Infante Vasquez et al v. Heartland Express Inc. of Iowa, et al
Plaintiff: Maria del Refugio Infante Vasquez, Sheila Gordillo, Tanya Gordillo, Aaron Gordillo and Arturo Gordillo, Jr.
Defendant: Raymond E. Hill and Heartland Express Inc. of Iowa
Case Number: 4:2011cv01561
Filed: September 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Phelps
Presiding Judge: Frederick R. Buckles
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER This matter is before the Court on the parties joint motion for the Clerk to tax Defendants costs in the amount of $1,489.71, including $497.28 in witness fees and $992.43 in printing costs. Defendants requested these amounts in their Amended Bill of Costs, and Plaintiffs offer no objection. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk will tax Defendants costs in the amount of $1,489.71. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/1/13. (JWJ)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. (Doc. No. 33) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/17/2012. (KSM)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Raymond E. Hill and Heartland Express, Inc. of Iowa are awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of Two Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($2,500.00). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t Plaintiffs shall pay to Defendants the awarded fees and costs on or before December 31, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to make such payment in a timely fashion may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/30/12. (KXS)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDERIT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Renewed Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Costs and to Stay Proceedings (Doc. No. 20), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as follows: a. Defendants request for dismissal of Plaint iffs complaint pursuant to Rule 41(b) is DENIED. b. Defendants request for an award of attorneys fees and costs is GRANTED in part as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall submit on or before October 24, 2012, documentation to support an award of previously incurred attorneys fees and costs on the ground that such expenditures have not been, or will not be, of use in this action. Plaintiffs is granted until October 31, 2012, to respond to Defendants submission. ( Response to Court due by 10/24/2012.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/17/12. (JWJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infante Vasquez et al v. Heartland Express Inc. of Iowa, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond E. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Express Inc. of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria del Refugio Infante Vasquez
Represented By: Roy B. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Gordillo
Represented By: Roy B. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Gordillo
Represented By: Roy B. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Gordillo
Represented By: Roy B. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Gordillo, Jr.
Represented By: Roy B. True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?