jones, Unknown Reddy and Julie Motley
Case Number: 4:2011cv01544
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Frederick R. Buckles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Michael Pinkert, Steven Wheeler, Dr. Scotty Jones, Dr. Reddy, Julie Motley, Le Ann Vogt, and Jennifer Kearns Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 143) is G RANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Endorsement of Expert Witnesses (ECF No. 122) and to Strike Plaintiffs Rule 26 Disclosures (ECF No. 124) are DENIED AS MOOT. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 10/10/2014. (KMS)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 69 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant George Lombardi, Defendant Ellis McSwain, Jr., Defendant Matthew Strum, Defendant Matthew Briesacher; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 69 ) is DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 3/31/14. (KKS)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave of Court for Plaintiff to File his Fourth Amended Complaint (ECF No. 74) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Leave to File a Fourth Amended C omplaint (ECF No. 93) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Second Amended Motion for Leave to File his Fourth Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, to Quash the Third Amended Complaint, and Strike it from the Record and Grant Plainti ff Leave to Refile (ECF No. 102) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Court to Issue Rulings (ECF No. 98) is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, although Plaintiffs are proceeding pro se, they are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 1/30/2014. (KMS)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Christopher Cross's Motions to Recuse Kevin Adrian as Legal Counsel and to Strike All Pleadings Filed by Kevin Adrian from the Record (Doc. # 17); and to Quash Defendants' Repl y to Plaintiff's Motion to Have Kevin Adrian Recused and to Strike All Pleadings Filed by Kevin Adrian (Doc. #27) are denied without prejudice. Denying 17 Pro Se Motion; Denying 27 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick R. Buckles on 9/17/2012. (NCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. MHM Correctional Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Correctional Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pinkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?