Risch v. Natoli Engineering Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Melanie Risch and Matthew Sorcic
Defendant: Natoli Engineering Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv01621
Filed: September 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Charles
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties Consent Motion for Settlement (Doc. No. 55) and for Final Approval of the Parties Class Action Settlement Agreement (Doc. No. 55-1) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion fo r Approval of Fees and Costs (Doc. No. 64) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall distribute the settlement funds, in accordance with the terms of this Memorandum and Order and the SettlementAgreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Coun t III of Plaintiffs Complaint isDISMISSED with prejudice. re: 64 FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that the claims of all named Plaintiffs and all class members who did not affirmatively opt out of this action are DISMISSED with prejudice. MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Melanie Risch Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/24/12. (JWJ)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of a Class For Settlement Purposes (Doc. No. 55) is GRANTED, certifying, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e) and for settlement purposes onl y, a class consisting of two sub-classes: (1) all persons who worked for Defendant as customer service/order entry employees from on or after September 19, 2008, through the payroll period ending March 30, 2012, and who timely filed an opt-in notice pursuant to the Courts conditional certification of the collective action class in Count I, and (2) all persons who worked for Defendant as customer service/order entry employees from on or after September 19, 2009, through the payroll period ending March 30, 2012, and who do not file an election to "opt-out" of the Rule 23 Class established pursuant to Count II. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Approval Of Notice To Class Members (Doc. No. 55-3) is GRANTE D. The Court approves the proposed form of Notice to Class Members. The method for provision of notice shall comply with the terms proposed by the parties in the Settlement Agreement and set forth in this Order. The parties shall use their best effor ts to complete the provision of notice within 10 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's Counsel shall file an affidavit or declaration stating that the mailing has been accomplished in accordance with the notice requirements set forth in th e Settlement Agreement and this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Agreement and for a Hearing For Final Approval of the Parties' Class Settlement Agreement are GRANTED. The Court will hold a fairness hearing on Friday, September 21, 2012, at 2:30 p.m., Thomas F. Eagleton Courthouse, 111 S. 10th St., Saint Louis, MO 63102, for purposes of determining whether final approval of 10 the Class Settlement Agreement is app ropriate, whether Class Counsel fairly and adequately protected the interests of the Settlement Class, and whether Class Counsel's attorney's fees, costs, and expenses should be approved by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request to dismiss Count III with prejudice is GRANTED. (Fairness Hearing set for 9/21/2012 02:30 PM before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/7/2012. (NCL)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Conditionally Certify Class (Doc. No. 11) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a collective class of present and former employees of Defendant, as defined in the parties stipulatio n (Doc. No. 17), is conditionally certified pursuant to 29 U.S.C. §216(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to Order Disclosure of Putative Class Members Names and Contact Information and to Facilitate Class Notice (Doc. No. 17) is G RANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before December 5, 2011, Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with a list of all as customer service and order entry representatives employed by Defendant in the three (3) years prior to the date of this Order, i ncluding thelast known mailing address and telephone number (if known) for each. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is authorized to send notice and consent forms, by way of first class mail, to potential opt-in plaintiffs in a format substantially identical to the Notice of Right To Join Lawsuit and Plaintiff Consent Form (Doc. No. 18-1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall provide a copy of the Notice of Right To Join and Consent Form with each potential opt-in plaintiffs pay check an d/or pay stub on the next pay day following entry of this Order, and Defendant shall provide to Plaintiffs counsel certification of compliance with this provision. re: 11 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Melanie Risch ( Response to Court due by 12/5/2011.) Signed by Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/21/11. (JWJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Risch v. Natoli Engineering Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Risch
Represented By: Ferne P. Wolf
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sorcic
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natoli Engineering Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Harris
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?