Ballard v. City of St. Louis et al
Plaintiff: (I')sla Ballard
Defendant: Jarrod L. Henderson, Isabella Lovadina, Chris N. Lovelady-Armstrong, Robert E. Ogilvie and Ronald E. Vaughan
Case Number: 4:2011cv01553
Filed: September 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment 73 is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims in this matter and this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/25/14. (LGK)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each party may file a supplemental brief on the issue of qualified immunity relating to Ballard's excessive force claim no later than September 27, 2013. Each party may file a response no later th an October 7, 2013. Parties shall properly support any facts asserted in their briefing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the September 9, 2013 trial setting is vacated, and this case will be reset for trial, if necessary, following the Court's ruling on summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/19/13. (LAH)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff (I)sla Ballard's Motion 38 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/20/12. (LGK)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff (I')sla Ballard motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 2/24/12. (LGK)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant St. Lou is City Police Officers Robert E. Ogilvie, Ronald E. Vaughan, Isabella Lovadina, Chris N. Lovelady- Armstrong, and Jarrod L. Henderson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants Robert E. Ogilvie, Ronald E. Vaug han, Isabella Lovadina, Chris N. Lovelady-Armstrong, and Jarrod L. Henderson shall respond to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants the City of St. Louis or Daniel Isom because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 09/22/2011; (DJO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard v. City of St. Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod L. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Lovadina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris N. Lovelady-Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Ogilvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: (I')sla Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?