Securites and Exchange Commission v.Morriss et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission and Claimant 93 and 124
Defendant: Burton Douglas Morriss, Acartha Group LLC, MIC VII, LLC, Acartha Technology Partners, LP, Gryphon Investments III, LLC and Morriss Holdings, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Ameet Patel, Mike McDaniel and Blink Marketing Group, LLC
Claimant: UHY Advisors MO, Inc. and Hany Teylouni
Receiver: Claire M Schenk
Case Number: 4:2012cv00080
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
December 17, 2018 Filing 585 NOTICE Withdrawal of Appearance of Kathleen Kraft: by Receiver Claire M Schenk (Kraft, Kathleen)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER granting #578 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document..The Clerk of the Court shall maintain Exhibits D-lA through D-lC, D-3A, and D-3B and Attachment 1 to Exhibit H to the Receiver' s Memorandum of Law in Support of Receiver' s Motion for Final Distribution of Assets, Authorization for Payment of Legal and Professional Fees and Expenses, Wind Up of Proceeding, and Discharge of Receiver under seal. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/18/18. (MRS)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER granting #580 FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF LEGAL AND PROFESSIONAL FEES AND EXPENSES AND DISCHARGE OF RECEIVER Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/15/18. (MRS)
August 14, 2018 Filing 582 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #580 MOTION for Leave to /Motion for Order Approving Final Distribution of Assets and Authorizing Payment of Legal and Professional Fees and Expenses, Wind Up of Proceeding, and Discharge of Receiver Notice of No Objection to Receiver's Motion for Order Approving Final Distribution of Assets and Authorizing Payment of Legal and Professional Fees and Expenses, Wind Up of Proceeding, and Discharge of Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (proposed order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 1, 2018 Filing 581 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #580 MOTION for Leave to /Motion for Order Approving Final Distribution of Assets and Authorizing Payment of Legal and Professional Fees and Expenses, Wind Up of Proceeding, and Discharge of Receiver filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (final SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (certification), #3 Exhibit C (invoice summary), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-2A (no redactions), #8 Exhibit D-2B (no redactions), #9 Exhibit D-2C (no redactions), #10 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #12 Exhibit E (holdback chart), #13 Exhibit F (summary of previous fee applications and approvals), #14 Exhibit G (proposed order), #15 Exhibit H (Schenk declaration), #16 Exhibit I (O'Shaughnessy declaration))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 1, 2018 Filing 580 MOTION for Leave to /Motion for Order Approving Final Distribution of Assets and Authorizing Payment of Legal and Professional Fees and Expenses, Wind Up of Proceeding, and Discharge of Receiver by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Exhibit G to Memorandum))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 1, 2018 Filing 579 SEALED DOCUMENT re #578 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to file Exhibits D-1A through D-1C, D-3A, and D-3B and Attachment 1 to Exhibit H to the Receiver's Memorandum of Law in Support of Receiver's Motion for Final Distribution of Asset Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #5 Exhibit H - Attachment 1 (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 1, 2018 Filing 578 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to file Exhibits D-1A through D-1C, D-3A, and D-3B and Attachment 1 to Exhibit H to the Receiver's Memorandum of Law in Support of Receiver's Motion for Final Distribution of Assets, Authorization for Payment of Legal and Professional Fees and Expenses, Wind Up of Proceeding, and Discharge of Receiver under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER granting #575 Motion..THE COURT DOES HEREBY ORDER THAT1. The Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Application is granted in its entirety;2. The Receiver is authorized to make payment of eighty percent (80%) of the totalamount of legal and professional fees and one hundred percent ( 100%) of incurred costs out of the assets of the Receivership estate as follows:(a) $20,162.34 in legal fees and $6.72 in costs for Thompson Coburn LLP, theReceiver's primary counsel; (b) $1,648.73 in professional fees and $16.02 in costs for Segue Partners, LLC, the Receiver's investment fund manager; and (c) $282.00 in professional fees for CliftonLarsonAllen LLP, the Receiver'saccountant and tax preparer. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/9/18. (MRS)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER granting #573 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/9/18. (MRS)
May 8, 2018 Filing 575 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Time/Invoice Summaries), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-2A (no redactions), #8 Exhibit D-2B (no redactions), #9 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #11 Exhibit E (Proposed Order), #12 Exhibit F (Previous Fee Applications))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 8, 2018 Filing 574 SEALED DOCUMENT re #573 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1C and D-3A through D-3B to the Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Reta ined Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal, Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Attachment Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Attachment Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #4 Attachment Exhibit D-3B (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 8, 2018 Filing 573 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1C and D-3A through D-3B to the Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting #571 Motion... The Twenty-Sixth Interim Status Report of Receiver for the period from January 24, 2018 through May 4, 2018, and every act and transaction reported therein, are hereby approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/4/18. (MRS)
May 4, 2018 Filing 571 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Twenty-Sixth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Twenty-Sixth Interim Status Report)(Kraft, Kathleen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2018: #2 Proposed Order) (JMC).
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER granting #568 Motion in its entirety.. The Receiver is authorized to make payment of eighty percent (80%) of the total amount of legal and professional fees and one hundred percent ( 100%) of incurred costs out ofthe assets of the Receivership estate as follows: (a) $36,187.90 in legal fees and $91.22 in costs for Thompson Coburn LLP, the Receiver's primary counsel;(b) $3,009.38 in professional fees for Segue Partners, LLC, the Receiver'sinvestment fund manager; and (c) $2,062.60 in professional fees and $13.50 in costs for CliftonLarsonAllen LLP, the Receiver's accountant and tax preparer. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/2/18. (MRS)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER granting #566 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. The Clerk of the Court shall maintain Exhibits D-lA through D-lC and D-2B through D-3C to the Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Interim Application for Allowance and Paymentof Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Professionals under seal. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/1/18. (MRS)
February 1, 2018 Filing 568 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summaries, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-2A (no redactions), #8 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #12 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #13 F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 1, 2018 Filing 567 SEALED DOCUMENT re #566 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1C and D-2B through D-3C to the Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Ret ained Counsel and Other Professionals under Seal, Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 1, 2018 Filing 566 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1C and D-2B through D-3C to the Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER granting #564 Motion..The Twenty-Fifth Interim Status Report of Receiver for the period from October 28, 2017 through January 23, 2018, and every act and transaction reported therein, are hereby approved and confirmed Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/23/18. (MRS)
January 23, 2018 Filing 564 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Twenty-Fifth Interim Status Report by Receiver, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Granting Motion))(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF UNLIQUIDATED ASSETS AND REQUEST FOR AUTHORITIES REGARDING WINDUP ACTIVITIES FOR ENTITIES MANAGED BY THE RECIEVER. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/5/17. (MRS)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER granting #559 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document.The Clerk of the Court shall maintain Attachments 1 through 4 to the Declarationof Michelle Murray in Support of Receiver's Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets under seal Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/5/17. (MRS)
December 4, 2017 Filing 561 NOTICE No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets and Request for Authorities Regarding Wind-Up Activities for Entities Managed by the Receiver: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #557 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #556 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets and Request for Authorities Regarding Wind-Up Activities for Entities Managed by the Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 4, 2017 Filing 560 SEALED DOCUMENT re #559 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Corrected Attachments 1 through 4 to the Declaration of Michelle Murray in Support of Receiver's Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets under Seal) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
December 4, 2017 Filing 559 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Corrected Attachments 1 through 4 to the Declaration of Michelle Murray in Support of Receiver's Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets under Seal) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Corrected Attachments 1 through 4 Under Seal)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting #554 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/20/17. (MRS)
November 17, 2017 Filing 557 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #556 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets and Request for Authorities Regarding Wind-Up Activities for Entities Managed by the Receiver filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Claire M. Schenk, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michelle Murray (including attachments))(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 17, 2017 Filing 556 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets and Request for Authorities Regarding Wind-Up Activities for Entities Managed by the Receiver by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Kraft, Kathleen) Modified on 3/22/2018 (MRS).
November 17, 2017 Filing 555 SEALED DOCUMENT re #554 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Attachments 1 through 4 to the Declaration of Michelle Murray in Support of Receivers Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets (unredacted Attachments 1 through 4) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
November 17, 2017 Filing 554 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Attachments 1 through 4 to the Declaration of Michelle Murray in Support of Receivers Plan of Allocation for Distribution of Unliquidated Assets by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER granting #550 Motion..The Receiver's Twenty-Third Application is granted in its entirety; The Receiver is authorized to make payment of eighty percent (80%) of the totalamount of legal and professional fees and one hundred percent ( 100%) of incurred costs out of the assets of the Receivership estate as follows: a)$27,037.82 in legal fees and $79.79 in costs for Thompson Coburn LLP,the Receiver's primary counsel b)$6,041.20 in professional fees for Segue Partners, LLC, the Receiver's investment fund manager; and c)$6,534.00 in professional fees and $25.00 in costs for CliftonLarsonAllen LLP, the Receiver's accountant and tax preparer. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/31/17. (MRS)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER granting #548 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document..The Receiver's Motion is granted in its entirety; and The Clerk of the Court shall maintain Exhibits D-IA through D-IC, D-2B, D-3A, and D-3B to the Receiver's Twenty-Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Professionals under seal. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/31/17. (MRS)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER granting #547 Motion for Leave. The Receiver's Motion is granted in its entirety and the The Twenty-Fourth Interim Status Report of Receiver for the period from August 4, 2017 through October 27, 2017, and every act and transaction reported therein, are hereby approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/31/17. (MRS)
October 30, 2017 Filing 550 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twenty-Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-2A (no redactions), #8 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-2C (no redactions), #10 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #12 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #13 Exhibit F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 30, 2017 Filing 549 SEALED DOCUMENT re #548 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1C, D-2B, D-3A, and D-3B to the Receiver's Twenty-Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Coun -- Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 30, 2017 Filing 548 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1C, D-2B, D-3A, and D-3B to the Receiver's Twenty-Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 27, 2017 Filing 547 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Twenty-Fourth Interim Status Report of Receiver, #2 Text of Proposed Order Approving Motion)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting #544 Motion for Leave to Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/15/17. (MRS)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER granting #542 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/8/17. (MRS)
August 7, 2017 Filing 544 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twenty-Second Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Invoice/Time Summary), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #13 Exhibit E (Proposed Order), #14 Exhibit F (Summary of Previous Fee Applications))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 7, 2017 Filing 543 SEALED DOCUMENT re #542 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1C and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twenty-Second Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Ret ained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal, Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 7, 2017 Filing 542 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1C and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twenty-Second Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER granting #540 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED The Twenty-Third Interim Status Report of Receiver for the period from May 2, 2017 through August 3, 2017 and every act and transaction reported therein are hereby approved and confirmed Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/4/17. (MRS)
August 3, 2017 Filing 540 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Twenty-Third Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Twenty-Third Interim Status Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Granting Motion))(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases are transferred to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. All hearings previously scheduled remain set unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/28/2017. (CLO)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the objection of Hany Teylouni to thereceivers determination to disallow his claim [Doc. #337 ] is overruled. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/16/17. (JAB)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers Amended Motion [Doc. #527 ] is granted in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/16/17. (JAB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2017: #1 Exhibit B-1 to B-4) (JAB).
June 15, 2017 Filing 536 NOTICE Request for Entry of Orders on Pending Motions: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #351 Notice (Other),, #527 MOTION for Leave to, #344 Notice (Other), #349 Response to Motion, #533 Notice (Other),, #381 Supplemental, #486 Declaration,, #452 Declaration, #337 Memorandum,, #378 Memorandum, #347 Memorandum, #450 Response to Court Order, #449 Sealed Document, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Exhibit A))(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's twentieth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #523 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $74,463.05 in legal fees and $92.29 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $3,064.17 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $10,085.20 in professional fees and $289.00 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/5/17. (KKS)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion for order approving and confirming the Twenty-Second Interim Status Report [Doc. #520 ] is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Twenty-Second Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period February 4, 2017, through May 2, 2017, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/5/17. (KKS)
June 1, 2017 Filing 533 NOTICE Filing of Updated Distribution Schedules and Associated Documents: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #527 MOTION for Leave to, #529 Notice (Other), 532 Docket Text Order, (Attachments: #1 Updated Exhibit A-1 (Schedule of Allowed Claims), #2 Supplemental Declaration of Timothy S. O'Shaughnessy, #3 Updated Attachment 1 (Distribution Schedule for Acartha Group), #4 Updated Attachment 2 (Distribution Schedule for Acartha Technology Partners), #5 Updated Attachment 3 (Distribution Schedule for MIC VII), #6 Updated Attachment 4 (Distribution Schedule for Gryphon Investments III), #7 Updated Proposed Order on Receiver's Amended Motion to Approve Distribution Plan)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #530 Consent MOTION for Leave to Assert Late Objection to Receiver's Amended Motion to Approve Distribution Plan by Plaintiff Claimant 93 and 124. (Holland, Brian) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/30/17. (JAB)
May 26, 2017 Filing 531 NOTICE Service of Document No. 530 on Interested Parties (as defined in ECF No. 516) by Electronic Mail: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #530 Consent MOTION for Leave to Assert Late Objection to Receiver's Amended Motion to Approve Distribution Plan (Kraft, Kathleen)
May 26, 2017 Filing 530 Consent MOTION for Leave to Assert Late Objection to Receiver's Amended Motion to Approve Distribution Plan by Plaintiff Claimant 93 and 124. (Holland, Brian)
May 19, 2017 Filing 529 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Distribution, Approve Schedule of Claims, Authorize Distributions of Receivership Assets, and Approve Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and Professional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #527 MOTION for Leave to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 11, 2017 Filing 528 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on the Twenty-Second Interim Status Report of Receiver and Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #523 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals, #520 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Twenty-Second Interim Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order (Twenty-Second Report), #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order (Twenty-First Application))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 10, 2017 Filing 527 Receiver's Amended Motion to Approve Plan of Distribution, Approve Schedule of Claims, Authorize Distributions of Receivership Assets, and Approve Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and Professional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals and Memorandum in Support by Receiver Claire M Schenk. #515 (KKS)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receiver's motion for leave to amend/correct the motion to approve distribution plan [Doc. #525 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file and docket Document # 525-1 as the Receiver's Amended Motion to Approve Plan of Distribution, Approve Schedule of Claims, Authorize Distributions of Receivership Assets, and Approve Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and Professional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals and Memorandum in Support. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Receiver's original motion to approveplan of distribution [Doc. #515 ] is moot.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/10/17. (KKS)
May 9, 2017 Filing 525 MOTION to Amend/Correct #516 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #515 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Distribution, Approve Schedule of Claims, Authorize First Interim Distribution of Receivership Assets, and Approve Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and P rofessional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended (Clean) Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redline Comparison, #3 Text of Proposed Order (granting motion to amend/correct))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Docket Text ORDER: #521 GRANTING MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/4/17. (KKS)
May 3, 2017 Filing 523 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #13 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #14 Exhibit F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 3, 2017 Filing 522 SEALED DOCUMENT re #521 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Profess ionals under Seal, Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 3, 2017 Filing 521 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Text of Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 2, 2017 Filing 520 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Twenty-Second Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Twenty-Second Interim Status Report of Receiver, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Twenty-Second Interim Status Report by Receiver))(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 28, 2017 Filing 519 NOTICE Regarding Receiver's Motion to Approve Distribution Plan: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #516 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #515 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Distribution, Approve Schedule of Claims, Authorize First Interim Distribution of Receivership Assets, and Approve Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and P (Kraft, Kathleen)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion for leave to file memorandum excess of fifteen-page limit [Doc. #517 ] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/25/17. (KKS)
April 20, 2017 Filing 517 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting motion for leave to file motion with supporting memorandum in excess of fifteen-page limit)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 20, 2017 Filing 516 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #515 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Distribution, Approve Schedule of Claims, Authorize First Interim Distribution of Receivership Assets, and Approve Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and P rofessional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Schedule of Allowed Claims, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Schedule of Disallowed Claims, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Timothy O'Shaughnessy, #4 Exhibit B (Attachment 1) - Acartha, #5 Exhibit B (Attachment 2) - ATP, #6 Exhibit B (Attachment 3) - MIC VII, #7 Exhibit B (Attachment 4) - Gryphon III, #8 Exhibit C - Kaufman Deposition, #9 Exhibit D - Chart of Holdback Amounts)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 20, 2017 Filing 515 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Plan of Distribution, Approve Schedule of Claims, Authorize First Interim Distribution of Receivership Assets, and Approve Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and Professional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting the Motion)(Kraft, Kathleen)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #507 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Documents Exhibits D-1A through D-1D and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twentieth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/17/17. (KKS)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER #506 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion for order approving and confirming the Twenty-First Interim Status Report [Doc. #506 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Twenty-First Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period November 2, 2016, through February 3, 2017, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/03/17. (KKS)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER #509 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's twentieth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #509 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $19,246.79 in legal fees and $29.76 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $1,241.40 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $4,895.80 in professional fees to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/03/17. (KKS)
February 14, 2017 Filing 511 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Twentieth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #507 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1D and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twentieth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, #509 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twentieth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Approving Allowance and Payment of Fees in Twentieth Fee Application))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 14, 2017 Filing 510 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Status Report: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #506 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Twenty-First Interim Status Report of Receiver (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Approving Twenty-First Interim Status Report))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 3, 2017 Filing 509 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twentieth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #14 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #15 Exhibit F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 3, 2017 Filing 508 SEALED DOCUMENT re #507 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1D and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twentieth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel , and Other Professionals, Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 3, 2017 Filing 507 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1D and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Twentieth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Motion for Leave to File Exhibits under Seal))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 3, 2017 Filing 506 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Twenty-First Interim Status Report of Receiver by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Twenty-First Interim Status Report of Receiver, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Approving and Confirming the Twenty-First Interim Status Report of Receiver))(Kraft, Kathleen)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Twentieth Interim Status Report [Doc. #496 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Twentieth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period August 2, 2016, through November 1, 2016, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/12/17. (JAB)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers nineteenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #500 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $45,330.84 in legal fees and $45.52 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $732.26 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $11,439.40 in professional fees and $139.00 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/12/17. (JAB)
November 21, 2016 Filing 503 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #500 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receiver's motion for order approving and confirming the Nineteenth Interim Status Report [Doc. #473 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Eighteenth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period May 3, 2016, through August 1, 2016, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/18/2016. (CLO)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #498 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-3A through D-3B to the Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen) filed by Claire M Schenk ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/8/2016. (CLO)
November 7, 2016 Filing 500 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-2A (no redactions), #14 Exhibit D-2B (no redactions), #15 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #17 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #18 Exhibit F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 7, 2016 Filing 499 SEALED DOCUMENT re #498 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-3A through D-3B to the Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retain ed Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal, Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-1G (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-1H (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-1I (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 7, 2016 Filing 498 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-3A through D-3B to the Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers motion to use proceeds to satisfy the obligations of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC, [Doc. #491 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver is authorized to pay fees, payables, and expenses of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC, in accordance with the distribution schedule [Doc. #492-2]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the asset freeze is lifted with respect to the acquisition proceeds. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/2/16. (JAB)
November 2, 2016 Filing 496 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Approve and Confirm Receiver's Twentieth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Twentieth Status Report of Receiver, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 1, 2016 Filing 495 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Status Report: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #473 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 1, 2016 Filing 494 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Satisfy Obligations of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #492 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #491 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Authorization to Satisfy Obligations of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #489 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibit A-1 to the Motion for Authorization to Satisfy Obligations of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/2/16. (JAB)
September 1, 2016 Filing 492 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #491 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Authorization to Satisfy Obligations of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - O'Shaughnessy Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Distribution Schedule, #3 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
September 1, 2016 Filing 491 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Authorization to Satisfy Obligations of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
September 1, 2016 Filing 490 SEALED DOCUMENT re #489 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibit A-1 to the Motion for Authorization to Satisfy Obligations of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
September 1, 2016 Filing 489 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibit A-1 to the Motion for Authorization to Satisfy Obligations of Clearbrook Acquisition, LLC under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER APPROVING AMENDMENT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN GRYPHON INVESTMENTS III, LLC AND JOHN S. WEHRLE, GRYPHON INVESTMENTS II, LLC, AND CIRQIT.COM, LLC: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT 1. The Receivers motion for approval of amendment to settlement agreement between Gryphon Investments III, LLC, and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC, [Doc. #478 ] is GRANTED. 2. The Amendment to the Agreement is approved. Furthermore, the Receiver is authorized to execute the Amendment and to take such acts as are necessary to effectuate one of the three listed options regarding the Cirqit shares in accordance with the Amendment to the Agreement. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/31/16. (JAB)
August 30, 2016 Filing 487 NOTICE No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion for Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #480 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #478 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC, #479 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 29, 2016 Filing 486 DECLARATION filed by Claimant Hany Teylouni re #472 Scheduling Order, in Further Support of Claim No. 20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Dixon Brown dated October 23, 2008, #3 Exhibit C - W-2 Form form for 2008, #4 Exhibit D W-2 Form form for 2009, #5 Exhibit E - Final pay stub dated April 15, 2010, #6 Exhibit F - Email from Dixon Brown dated January 28, 2009, #7 Exhibit G - Speadsheet, #8 Certificate of Service)(Zito, Robert)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 485 AMENDED ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers eighteenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #476 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $44,152.05 in legal fees and $88.82 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $1,235.24 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $3,922.00 in professional fees and $139.00 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/26/16. (JAB)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers motion to amend the order granting her eighteenth application for fees [Doc. #483 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order entered on August 24, 2016 [Doc. #482 ] is vacated. An amended order will be entered. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/26/16. (JAB)
August 25, 2016 Filing 483 MOTION to Amend/Correct #482 Order on Motion for Leave to,, Eighteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 482 (VACATED) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers eighteenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #476 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $44,152.05 in legal fees and $88.82 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $1,235.24 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $3,992.00 in professional fees and $139.00 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/24/2016. (CLO) Modified on 8/26/2016 (JAB).
August 22, 2016 Filing 481 NOTICE No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #476 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 10, 2016 Filing 480 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #478 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC Updated Certificate of Service filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
August 8, 2016 Filing 479 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #478 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of the Amendment, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 8, 2016 Filing 478 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Amendment to Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #474 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/8/16. (JAB)
August 5, 2016 Filing 476 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-2A (no redactions), #14 Exhibit D-2B (no redactions), #15 Exhibit D-2C (no redactions), #16 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #18 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #19 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #20 Exhibit F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 5, 2016 Filing 475 SEALED DOCUMENT re #474 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retain ed Counsel, and Other Professionals, Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-1G (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-1H (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-1I (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 5, 2016 Filing 474 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-3A through D-3C to the Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 2, 2016 Filing 473 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Nineteenth Interim Status Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Hany Teylouni shall have until September 1, 2016, to provide information supporting his claim that he earned deferred compensation at the rate of $9,166.67 per pay period between September 15, 2008, and April 15, 2010. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/20/16. (JAB)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's seventeenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #461 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $43,297.98 in legal fees and $38.76 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $4,172.32 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $1,696.00 in professional fees and $26.96 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/9/16. (KKS)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receiver's motion for order approving and confirming the Eighteenth Interim Status Report [Doc. #456 ] is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Eighteenth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period February 9, 2016, through May 2, 2016, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/9/16. (KKS)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers motion for approval of sale of interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC [Doc. #462] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver is authorized to sell the receiverships interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC on the terms and conditions set forth in the Motion and in Exhibit B to the Motion. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/8/2016. (KMS)
June 6, 2016 Filing 468 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sale of Interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #463 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #462 MOTION for Leave to for Approval of Sale of Interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 6, 2016 Filing 467 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #461 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #464 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion to File Exhibit C to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sale of Interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk.(Kraft, Kathleen), #459 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-2B through D-3C to the Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk.(Kraft, Kathleen) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/18/16. (JAB)
May 17, 2016 Filing 465 SEALED DOCUMENT re #463 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #462 MOTION for Leave to for Approval of Sale of Interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC, #464 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion to File Exhibit C to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sale of Interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
May 17, 2016 Filing 464 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion to File Exhibit C to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sale of Interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 17, 2016 Filing 463 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #462 MOTION for Leave to for Approval of Sale of Interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Proposed Order], #2 Exhibit B [Redemption Agreement], #3 Exhibit C [Valuation Report - redacted])(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 17, 2016 Filing 462 MOTION for Leave to for Approval of Sale of Interests in Clearbrook Global Advisors LLC by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
May 16, 2016 Filing 461 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B -Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-2A (no redactions), #14 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #18 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #19 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #20 Exhibit F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 16, 2016 Filing 460 SEALED DOCUMENT re #459 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-2B through D-3C to the Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retai ned Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-1G (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-1H (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-1I (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #12 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #13 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 16, 2016 Filing 459 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-2B through D-3C to the Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Seventeenth Interim Status Report [Doc. #441 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Seventeenth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period October 28, 2015, through February 8, 2016, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/5/16. (KKS)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's sixteenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #445 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $79,831.65 in legal fees and $515.10 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $1,361.75 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $7,736.00 in professional fees to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/5/16. (KKS)
May 3, 2016 Filing 456 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Entry of Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Receiver's Eighteenth Interim Status Report, #2 Exhibit 1 to Interim Status Report, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the objection of Blink Marketing Group, LLC [Doc. #390 ] is sustained.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/14/16. (KKS)
March 10, 2016 Filing 454 SUPPLEMENTAL re #446 Scheduling Order, by Objector Blink Marketing Group, LLC. (Andrea, Lawrence)
February 24, 2016 Filing 453 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #445 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 23, 2016 Filing 452 DECLARATION filed by Claimant Hany Teylouni re #450 Response to Court Order, #449 Sealed Document, in Further Support of His Claim No, 20 and in Response to the Receiver's Second Supplemental Memorandum. (Zito, Robert)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #448 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Second Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Objection of Hany Teylouni to Receiver's Notice of Determination and Related Exhibits under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/23/16. (JAB)
February 22, 2016 Filing 450 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #438 Scheduling Order, Receiver's Second Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Objection of Hany Teylouni to Receiver's Notice of Determination by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
February 22, 2016 Filing 449 SEALED DOCUMENT re #448 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Second Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Objection of Hany Teylouni to Receiver's Notice of Determination and Related Exhibits under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 22, 2016 Filing 448 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Second Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Objection of Hany Teylouni to Receiver's Notice of Determination and Related Exhibits under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers motion for leave to file sealed documents [Doc. #443] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/19/2016. (KMS)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Blink shall have until March 15, 2016, to supplement its objection with a citation to the documents that support its valuation of its services. It is not necessary for Blink to resubmit the documents. Response to Court due by 3/15/2016.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/10/16. (KKS)
February 9, 2016 Filing 445 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-2C (no redactions), #13 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3D (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-3E (redacted), #18 Exhibit D-3F (redacted), #19 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #20 Exhibit F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 9, 2016 Filing 444 SEALED DOCUMENT re #443 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-2B and D-3A through D-3F to the Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Co by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-3D (unredacted), #12 Exhibit D-3E (unredacted), #13 Exhibit D-3F (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 9, 2016 Filing 443 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-2B and D-3A through D-3F to the Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers motion to withdraw Doc. #437 [Doc. #439] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Doc. #437 is withdrawn. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/9/2016. (KMS)
February 8, 2016 Filing 441 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Status Report (corrected), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 8, 2016 Filing 440 NOTICE Corrected Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Status Report Filed at Docket No. 437: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #439 MOTION to Withdraw #437 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Status Report , #437 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Status Report (Kraft, Kathleen)
February 8, 2016 Filing 439 MOTION to Withdraw #437 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, not later than February 22, 2016, the receiver shall provide to the court the new information referred to in her supplemental memorandum and her correspondence requesting Mr. Teylouni's response. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/8/2016. (KMS)
February 8, 2016 Filing 437 (WITHDRAWN) MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Status Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen) Modified on 2/9/2016 (KMS).
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Sixteenth Interim Status Report [Doc. #416 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Sixteenth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period July 25, 2015, through October 28, 2015, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/29/16. (JAB)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN GRYPHON INVESTMENTS III, LLC AND JOHN S. WEHRLE,GRYPHON INVESTMENTS II, LLC, AND CIRQIT.COM, LLC : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT 1. The Motion [Doc. #428] is GRANTED in its entirety.2. The Agreement is approved. Furthermore, the Receiver is authorized to enter into the Agreement and to consummate the redemption of the Receivership shares in accordance with the terms of the Agreement. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/22/2016. (KMS)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers Application (ECF No. 426) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $219,403.95 to Thompson Coburn LLP; (2) $12,598.55 to Segue Equity Group, LLC; (3) $17,915.78 to CliftonLarsenAllen; (4) $566.43 to Pepper Hamilton LLP; and (5) $2,984.00 to FTL Capital. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/20/2016. (KMS)
January 20, 2016 Filing 433 NOTICE No Objection and Request for Entry of Order on Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #429 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #428 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #430 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibit C to the Receiver's Memorandum of Law in Support of Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/8/16. (JAB)
January 7, 2016 Filing 431 SEALED DOCUMENT re #430 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibit C to the Receiver's Memorandum of Law in Support of Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
January 7, 2016 Filing 430 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibit C to the Receiver's Memorandum of Law in Support of Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
January 7, 2016 Filing 429 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #428 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B-Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-Valuation Report (Redacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
January 7, 2016 Filing 428 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement Between Gryphon Investments III, LLC and John S. Wehrle, Gryphon Investments II, LLC, and Cirqit.com, LLC by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
January 5, 2016 Filing 427 NOTICE No Objection and Request for Entry of Order on Receiver's First Application for Allowance and Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and Professional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #426 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's First Application for Allowance and Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and Professional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Exhibit A))(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 22, 2015 Filing 426 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's First Application for Allowance and Partial Payment of Holdback Amount Pertaining to Legal and Professional Services Rendered by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers fifteenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #419] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $80,139.29 in legal fees and $963.75 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $8,368.46 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $17,814.60 in professional fees and $1,089.00 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/25/2015. (KMS)
November 17, 2015 Filing 424 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #419 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER: THE COURT DOES HEREBY ORDER THAT: 1. The Receivers Motion [Doc. #413 ] is granted in its entirety; and 2. The asset freeze of the Asset Freeze Order is lifted with respect to the Gross Proceeds and Escrow Proceeds (as those terms are defined in the Motion). 3. Upon entry of this order, the Receiver is authorized to distribute the Gross Proceeds to the members of EverGrid Acquisition, LLC, Librato Acquisition II, LLC, and EverGrid/MIC VII, LLC (collectively, the Librato SPVs) in accordance with the ownership percentages identified on the Distribution Schedule. 4. The Receiver is authorized to pay, or reserve for, fees and expenses (which expenses are only estimated at this time and may exceed or fall below the numbers listed in the Distribution Schedule) of the Librato SPVs in accordance with the Distribution Schedule. 5. The Receiver is authorized to distribute the Escrow Proceeds to the members of the Librato SPVs in accordance with the ownership percentages identified on the Distribution Schedule following release of such Escrow Proceeds in accordance with the SolarWindsLibrato Merger Agreement. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/9/15. (JAB)
November 6, 2015 Filing 422 SEALED DOCUMENT re #421 Notice (Other),, by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
November 6, 2015 Filing 421 NOTICE No Outstanding Objection and Request for Entry of Order on Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by Evergrid Acquisition, LLC, Librato Acquisition II, LLC, and Evergrid/MIC VII, LLC: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #413 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by EverGrid Acquisition, LLC, Librato Acquisition II, LLC, and Evergrid/MIC VII, LLC, #415 Sealed Document, #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Proposed Distribution Schedule (redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #417 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-2B through D-3E to the Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/5/15. (KKS)
November 4, 2015 Filing 419 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Time/Invoice Summary), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-2A (no redactions), #14 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #18 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #19 Exhibit D-3D (redacted), #20 Exhibit D-3E (redacted), #21 Exhibit E (Proposed Order), #22 Exhibit F (Previous Fee Applications))(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 4, 2015 Filing 418 SEALED DOCUMENT re #417 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-2B through D-3E to the Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retaine Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-1G (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-1H (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-1I (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #12 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #13 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted), #14 Exhibit D-3D (unredacted), #15 Exhibit D-3E (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 4, 2015 Filing 417 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1I and D-2B through D-3E to the Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 28, 2015 Filing 416 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sixteenth Interim Status Report of Receiver, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Mediation Agreement, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Mediator's Invoice, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 14, 2015 Filing 415 SEALED DOCUMENT re #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 14, 2015 Filing 414 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #413 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by EverGrid Acquisition, LLC, Librato Acquisition II, LLC, and Evergrid/MIC VII, LLC filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-1-Distribution Schedule, #3 Exhibit B-Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 14, 2015 Filing 413 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by EverGrid Acquisition, LLC, Librato Acquisition II, LLC, and Evergrid/MIC VII, LLC by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Fifteenth Interim Status Report [Doc. #402 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Fifteenth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period May 7, 2015, through July 24, 2015, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/29/15. (JAB)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers fourteenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #406 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $107,331.85 in legal fees and $355.80 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $1,263.31 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $6,718.00 in professional fees and $121.00 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receivers reallocation of $82.50 paid to CliftonLarsenAllen LLP from expenses to fees pursuant to the order approving the thirteenth fee application is approved nunc pro tunc. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/2/15. (JAB)
September 1, 2015 Filing 410 NOTICE Receiver's Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Application for the Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #406 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER - In accordance with the joint stipulation entered into between the receiver and UHY Advisors MO, Inc., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that UHY's Objection to Receiver's Notice ofDetermination on Claim No. 16 [Doc. #332 ] is withdrawn. #408 #332 . Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/11/15. (KKS)
August 10, 2015 Filing 408 STIPULATION re #332 Memorandum, Stipulation between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors MO, Inc. Withdrawing UHY Advisors MO, Inc.'s Objection to Determination on Claim No. 16 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #404 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Receiver Claire M Schenk. ORDERED: LEAVE GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/7/2015. (CBL)
August 6, 2015 Filing 406 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Time/Invoice Summaries), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-1J (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-1K (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-1L (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #18 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #19 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #20 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #21 Exhibit D-3D (redacted), #22 Exhibit D-3E (redacted), #23 Exhibit E (Proposed Order), #24 Exhibit F (Previous Fee Applications))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 6, 2015 Filing 405 SEALED DOCUMENT re #404 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3E to the Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal, D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 D-1B (unredacted), #2 D-1C (unredacted), #3 D-1D (unredacted), #4 D-1E (unredacted), #5 D-1F (unredacted), #6 D-1G (unredacted), #7 D-1H (unredacted), #8 D-1I (unredacted), #9 D-1J (unredacted), #10 D-1K (unredacted), #11 D-1L (unredacted), #12 D-2A (unredacted), #13 D-2B (unredacted), #14 D-3A (unredacted), #15 D-3B (unredacted), #16 D-3C (unredacted), #17 D-3D (unredacted), #18 D-3E (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 6, 2015 Filing 404 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3E to the Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion to approve settlement of claims [Doc. #398 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the court approves and confirms the Agreement to Compromise, Settle and Release Claims entered into by the receivership entities and UHY Advisors MO, Inc., Patrick Stark, and Brian Petersen. See Ex. A [Doc. #399 ]. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/27/15. (KKS)
July 24, 2015 Filing 402 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fifteenth Interim Status Report of Receiver, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 21, 2015 Filing 401 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement of Claims: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #398 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement of Claims (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 15, 2015 Filing 400 STIPULATION re #392 Stipulation, Stipulation between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors, MO, Inc. Regarding Extension of Time for Receiver to Respond to UHY Advisors, MO, Inc.'s Objection on Claim No. 16 until 14 Days after the Court's Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement of Claims (ECF No. 398) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
June 26, 2015 Filing 399 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #398 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement of Claims filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 26, 2015 Filing 398 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement of Claims by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
June 19, 2015 Filing 397 NOTICE Receiver's Response to Objection of Blink Marketing, LLC: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #390 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice of Determination), #2 Exhibit B (Notice of Claims Bar Date), #3 Exhibit C (Proof of Claim Form), #4 Exhibit D (Original Claim Filing), #5 Exhibit E (2015 April 16 Letter), #6 Exhibit F (2011 August 2 Email), #7 Exhibit G (2011 August 12 Email), #8 Exhibit H (First Affidavit and Exhibits), #9 Exhibit I (Second Affidavit and Exhibits), #10 Exhibit J (2015 March 3 Letter), #11 Exhibit K (2015 March 24 Letter), #12 Exhibit L (2011 July 27 Email), #13 Exhibit M (2011 August 14 Email), #14 Exhibit N (2011 November 15 Email), #15 Exhibit O (2011 December 23 Email), #16 Exhibit P (Notice of Deficiency), #17 Exhibit Q-1 (2014 December 3 Email and Supplements), #18 Exhibit Q-2, #19 Exhibit Q-3, #20 Exhibit R (2014 December 29 Letter), #21 Exhibit S (Initial Notice of Determination))(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers motion to strike reply of Hany Teylouni as an unauthorized filing [Doc. #348 ] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/18/15. (JAB)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Thirteenth Interim Status Report [Doc. #368 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Thirteenth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period December 5, 2014, through February 4, 2015, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Fourteenth Interim Status Report [Doc. #383 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Fourteenth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period February 5, 2015, through May 6, 2015, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/15/15. (JAB)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers thirteenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #386 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $51,848.98 in legal fees and $531.05 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $3,207.66 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $1,225.00 in professional fees and $568.11 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/15/15. (JAB)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers twelfth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #371 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $46,359.68 in legal fees and $741.30 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $1,792.94 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; (3) $2,398.00 in professional fees to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP; and (4) $1,061.86 in costs to Spencer Fane Britt & Brown, LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/15/15. (JAB)
June 9, 2015 Filing 392 STIPULATION re #382 Stipulation, Stipulation between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors, MO, Inc. Regarding Extension of Time for Receiver to Respond to UHY Advisors, MO, Inc.'s Objection on Claim No. 16 up to and Including July 17, 2015 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
May 27, 2015 Filing 391 NOTICE No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #386 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 20, 2015 Filing 390 NOTICE by Objector Blink Marketing Group, LLC Of it Objection to NOD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-1A, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-2A, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J)(Andrea, Lawrence)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Docket Text ORDER Re: #388 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lawrence W Andrea. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100) by Objector Blink Marketing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/14/2015. (KMS)
May 13, 2015 Receipt 4644049950 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of LAWRENCE W. ANDREA (CCAM)
May 13, 2015 Filing 388 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lawrence W Andrea. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100) by Objector Blink Marketing Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JAB)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #384 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3C to the Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/12/15. (KKS)
May 11, 2015 Filing 386 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #18 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #19 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #20 Exhibit F - Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 11, 2015 Filing 385 SEALED DOCUMENT re #384 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3C to the Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals, Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-1G (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-1H (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-1I (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #12 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #13 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #14 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 11, 2015 Filing 384 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3C to the Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 6, 2015 Filing 383 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fourteenth Interim Status Report of Receiver, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 10, 2015 Filing 382 STIPULATION re #377 Stipulation, Stipulation between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors, MO, Inc. Regarding Extension of Time for Receiver to Respond to UHY Advisors, MO, Inc.'s Objection on Claim No. 16 up to and including June 16, 2015 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
April 9, 2015 Filing 381 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #344 Notice (Other), by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (KMS)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Docket Text ORDER Re: #379 MOTION to Supplement #344 Notice (Other), Receiver's Motion for Permission to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Objection of Hany Teylouni to Receiver's Notice of Determination and Memorandum in Support of the Motion by Receiver Claire M Schenk; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/9/2015. (KMS)
April 8, 2015 Filing 379 MOTION to Supplement #344 Notice (Other), Receiver's Motion for Permission to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Objection of Hany Teylouni to Receiver's Notice of Determination and Memorandum in Support of the Motion by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Objection of Hany Teylouni to Receiver's Notice of Determination)(Kraft, Kathleen)
March 19, 2015 Filing 378 MEMORANDUM re #337 Memorandum,, Regarding and Request for Abeyance of Objection of Hany Teylouni to Receiver's Notice of Determination by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
March 4, 2015 Filing 377 STIPULATION re #365 Stipulation, Stipulation Between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors MO, Inc. Regarding Extension of Time for Receiver to Respond to UHY Advisors MO, Inc.'s Objection to Determination on Claim No. 16 up to and including April 14, 2015 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
March 3, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #371 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #372 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibit D-3A to the Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/17/15. (JAB)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #369 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1F, D-2A, D-4A, and D-4B to the Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/17/15. (JAB)
February 16, 2015 Filing 373 SEALED DOCUMENT re #372 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibit D-3A to the Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Und Exhibit D-3A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
February 16, 2015 Filing 372 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibit D-3A to the Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 16, 2015 Filing 371 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Fourth Qtr SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Invoice/Time Summary), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-2A, #11 Exhibit D-2B, #12 Exhibit D-2C, #13 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-3B, #15 Exhibit D-4A (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-4B (redacted), #17 Exhibit E (Proposed Order), #18 Exhibit F (Summary of Previous Fee Applications))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 16, 2015 Filing 370 SEALED DOCUMENT re #369 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1F, D-2A, D-4A, and D-4B to the Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-4A (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-4B (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 16, 2015 Filing 369 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-1F, D-2A, D-4A, and D-4B to the Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 4, 2015 Filing 368 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Thirteenth Interim Status Report of Receiver), #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers eleventh interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #361] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $68,767.37 in legal fees and $255.50 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $1,651.95 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; (3) $13,196.00 in professional fees and $357.16 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP; and (4) $580.98 in costs to Spencer Fane Britt & Brown, LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/7/2015. (KMS) (Main Document 367 replaced on 2/4/2015) (KMS).
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Twelfth Interim Status Report [Doc. #358] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Twelfth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period August 13, 2014 through December 4, 2014, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/7/2015. (KMS)
January 1, 2015 Filing 365 STIPULATION re #357 Stipulation, Stipulation Between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors MO, Inc. Regarding Extension of Time for Receiver to Respond to UHY Advisors MO, Inc.'s Objection to Determination on Claim No. 16 up to and including March 9, 2015 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
December 29, 2014 Filing 364 NOTICE No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Eleventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #361 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Eleventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 16, 2014 Filing 363 NOTICE Amendment by Interlineation of the Twelfth Interim Status Report of Receiver: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #358 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Twelfth Interim Status Report (Kraft, Kathleen)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Docket Text ORDER Re: #359 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Eleventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/9/2014. (KMS)
December 4, 2014 Filing 361 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Eleventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Time/Invoice Summaries), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-4A (redacted), #16 Exhibit E (Proposed Order), #17 Exhibit F (Previous Fee Applications))(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 4, 2014 Filing 360 SEALED DOCUMENT re #359 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Eleventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Pr D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 D-1B (unredacted), #2 D-1C (unredacted), #3 D-1D (unredacted), #4 D-1E (unredacted), #5 D-1F (unredacted), #6 D-2A (unredacted), #7 D-2B (unredacted), #8 D-2C (unredacted), #9 D-3A (unredacted), #10 D-3B (unredacted), #11 D-4A (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 4, 2014 Filing 359 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Eleventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 4, 2014 Filing 358 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Twelfth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Twelfth Interim Status Report, #2 Exhibit 1 to Interim Status Report, #3 Exhibit 2 to Interim Status Report, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 2, 2014 Filing 357 STIPULATION re #346 Order, #356 Stipulation, #334 Stipulation, #345 Stipulation, #335 Order Stipulation Between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors MO, Inc. Regarding Extension of Time for Receiver to Respond to UHY Advisors MO, Inc.'s Objection to Determination on Claim No. 16 up to and including January 6, 2015 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
October 31, 2014 Filing 356 STIPULATION re #346 Order, #334 Stipulation, #345 Stipulation, #335 Order Stipulation Between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors MO, Inc. Regarding Extension of Time for Receiver to Respond to UHY Advisors MO, Inc.'s Objection to Determination on Claim No. 16 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of claimant Hany Teylouni for leave to file reply [Doc. #350 ] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/27/14. (KJS)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Eleventh Interim Status Report [Doc. #338] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Eleventh Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. ORDER granting #338 Motion for Leave to Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/25/2014. (KMS)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers tenth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #341] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $61,048.42 in legal fees and $140.27 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $6,701.97 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $5,546.00 in professional fees and $453.72 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. ORDER granting #341 Motion for Leave to Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/25/2014. (KMS)
September 23, 2014 Filing 352 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #341 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Tenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Receiver's Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Tenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
September 23, 2014 Filing 351 Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Reply of Hany Teylouni and Receiver's Opposition to Motion Nunc Pro Tunc of Hany Teylouni for Permission to File Reply in Support of Mr. Teylouni's Objection to Receiver's Notice of Determination by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #350 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Mr. Teylouni's Objection to Receiver's Notice of Determination, #349 Response to Motion, (Kraft, Kathleen) Modified text on 9/24/2014 (KKS).
September 16, 2014 Filing 350 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Mr. Teylouni's Objection to Receiver's Notice of Determination by Claimant Hany Teylouni. (Zito, Robert)
September 16, 2014 Filing 349 RESPONSE to Motion re #348 MOTION to Strike #347 Memorandum Reply of Hany Teylouni as an Unauthorized Filing Under This Court's Order on Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date, Approve Manner and Form of Notice of Claims Bar Date and Approve Process for Submitting Cla filed by Claimant Hany Teylouni. (Zito, Robert)
September 9, 2014 Filing 348 MOTION to Strike #347 Memorandum Reply of Hany Teylouni as an Unauthorized Filing Under This Court's Order on Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date, Approve Manner and Form of Notice of Claims Bar Date and Approve Process for Submitting Claims, as Amended, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
September 5, 2014 Filing 347 MEMORANDUM re #337 Memorandum,, #344 Notice (Other), /Reply of in Support of Hany Teylouni's Objection to Receiver's Notice of Determination by Claimant Hany Teylouni. (Zito, Robert)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver is granted an extension of time until November 10, 2014, to file her response to the objection filed by UHY. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/4/14. (KJS)
September 2, 2014 Filing 345 STIPULATION re #334 Stipulation, #335 Order Stipulation Between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors MO, Inc. Regarding Extension of Time for Receiver to Respond to UHY Advisors MO, Inc.'s Objection to Determination on Claim No. 16 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
September 2, 2014 Filing 344 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #337 Memorandum,, Receiver's Response to Objection of Hany Teylouni (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit I-1, #11 Exhibit I-2, #12 Exhibit I-3, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit J-1, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O)(Kraft, Kathleen)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER - #326 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's ninth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #326] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $92,208.67 in legal fees and $240.61 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $3,613.54 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $5,159.80 in professional fees to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/2/14. (KKS)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #339 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document filed by Claire M Schenk; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/14/14. (KJS)
August 13, 2014 Filing 341 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Tenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Time/Invoice Summary (redacted), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3D (redacted), #17 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, #18 Exhibit F- Description of Prior Fee Applications)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 13, 2014 Filing 340 SEALED DOCUMENT re #339 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits C and D-1A through D-3D to the Receiver's Tenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1A (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #12 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted), #13 Exhibit D-3D (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 13, 2014 Filing 339 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits C and D-1A through D-3D to the Receiver's Tenth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 12, 2014 Filing 338 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Eleventh Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eleventh Interim Status Report, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 31, 2014 Filing 337 MEMORANDUM re #234 Order - Hany Teylouni's Objection to Receiver's Notice of Determination by Claimant Hany Teylouni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Notice of Determination, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence to reeciver detailing reason for Mr. Teyloun's objection, #3 Exhibit C - Mr. Teylouni's Proof of Claim for, with supporting documentation, #4 Exhibit D - Certification submitted by Mr. Teyloumi to the Receiver in response to the Reeciver's request for same)(Zito, Robert)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Ninth Interim Status Report [Doc. #315 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Ninth Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Tenth Interim Status Report [Doc. #328 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Tenth Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/24/14. (KJS)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver is granted an extension of time until September 15, 2014, to file her response to the objection filed by UHY. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/24/14. (KJS)
July 12, 2014 Filing 334 STIPULATION re #332 Memorandum, #234 Order, #278 Order on Motion for Extension, between Receiver Claire M. Schenk and UHY Advisors MO, Inc. Regarding UHY Advisors MO, Inc.'s Objection to Determination on Claim No. 16 and extension of time for receiver to respond to objection. by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #331 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Anton Roselius, #330 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. King filed by UHY Advisors MO, Inc; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/11/14. (KJS)
June 10, 2014 Filing 332 (WITHDRAWN per Order #409 ) MEMORANDUM re #234 Order - UHY's Objection To Receiver's Notice Of Determination On Claim No. 16 - by Claimant UHY Advisors MO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Deficiency, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Receiver re Claim No. 16, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Determination)(King, Jonathan) Modified on 8/11/2015 (KKS).
June 10, 2014 Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Anton Roselius. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4361018) by Claimant UHY Advisors MO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Roselius, Joseph)
June 10, 2014 Filing 330 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. King. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4361007) by Claimant UHY Advisors MO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(King, Jonathan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 329 NOTICE Receiver's Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Ninth Interim Application for the Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #326 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Ninth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 22, 2014 Filing 328 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Tenth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tenth Interim Status Report of Receiver, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Docket Text ORDER Re: #324 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits C and D-1A through D-3E to the Receiver's Ninth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/22/2014. (KMS)
May 20, 2014 Filing 326 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Ninth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Invoice/Time Summary (redacted), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3D (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-3E (redacted), #18 Exhibit E - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 20, 2014 Filing 325 SEALED DOCUMENT re #324 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits C and D-1A through D-3E to the Receiver's Ninth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1A (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-1F (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #12 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted), #13 Exhibit D-3D (unredacted), #14 Exhibit D-3E (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 20, 2014 Filing 324 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits C and D-1A through D-3E to the Receiver's Ninth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's eighth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #318 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $111,320.07 in legal fees and $123.77 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $764.14 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $10,287.20 in professional fees to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/9/14. (KKS)
April 8, 2014 Filing 322 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #318 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Eighth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of Order on Receiver's Eighth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers motion for leave to sell preferred and common shares of Pollen, Inc., [Doc. #293 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver is authorized to sell the receiverships Preferred Stock and Common Stock in Pollen, Inc. to Pollen, Inc. on the terms and conditions set forth in the motion and in Exhibit A to the motion. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/2/14. (KJS)
April 2, 2014 Filing 320 NOTICE No Outstanding Objection and Request for Entry of Order on Receiver's Motion for Sale of Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc.: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #294 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Claire M. Schenk), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #316 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document filed by Claire M Schenk; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/17/14. (KJS)
March 14, 2014 Filing 318 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Eighth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Time Summary), #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-3C (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3D (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-3E (redacted), #18 Exhibit D-3F (redacted), #19 Exhibit E (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
March 14, 2014 Filing 317 SEALED DOCUMENT re #316 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3F to the Receiver's Eighth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Prof (Exhibit D-1A (unredacted) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D-1C (unredacted), #3 Exhibit D-1D (unredacted), #4 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #5 Exhibit D-1E (unredacted), #6 Exhibit D-2A (unredacted), #7 Exhibit D-2B (unredacted), #8 Exhibit D-2C (unredacted), #9 Exhibit D-3A (unredacted), #10 Exhibit D-3B (unredacted), #11 Exhibit D-3C (unredacted), #12 Exhibit D-3D (unredacted), #13 Exhibit D-3E (unredacted), #14 Exhibit D-3F (unredacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
March 14, 2014 Filing 316 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for Leave to File Exhibits D-1A through D-3F to the Receiver's Eighth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
March 10, 2014 Filing 315 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Order Approving and Confirming Receiver's Ninth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Receiver's Ninth Interim Status Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 314 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT BURTON DOUGLAS MORRISS - (See order for full details). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/26/14. (KJS)
February 24, 2014 Filing 313 Plaintiffs NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Securities and Exchange Commission of Claims for Disgorgement, Prejudgment Interest and Civil Penalties (Levenson, Robert)
February 24, 2014 Filing 312 NOTICE Filing Consent of Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss to Final Judgment and Request for Entry of Judgment: by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levenson, Robert)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of Mike McDaniel to intervene [Doc. #300 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/14/14. (KJS)
February 4, 2014 Filing 310 RESPONSE to Motion re #300 MOTION to Intervene McDaniel's Response to Receivor's Renewed Request filed by Objector Mike McDaniel. (Corwin, David)
January 30, 2014 Filing 309 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #294 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #293 MOTION for Leave to Sell Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc., #299 Memorandum in Support of Motion, of Request for Consideration of and Entry of Order on Receiver's Motion for Sale of Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
January 2, 2014 Filing 308 SURREPLY to Motion re #300 MOTION to Intervene filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (KJS)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #306 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply filed by Claire M Schenk; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/2/14. (KJS)
December 30, 2013 Filing 306 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to Reply Brief in Support of Mike McDaniel's Motion to Intervene and Request for Information (Dkt. No. 305) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Sur-reply), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 20, 2013 Filing 305 REPLY to Response to Motion re #300 MOTION to Intervene and Request for Information filed by Objector Mike McDaniel. (Corwin, David)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Eighth Interim Status Report [Doc. #286 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Eighth Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/13/13. (KJS)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers seventh interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #289 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $98,842.42 in legal fees and $709.09 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $1,639.35 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $20,055.20 in professional fees and $110.79 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/13/13. (KJS)
December 13, 2013 Filing 302 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #300 MOTION to Intervene and Request for Information Regarding Receiver's Motion for Sale of Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc. filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 4, 2013 Filing 301 MEMORANDUM re #293 MOTION for Leave to Sell Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc. REQUEST FOR INFORMATION by Objector Mike McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Declaration of Mike McDaniel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Declaration of David Corwin)(Corwin, David)
December 4, 2013 Filing 300 MOTION to Intervene by Objector Mike McDaniel. (Corwin, David)
November 27, 2013 Filing 299 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #293 MOTION for Leave to Sell Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc. Supplemental Memorandum Regarding the Receiver's Motion to Sell Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc. and Request for the Court to Hold the Receiver's Motion in Abeyance Pending a Further Filing by the Receiver filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
November 20, 2013 Filing 298 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Eighth Interim Status Report: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #286 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Eighth Interim Status Report (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 20, 2013 Filing 297 NOTICE of No Objection and Request for Entry of Order on Receiver's Seventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #289 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Seventh Interim Application for the Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 15, 2013 Filing 296 ENTRY of Appearance by David S. Corwin for Objector Mike McDaniel. (Corwin, David)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion for leave to file sealed document [Doc. #291 ] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/15/13. (KKS)
November 14, 2013 Filing 294 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #293 MOTION for Leave to Sell Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc. filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stock Redemption Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Valuation Report (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 14, 2013 Filing 293 MOTION for Leave to Sell Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc. by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
November 14, 2013 Filing 292 SEALED DOCUMENT re #291 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit B to the Receiver's Memorandum of Law in Support of Receiver's Motion for Sale of Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc.) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
November 14, 2013 Filing 291 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit B to the Receiver's Memorandum of Law in Support of Receiver's Motion for Sale of Preferred and Common Shares of Pollen, Inc.) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Docket Text ORDER: #287 GRANTING MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D1A-D3A to Receiver's Seventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/12/13. (KKS)
November 8, 2013 Filing 289 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Seventh Interim Application for the Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-SFAR, #2 Exhibit B-Certification, #3 Exhibit C-Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (Redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (Redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (Redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (Redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (Redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (Redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (Redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (Redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (Redacted), #13 Exhibit D-2A (Redacted), #14 Exhibit D-2B (Redacted), #15 Exhibit D-2C (Redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3A (Redacted), #17 Text of Proposed Order (Exhibit E))(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 8, 2013 Filing 288 SEALED DOCUMENT re #287 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D1A-D3A to Receiver's Seventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals (Exhibit D-1A) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B, #2 Exhibit D-1C, #3 Exhibit D-1D, #4 Exhibit D-1E, #5 Exhibit D-1F, #6 Exhibit D-1G, #7 Exhibit D-1H, #8 Exhibit D-1I, #9 Exhibit D-2A, #10 Exhibit D-2B, #11 Exhibit D-2C, #12 Exhibit D-3A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
November 8, 2013 Filing 287 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D1A-D3A to Receiver's Seventh Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel, and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
October 31, 2013 Filing 286 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Eighth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eighth Interim Status Report, #2 Exhibit 1 to Status Report, #3 Exhibit 2 to Status Report, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #283 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Burton Douglas Morriss; GRANTED - SO ORDERED (Attorney Catherine L. Hanaway terminated.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/3/13. (KJS)
September 3, 2013 Filing 284 ENTRY of Appearance by John R. Ashcroft for Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Ashcroft, John)
August 30, 2013 Filing 283 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
August 28, 2013 Filing 282 MEMORANDUM re #278 Order on Motion for Extension, Certificate of Service of Order by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers sixth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #272 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $156,914.06 in legal fees and $6,044.81 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $7,961.20 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $6,606.14 in professional fees and $7.17 in costs to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. ORDER granting #272 Motion for Leave to Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/27/2013. (KMS)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Seventh Interim Status Report [Doc. #264] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Seventh Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. ORDER granting #264 Motion for Leave to Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/27/2013. (KMS)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Sixth Interim Status Report [Doc. #260] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Sixth Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. ORDER granting #260 Motion for Leave to Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/27/2013. (KMS)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #276 Motion to Amend Claims Bar Date Order #234 to Extend Certain Claims Procedures Deadlines and Otherwise Establish Specific Dates for the Remaining Claims Procedures Deadlines (SEE ORDER FOR PARTICULARS) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/22/13. (KKS)
August 20, 2013 Filing 277 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #271 Sealed Document,, #272 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Sixth Interim Application for the Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of Order on Receiver's Sixth Interim Application for the Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 14, 2013 Filing 276 MOTION for Extension of: Motion to Amend Claims Bar Date Order to Extend Certain Claims Procedures Deadlines and Otherwise Establish Specific Dates for the Remaining Claims Procedures Deadlines by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT BURTON DOUGLAS MORRISS re: #274 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent of Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss to Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief and Request for Entry of Judgment filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. See order for full details. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/13/13. (KJS)
August 13, 2013 Filing 274 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consent of Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss to Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief and Request for Entry of Judgment by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent and Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levenson, Robert)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #270 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document filed by Claire M Schenk; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/9/13. (KJS)
August 8, 2013 Filing 272 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Sixth Interim Application for the Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Summary), #4 Exhibit D-1A (Redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (Redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (Redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (Redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (Redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (Redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (Redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (Redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (Redacted), #13 Exhibit D-1J (Redacted), #14 Exhibit D-1K (Redacted), #15 Exhibit D-2A (Redacted), #16 Exhibit D-3A (Redacted), #17 Exhibit E (Proposed Order))(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 8, 2013 Filing 271 SEALED DOCUMENT re #270 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibits D1A-D3A to the Receiver's Sixth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) (Exhibit D-1A) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1B, #2 Exhibit D-1C, #3 Exhibit D-1D, #4 Exhibit D-1E, #5 Exhibit D-1F, #6 Exhibit D-1G, #7 Exhibit D-1H, #8 Exhibit D-1I, #9 Exhibit D-1J, #10 Exhibit D-1K, #11 Exhibit D-2A, #12 Exhibit D-3A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
August 8, 2013 Filing 270 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibits D1A-D3A to the Receiver's Sixth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion for leave to file sealed document [Doc. #265 ] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 07/19/2013. (DJO)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's fifth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #258 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $139,479.56 in legal fees and $4,519.33 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $13,948.14 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; (3) $18,677.60 in professional fees and $2,024.65 to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 07/15/2013. (DJO)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receiver's motion for order approving and confirming the Fifth Interim Status Report [Doc. #255 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Fifth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period since March 1, 2013, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 07/15/2013. (DJO)
July 12, 2013 Filing 266 SEALED DOCUMENT re #264 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Approve Seventh Interim Status Report of Receiver, #265 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit 1 to Seventh Interim Status Report of Receiver) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
July 12, 2013 Filing 265 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit 1 to Seventh Interim Status Report of Receiver) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 12, 2013 Filing 264 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Approve Seventh Interim Status Report of Receiver by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Seventh Interim Status Report, #2 Exhibit 1 to Report (Redacted), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
July 8, 2013 Filing 263 NOTICE No Objection and Request for Entry of Order on Receiver's Fifth Interim Application for the Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals: by Receiver Claire M Schenk re #258 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Fifth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #241 Motion for Return of Property - THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT 1. The Receivers Motion is granted in its entirety; and 2. The asset freeze of the Asset Freeze Order is lifted with respect to the First Escrow Funds and the Final Escrow Funds. 3. Reliance Bank is directed to grant the Receiver control over the IA Reliance Bank Account and the funds and assets of such account and to distribute such funds as directed by the Receiver. 4. The Receiver is authorized to distribute the remaining First Escrow Funds to intended investor distributes of IA in accordance with the Schedule of Proposed Distribution attached to the OShaughnessy Declaration. 5. The Receivers payment of, or reservation for, fees and expenses (which expenses are only estimated at this time and may exceed or fall below the numbers listed in the Schedule of Proposed Distribution) of the Integrien SPVs, AMP and Integrien Capital II from the Final Escrow Funds in accordance with the Schedule of Proposed Distribution attached to the OShaughnessy Declaration is approved. 6. The Receiver is authorized to distribute the Final Escrow Funds, minus fees and expenses, to (i) the investors in IA and IAII, (ii) AMP and Integrien Capital II (for carried interest) and (iii) the investors in and managing member of AMP and Integrien Capital II in accordance with the Schedule of Proposed Distribution attached to the OShaughnessy Declaration. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/25/13. (KJS)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the objection of Ameet Patel to the receiver's motion for authorization to distribute funds held by the Integrien entities is overruled. #246 . Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/25/13. (KKS)
June 21, 2013 Filing 260 MOTION for Leave to Enter Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Sixth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sixth Interim Status Report, #2 Exhibit A-1 to Sixth Interim Status Report, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #256 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-3B to the Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application Under Seal filed by Claire M Schenk; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/20/13. (KJS)
June 19, 2013 Filing 258 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Fifth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- First Quarter SFAR, #2 Exhibit B -- Certification, #3 Exhibit C -- Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit D-1A (redacted), #5 Exhibit D-1B (redacted), #6 Exhibit D-1C (redacted), #7 Exhibit D-1D (redacted), #8 Exhibit D-1E (redacted), #9 Exhibit D-1F (redacted), #10 Exhibit D-1G (redacted), #11 Exhibit D-1H (redacted), #12 Exhibit D-1I (redacted), #13 Exhibit D-1J (redacted), #14 Exhibit D-2A (redacted), #15 Exhibit D-2B (redacted), #16 Exhibit D-2C (redacted), #17 Exhibit D-3A (redacted), #18 Exhibit D-3B (redacted), #19 Exhibit E -- Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 19, 2013 Filing 257 SEALED DOCUMENT re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-3B to the Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1A, #2 Exhibit D-1B, #3 Exhibit D-1C, #4 Exhibit D-1D, #5 Exhibit D-1E, #6 Exhibit D-1F, #7 Exhibit D-1G, #8 Exhibit D-1H, #9 Exhibit D-1I, #10 Exhibit D-1J, #11 Exhibit D-2A, #12 Exhibit D-2B, #13 Exhibit D-2C, #14 Exhibit D-3A, #15 Exhibit D-3B)(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 19, 2013 Filing 256 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-3B to the Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
June 18, 2013 Filing 255 MOTION for Leave to Enter Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Fifth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fifth Interim Status Report, #2 Exhibit A-1 to Status Report, #3 Exhibit A-2 to Status Report, #4 Exhibit A-3 to Status Report, #5 Exhibit A-4 to Status Report, #6 Exhibit A-5 to Status Report, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers fourth interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #239 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $122,580.20 in legal fees and $872.57 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $3,584.61 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; (3) $560.00 in professional fees to FTL Capital, LLC; and (4) $1,526.80 in professional fees CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/30/13. (KJS)
May 28, 2013 Filing 253 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Fourth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals (filed 4/22/2013) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 28, 2013 Filing 252 REPLY to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by Integrien Acquisition, LLC and Integrien Acquisition II, LLC filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B AMP Operating Agreement)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #250 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Securities and Exchange Commission; GRANTED - SO ORDERED (Attorney Adam L. Schwartz terminated.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/28/13. (KJS)
May 24, 2013 Filing 250 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Adam L. Schwartz by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
May 21, 2013 Filing 249 NOTICE Limited Appearance: by Objector Ameet Patel (Zito, Robert)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #245 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert J.A. Zito filed by Ameet Patel; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/21/13. (KJS)
May 16, 2013 Filing 247 DECLARATION filed by Objector Ameet Patel re #241 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by Integrien Acquisition, LLC and Integrien Acquisition II, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - March 19, 2009 Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dated December 8, 2011, #4 Certificate of Service)(Zito, Robert)
May 16, 2013 Filing 246 RESPONSE to Motion re #241 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by Integrien Acquisition, LLC and Integrien Acquisition II, LLC filed by Objector Ameet Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zito, Robert)
May 16, 2013 Filing 245 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert J.A. Zito. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-3815312) by Objector Ameet Patel. (Zito, Robert)
May 3, 2013 Filing 244 SEALED DOCUMENT re #242 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Unredacted Copy of Exhibit A-1 to Memorandum in Support of Motion by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
May 3, 2013 Filing 243 SEALED DOCUMENT re #242 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Unredacted Copy of Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Motion by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
May 3, 2013 Filing 242 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #241 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by Integrien Acquisition, LLC and Integrien Acquisition II, LLC filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A / Declaration (Redacted), #2 Exhibit A-1 / Schedule of Proposed Distribution (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B / Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 3, 2013 Filing 241 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Authorization to Distribute Funds Held by Integrien Acquisition, LLC and Integrien Acquisition II, LLC by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Docket Text ORDER Re: #239 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Fourth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk., #237 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/23/2013. (KMS)
April 22, 2013 Filing 239 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Fourth Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fourth Quarter SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C-1 - Invoice Summary, #4 Exhibit C-2 - Aggregate Summary of Fees, #5 Exhibit D-1A, #6 Exhibit D-1B, #7 Exhibit D-1C, #8 Exhibit D-1D, #9 Exhibit D-1E, #10 Exhibit D-1F, #11 Exhibit D-1G, #12 Exhibit D-1H, #13 Exhibit D-1I, #14 Exhibit D2-A, #15 Exhibit D-2B, #16 Exhibit D-3A, #17 Exhibit D-4A, #18 Exhibit E - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 22, 2013 Filing 238 SEALED DOCUMENT re #237 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1A, #2 Exhibit D-1B, #3 Exhibit D-1C, #4 Exhibit D-1D, #5 Exhibit D-1E, #6 Exhibit D-1F, #7 Exhibit D-1G, #8 Exhibit D-1H, #9 Exhibit D-1I, #10 Exhibit D-2A, #11 Exhibit D-2B, #12 Exhibit D-3A, #13 Exhibit D-4A)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 22, 2013 Filing 237 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Fourth Interim Status Report [Doc. #232] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Fourth Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period since August 14, 2012, and every act and transaction reportedtherein, are approved and confirmed. ORDER granting #232 Motion for Leave to Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/16/2013. (KMS)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel production ofdocuments from defendant Burton Douglas Morriss [Doc. #128 ] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/4/13. (KKS)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #214 MOTION to Establish Claims Bar Date, Approve Manner and Form of Notice of Claims Bar Date and Approve Process for Submitting Claims filed by Claire M Schenk. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/4/13. (KKS)
March 1, 2013 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 12, 2013 (DKT. NO. #228 ) REGARDING Motion re #214 MOTION for Relief /Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date, Approve Manner and Form of Notice of Claims Bar Date and Approve Process for Submitting Claims and in Response to Court's Order dated February 12, 2013 filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Amended Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-1: Redline to Original Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B: Amended Bar Date Notice, #4 Exhibit B-1: Redline to Original Bar Date Notice, #5 Exhibit C: Amended Proof of Claim Form, #6 Exhibit C-1: Redline to Original Proof of Claim Form, #7 Exhibit D: Amended Bar Date Publication Notice, #8 Exhibit D-1: Redline to Original Bar Date Publication Notice, #9 Exhibit E: Form Notice of Deficiency, #10 Exhibit F; Form Notice of Determination)(Kraft, Kathleen) Modified on 3/4/2013 - edit text(KKS).
March 1, 2013 Filing 232 MOTION for Leave to Enter Receiver's Motion for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Fourth Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Fourth Interim Status Report, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Text of Proposed Order A-5)(Lamping, Brian)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion for order lifting stay [Doc. #229 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay on prosecuting actions which involve the receiver or the receivership property included in the January 17, 2012 Order Appointing Receiver, is lifted for the purposes of the interpleader action, Federal Insurance Company v. Schenk et al., No. 4:12-CV-2117 HEA. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 02/28/2013; (DJO)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for order to show cause [Doc. #119 ] is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel production [Doc. #147 ] is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for sanctions [Doc. #201 ] is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion and amended motion for protective order [Docs. #194 and #196 ] are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 02/20/2013; (DJO)
February 14, 2013 Filing 229 Joint MOTION to Lift Stay to Permit Prosecution of Complaint for Interpleader of Insurance Policy Proceeds Against Receiver by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Lamping, Brian)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver shall have until March 1, 2013 to file a supplemental memorandum in support of her motion to establish claims bar date [Doc. #214 ] that addresses the issues discussed above. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 02/12/2013; (DJO)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's third interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #221 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $120,819.00 in legal fees and $1,125.63 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $8,133.30 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; (3) $560.00 in professional fees to FTL Capital, LLC; and (4) $34,055.59 in professional fees and $105.45 in expenses to CliftonLarsonAllen LLP. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 02/11/2013; (DJO)
February 5, 2013 Filing 226 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk of Amendment by Interlineation of Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals (Lamping, Brian)
January 28, 2013 Filing 225 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk of No Objection and Request for Entry of an order on Receiver's Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Prposed Order)(Lamping, Brian)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 AMENDED ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Second Interim Status Report [Doc. #134 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Second Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the order entered on May 7, 2012 [Doc. #159 ] is stricken. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/8/13. (KJS)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Docket Text ORDER Re: #221 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/26/2012. (KMS)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Docket Text ORDER Re: #219 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/26/2012. (KMS)
December 21, 2012 Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ex. A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit D-1A, #7 Exhibit D-1B, #8 Exhibit D-1C, #9 Exhibit D-1D, #10 Exhibit D-1E, #11 Exhibit D-1F, #12 Exhibit D-1G, #13 Exhibit D-1H, #14 Exhibit D-1I, #15 Exhibit D-2A, #16 Exhibit D-2B, #17 Exhibit D-2C, #18 Exhibit D-3A, #19 Exhibit D-4A, #20 Exhibit E- Proposed Order)(Higgins, Stephen)
December 21, 2012 Filing 220 SEALED DOCUMENT re #219 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1A, #2 Exhibit D-1B, #3 Exhibit D-1C, #4 Exhibit D-1D, #5 Exhibit D-1E, #6 Exhibit D-1F, #7 Exhibit D-1G, #8 Exhibit D-1H, #9 Exhibit D-1I, #10 Exhibit D-2A, #11 Exhibit D-2B, #12 Exhibit D-2C, #13 Exhibit D-3A, #14 Exhibit D-4A)(Higgins, Stephen)
December 21, 2012 Filing 219 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits D-1A through D-4A to the Receiver's Third Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals Under Seal by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Higgins, Stephen)
December 17, 2012 Filing 218 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date, Approve Manner and Form of Notice of Claims Bar Date and Approve Process for Submitting Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Bar Date Notice, #3 Exhibit C-Proposed Proof of Claim Form, #4 Exhibit D-Proposed Bar Date Publication Notice)(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 14, 2012 Filing 217 SUBPOENA of Deposition Returned Executed as to Defendant. (Hanaway, Catherine)
December 14, 2012 Filing 216 SUBPOENA of Deposition Returned Executed as to Defendant. (Hanaway, Catherine)
December 3, 2012 Filing 215 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #214 MOTION for Relief /Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date, Approve Manner and Form of Notice of Claims Bar Date and Approve Process for Submitting Claims filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Bar Date Notice, #3 Exhibit C-Proposed Proof of Claim Form, #4 Exhibit D-Proposed Bar Date Publication Notice)(Kraft, Kathleen)
December 3, 2012 Filing 214 MOTION for Relief /Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date, Approve Manner and Form of Notice of Claims Bar Date and Approve Process for Submitting Claims by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's second interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #190 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $196,305.12 in legal fees and $1,526.68 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $25,433.08 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; and (3) $10,076.00 in professional fees for FTL Capital, LLC.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/28/12. (KKS)
November 27, 2012 Filing 212 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk Receiver's Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Second Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Profesionals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lamping, Brian)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #210 MOTION for Extension of: Time to file Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam); ORDERED GRANTED; Extension up to and including November 9, 2012; Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/25/2012; (DJO)
October 24, 2012 Filing 210 MOTION for Extension of: Time to file Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of Morriss Holdings, LLC, for an extension of time to file an answer [Doc. #207 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Morriss Holdings, LLC, shall have until November 30, 2012, to file its answer. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/12/12. (KJS)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC, [Doc. #197 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC, shall have until November 16, 2012 to obtain new counsel to represent it in this action and file an entry of appearance. ( Response to Court due by 11/16/2012.) (Attorney David S. Corwin and Vicki L. Little terminated.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/12/12. (KJS)
October 11, 2012 Filing 207 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
October 5, 2012 Filing 206 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Burton Douglas Morriss.(Hanaway, Catherine)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #203 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Morriss Holdings, LLC; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. (answer due 10/12/2012.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/5/12. (KJS)
October 4, 2012 Filing 204 SURREPLY by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission re #196 Amended Motion for Protective Order; #201 , #202 REPLY to Response to Motion Reply to Morriss Holidngs' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions ; (Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 10/5/2012 - Edit text, added link to Motion for Sanctions; Per chambers, surreply can be filed.(KKS).
October 4, 2012 Filing 203 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
October 2, 2012 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re #196 Amended MOTION for Protective Order and request for instructions from the Court filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
September 25, 2012 Filing 201 Motion for Sanctions / RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 Amended MOTION for Protective Order and request for instructions from the Court and Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email, #2 Exhibit Email, #3 Exhibit Statement of Nonappearance)(Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 10/5/2012 - Document filed as a Response should have been filed as a Motion for Sanctions(KKS).
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of relief defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC, to dismiss or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement [Doc. #83 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant Burton Douglas Morriss to dismiss or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement [Doc. #86 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/21/12. (KJS)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivers first interim application for fees and expenses [Doc. #155 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following fees and expenses are allowed and the receiver is authorized to make the following payments out of the assets of the receivership estate: (1) $301,266.96 in legal fees and $21,158.67 in costs to Thompson Coburn, LLP; (2) $12,724.61 in professional fees to Segue Equity Group; (3) $4,531.46 in legal fees and costs for Pepper Hamilton, LLP; and (4) $12,676.00 in professional fees for FTL Capital, LLC. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/20/12. (KJS)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Third Interim Status Report [Doc. #189 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Third Interim Status Report of the Receiver for the period since April 20, 2012, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/19/12. (KJS)
September 18, 2012 Filing 197 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Sher Corwin Winters LLC; David S. Corwin; Vicki L. Little by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
September 18, 2012 Filing 196 Amended MOTION for Protective Order and request for instructions from the Court by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
September 18, 2012 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #194 MOTION for Protective Order and request for instructions from the Court filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Corwin, David)
September 18, 2012 Filing 194 MOTION for Protective Order and request for instructions from the Court by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Docket Text ORDER Re: #191 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Documents (Exhibits A through D-3A to the Receiver's Second Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurrred by the Reciever, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) by Receiver Claire M Schenk ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/17/2012. (KMS)
September 14, 2012 Filing 192 SEALED DOCUMENT re #191 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Documents (Exhibits A through D-3A to the Receiver's Second Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurrred by the Reciever, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) (Exhibit A) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D-1A, #4 Exhibit D-1B, #5 Exhibit D-1C, #6 Exhibit D-1D, #7 Exhibit D-1E, #8 Exhibit D-1F, #9 Exhibit D-1G, #10 Exhibit D-1H, #11 Exhibit D-2A, #12 Exhibit D-2B, #13 Exhibit D-3A)(Lamping, Brian)
September 14, 2012 Filing 191 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Documents (Exhibits A through D-3A to the Receiver's Second Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurrred by the Reciever, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Lamping, Brian)
September 14, 2012 Filing 190 MOTION for Leave to File Receiver's Second Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1A, #5 Exhibit D-1B, #6 Exhibit D-1C, #7 Exhibit D-1D, #8 Exhibit D-1E, #9 Exhibit D-1F, #10 Exhibit D-1G, #11 Exhibit D-1H, #12 Exhibit D-2A, #13 Exhibit D-2B, #14 Exhibit D-3A)(Lamping, Brian)
August 14, 2012 Filing 189 MOTION for Entry of An Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Third Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Higgins, Stephen) Modified on 8/15/2012 (KMS). (Attachment 9 replaced on 9/18/2012) (DJO).
August 7, 2012 Filing 188 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk Supplemental Statement in Support of Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals (Lamping, Brian)
July 24, 2012 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss, #147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings LLC Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss' and and Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLCS' Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (DE 182 & 185) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Ltr to Hanaway, Bartle & Corwin, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Ltr to Schwartz)(Schwartz, Adam)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #184 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC.; ORDERED GRANTED; Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 07/17/2012; (DJO)
July 18, 2012 Filing 185 RESPONSE to Motion re #147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings LLC filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
July 18, 2012 Filing 184 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
July 18, 2012 Filing 183 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #180 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Defendant Morriss' Response To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 7/18/12. (KKS)
July 17, 2012 Filing 182 RESPONSE to Motion re #128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss Supplement filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanaway, Catherine)
July 17, 2012 Filing 181 RESPONSE to Motion re #128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss Supplement filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine) Modified on 7/17/2012 to delete image; document filed incorrectly; to be refiled; (DJO).
July 17, 2012 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Defendant Morriss' Response To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
June 21, 2012 Filing 179 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Claire M Schenk (Higgins, Stephen)
June 21, 2012 Filing 178 CROSSCLAIM against defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC, filed by Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Higgins, Stephen)
June 13, 2012 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the corrected of relief defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC, for a new trial or to alter or amend judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P, 59(a) and (e) [Doc. #133 ] is denied. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 06/13/2012; (DJO)
June 1, 2012 Filing 176 REPLY to Response to Motion re #147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings LLC filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
May 31, 2012 Filing 175 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Adam)
May 29, 2012 Filing 174 Docket Text ORDER Re: #171 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 5/29/2012. (KMS)
May 25, 2012 Filing 173 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Higgins, Stephen)
May 25, 2012 Filing 172 RESPONSE to Motion re #147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings LLC filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
May 25, 2012 Filing 171 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
May 24, 2012 Filing 170 Docket Text ORDER Re: #169 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #168 Response to Motion, to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. ; ORDERED GRANTED; Reply due 6/4/2012. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 5/24/2012. (KMS)
May 23, 2012 Filing 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #168 Response to Motion, to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
May 21, 2012 Filing 168 RESPONSE to Motion re #128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit)(Hanaway, Catherine)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the consent motion of defendant Burton Douglas Morriss for extension of time until May 21, 2012, to respond to plaintiffs motion to compel and to provide Rule 26(a) disclosures Doc. #164 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion for extension of time pending ruling on counsels motion to withdraw Doc. #131 is denied as moot. ( Responses due by 5/21/2012) Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 5/16/2012. (KMS)
May 15, 2012 Filing 166 Docket Text ORDER Re: #161 MOTION to Withdraw #130 MOTION to Withdraw by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 5/15/2012. (KMS)
May 14, 2012 Filing 165 REPLY to Response to Motion re #155 MOTION for Relief Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals Reply to Morriss Holdings, LLC's Opposition to Receiver's Motion to File Exhibit C to Interim Fee Application Under Seal filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-1A to Interim Fee Application (Redacted), #2 Exhibit C-1B to Interim Fee Application (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C-1C to Interim Fee Application (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C-2 to Interim Fee Application (Redacted), #5 Exhibit C-3 to Interim Fee Application (Redacted), #6 Exhibit C-4 to Interim Fee Application (Redacted))(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 14, 2012 Filing 164 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #135 Response to Motion, MOTION for Extension #135 Response to Motion of: Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents From Defendant Morriss And To Provide Rule 26a Disclosures by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
May 11, 2012 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re #147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings LLC filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwartz, Adam)
May 8, 2012 Filing 162 RESPONSE to Motion re #147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings LLC filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
May 8, 2012 Filing 161 MOTION to Withdraw #130 MOTION to Withdraw by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
May 8, 2012 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Burton Douglas Morriss for an order conforming that insureds are entitled to advancement of defense expenses under insurance policy [Doc. #72] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Federal Insurance Company is authorized to make payments under the Venture Capital Asset Protection Policy No. 8207-6676 up to the policys limit of liability to or for the benefit of defendant Morriss (or any Insured Persons or Organization as those terms are defined in the policy) for defense costs incurred in connection with this litigation. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 5/8/2012. (KMS)
May 7, 2012 Filing 159 **STRICKEN SEE DOC #224 FOR AMENDED ORDER** ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers motion for order approving and confirming the Second Interim Status Report [Doc. #134] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the First Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. ORDER granting #134 Motion for Leave to Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 5/7/2012. (KMS) Modified on 1/8/2013 (KJS).
May 7, 2012 Filing 158 Docket Text ORDER Re: #153 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit C to Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) by Receiver Claire M Schenk, and #152 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; ORDERED GRANTED; Response due May 8, 2012. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 5/7/2012. (KMS)
May 4, 2012 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #153 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit C to Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit C to Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
May 4, 2012 Filing 156 SEALED DOCUMENT re #155 MOTION for Relief Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals Exhibit C-1A to Interim Fee Application by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-1B to Interim Fee Application, #2 Exhibit C1-C to Interim Fee Application, #3 Exhibit C-2 to Interim Fee Application, #4 Exhibit C-3 to Interim Fee Application, #5 Exhibit C-4 to Interim Fee Application)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 4, 2012 Filing 155 MOTION for Relief Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by the Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Standardized Fund Accounting Report, #2 Exhibit B-Summary of Professional and Paraprofessional Time and Fees, #3 Exhibit D-Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 4, 2012 Filing 154 SEALED DOCUMENT re #153 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit C to Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit C to Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) Unredacted Copy of Exhibit 1 to Motion (Confidentiality Agreement) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
May 4, 2012 Filing 153 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibit C to Receiver's First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Incurred by Receiver, Retained Counsel and Other Professionals) by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Confidentiality Agreement (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2-Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
May 4, 2012 Filing 152 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings LLC by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
May 3, 2012 Filing 151 REPLY to Response to Motion re #119 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Relief Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Failing To Provide Sworn Accounting filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
May 2, 2012 Filing 150 REPLY to Response to Motion re #132 #133 MOTION for New Trial or to Alter, Or Amend Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
May 1, 2012 Filing 149 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #148 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam); ORDERED GRANTED; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 05/01/2012; (DJO)
April 30, 2012 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
April 30, 2012 Filing 147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings LLC by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Adam)
April 30, 2012 Filing 146 Docket Text ORDER Re: #144 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/30/2012. (KMS)
April 27, 2012 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (Redacted Version) re #119 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Relief Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Failing To Provide Sworn Accounting Redacted Version filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Corwin, David)
April 27, 2012 Filing 144 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
April 27, 2012 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #119 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Relief Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Failing To Provide Sworn Accounting filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Corwin, David) (document sealed per order 146) Modified on 4/30/2012 (KMS).
April 27, 2012 Filing 142 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #141 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including May 3, 2012, to Provide Initial Disclosures by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/27/12. (KXS)
April 26, 2012 Filing 141 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Provide Initial Disclosures by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
April 26, 2012 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION for New Trial or to Alter, Or Amend Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Higgins, Stephen)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion to return funds to investors in Acartha Special Situations Funding, LLC [Doc. #120] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver is granted control over the Acartha Special Situations Funding, LLC, account, Number XXXXXXXXXXX1977, held at Reliance Bank. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver is directed to return to investors the funds in the Acartha Special Situations Funding, LLC, account, in accordance with Reliance Bank's records of deposits and credits. #120 Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/25/12. (KXS)
April 25, 2012 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION for New Trial or to Alter, Or Amend Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
April 24, 2012 Filing 137 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk Receiver's Notice of No Objection and Request for Entry of an Order on Receiver's Motion for Return of Funds to Investors in Acartha Special Situations Funding #120 , LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kathleen)
April 24, 2012 Filing 136 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathleen E. Kraft for Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Kraft, Kathleen)
April 20, 2012 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #130 MOTION to Withdraw, #131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
April 20, 2012 Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's Second Interim Status Report for the Period January 27, 2012 Through April 20, 2012 by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lamping, Brian)
April 19, 2012 Filing 133 CORRECTED MOTION for New Trial or to Alter, Or Amend Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David) Modified on 4/20/2012 (KXS).
April 19, 2012 Filing 132 MOTION for New Trial or to Alter, Or Amend Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
April 19, 2012 Filing 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
April 19, 2012 Filing 130 (WITHDRAWN) MOTION to Withdraw by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine) Modified on 5/15/2012 (KMS).
April 19, 2012 Filing 129 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #127 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Schwartz, Adam); ORDERED GRANTED; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 04/19/2012; (DJO)
April 18, 2012 Filing 128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Schwartz, Adam)
April 18, 2012 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
April 16, 2012 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hanaway, Catherine)
April 13, 2012 Filing 125 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #124 MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including April 27, 2012, to File Response/Reply as to #119 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Relief Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Failing To Provide Sworn Accounting by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Little, Vicki); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/13/12. (KXS)
April 12, 2012 Filing 124 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #119 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Relief Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Failing To Provide Sworn Accounting by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Little, Vicki)
April 10, 2012 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT re #121 Memorandum in Support of Motion, for Return of Funds to Investors in Acartha Special Situations Funding, LLC ("Unredacted Copy of Exhibit F") by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Lamping, Brian)
April 10, 2012 Filing 122 SEALED DOCUMENT re #121 Memorandum in Support of Motion, for Return of Funds to Investors in Acartha Special Situations Funding, LLC ("Unredacted Copy of Exhibit E" by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Lamping, Brian)
April 10, 2012 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #120 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Return of Funds to Investors in Acartha Special Situations Funding, LLC filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Lamping, Brian)
April 10, 2012 Filing 120 MOTION for Return of Property Receiver's Motion for Return of Funds to Investors in Acartha Special Situations Funding, LLC by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Lamping, Brian)
April 10, 2012 Filing 119 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Relief Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Failing To Provide Sworn Accounting by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Adam)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the amended motion of the receiver for an order directing the Clerk of Court to post summary information and a hyperlink on the district court's website [Doc. #109] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver shall e-mail the proposed summary information in a word processing format to the following address: MOED_Proposed_Orders@moed.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall add a link to the summary information to the district court's website. The wording and placement of this link is left to the discretion of the Clerk of Court. #109 Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/9/12. (KXS)
April 9, 2012 Filing 117 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #116 MOTION for Leave to to Reply To Receiver's Supplemental Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant Morriss' Motion For Confirmation That Defendant Morriss Is Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Order Appointing Receiver Or Asset Freeze Order by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine); #114 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Excess Of Fifteen-Page Limit by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/9/12. (KXS)
April 5, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to to Reply To Receiver's Supplemental Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant Morriss' Motion For Confirmation That Defendant Morriss Is Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Order Appointing Receiver Or Asset Freeze Order by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
April 5, 2012 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION to Dismiss :The Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
April 5, 2012 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Excess Of Fifteen-Page Limit by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanaway, Catherine)
April 5, 2012 Filing 113 SUPPLEMENT to Receiver's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss' Motion for Confirmation that Defendant Morriss is Entitled to Advancement of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Order Appointing Receiver or Asset Freeze Order by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lamping, Brian) Modified on 4/6/2012 (KXS).
April 5, 2012 Filing 112 Docket Text ORDER: Granting Re: #111 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Receiver's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Douglas Morriss' Motion for Confirmation That He Is Entitled to Advancement of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy by Receiver Claire M Schenk ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/5/2012. (KMS)
April 4, 2012 Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Receiver's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Douglas Morriss' Motion for Confirmation That He Is Entitled to Advancement of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Supplement), #2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Supplement)(Lamping, Brian)
April 2, 2012 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re #83 MOTION to Dismiss : or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
March 30, 2012 Filing 109 AMENDED MOTION by Receiver Claire M Schenk for Order Directing Clerk's Office to Post on District Courts' Website: (I) Summary Information About Receivership and (II) Hyperlink to Receivership's External Website (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lamping, Brian) Modified on 3/30/2012 (KXS).
March 29, 2012 Filing 108 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #105 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Fifteen-Page Limit by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission; ORDERED GRANTED; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 03/29/2012; (DJO)
March 28, 2012 Filing 107 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Amended. (Schwartz, Adam)
March 28, 2012 Filing 106 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Schwartz, Adam)
March 26, 2012 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation of Fifteen-Page Limit by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
March 26, 2012 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION to Dismiss :The Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement, #83 MOTION to Dismiss : or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER : GRANTING #76 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Sale of Certain Personal Property filed by Claire M Schenk; the receiver is authorized to sell the personal property listed in Exhibit G to the motion [77-7], copy of which is apprended to this order; the receiver is authorized to use the services of Bestbuyauctioneers.com (the auctioneer) to sell the personal property at the auctioneer's place of business in Woodbridge, NJ; the receiver is authorized to pay the auctioneer for its services according to the terms agreed upon by the receiver and auctioneer, including, but not limited to, payment of a commission equal to 20% of the total sales proceeds.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/22/12. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G)(KKS)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receivership's motion for an order directing the Clerk's Office to post summary information and a link [Doc. #67 ] is denied without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/22/12. (KKS)
March 22, 2012 Filing 101 PERMANENT INJUNCTION JUDGMENT: Granting #95 MOTION by plaintiffs for Permanent Injunction as to Defendants Acartha Group, LLC; MIC VII, LLC; Acartha Technology Partners, LP; and Gryphon Investments III, LLC. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/22/12. (KKS)
March 14, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk Receiver's Notice of No Objection and Request for Immediate Entry of an Order Approving Receiver's Sale of Certain Personal Property (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Lamping, Brian)
March 14, 2012 Filing 99 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #98 MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including March 27, 2012, to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Consent of Defendants to Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief and Request for Entry of Judgment by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/14/12. (KXS)
March 13, 2012 Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Consent of Defendants to Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief and Request for Entry of Judgment by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
March 12, 2012 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hanaway, Catherine)
March 8, 2012 Filing 96 REPLY in Support re #72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine) Modified (removed Reply "to termed motion" language) on 3/9/2012 (KKS).
March 6, 2012 Filing 95 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Notice of Filing Consent of Defendants Acartha Group, LLC; MIC VII, LLC; Acartha Technology Partners, LP; and Gryphon Investments III, LLC to Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief and Request for Entry of Judgment by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent and Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
March 6, 2012 Filing 94 NOTICE by Receiver Claire M Schenk Filing Consent of Defendants Acartha Group, LLC; MIC VII, LLC; Acartha Technology Partners, LP; and Gryphon Investments III, LLC (Attachments: #1 1)(Higgins, Stephen)
March 5, 2012 Filing 93 Docket Text ORDER: Re: ORDERED Granted #92 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation of Fifteen Pages by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/5/12. (KKS)
March 2, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation of Fifteen Pages by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
March 2, 2012 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Morriss' Motion for Confirmation that He is Entitled to Advancement of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Order Appointing Receiver or Asset Freeze filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Schwartz, Adam)
March 2, 2012 Filing 90 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #86 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement, #83 MOTION to Dismiss : or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission; ORDERED GRANTED; Extension up to and including March 27, 2012; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 03/02/2012; (DJO)
February 29, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #86 MOTION to Dismiss :The Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement, #83 MOTION to Dismiss : or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
February 29, 2012 Filing 88 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #85 MOTION for Leave to File Motion With Supporting Memorandum In Excess Of Fifteen-Page Limit filed by Burton Douglas Morriss ; ORDERED GRANTED; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/29/2012; (DJO)
February 28, 2012 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #86 MOTION to Dismiss :The Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
February 28, 2012 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss :The Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanaway, Catherine)
February 28, 2012 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Motion With Supporting Memorandum In Excess Of Fifteen-Page Limit by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanaway, Catherine)
February 28, 2012 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #83 MOTION to Dismiss : or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
February 28, 2012 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss : or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
February 28, 2012 Filing 82 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to the Asset Freeze Order and Other Emergency Relief Related to Accounting by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B part 1, #3 Exhibit B part 2, #4 Exhibit B part 3, #5 Exhibit B part 4)(Corwin, David)
February 27, 2012 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Lamping, Brian)
February 27, 2012 Filing 80 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE of Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss To The Asset Freeze Order And Other Emergency Relief Related To Accounting by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receiver's motion for extension of time until March 6, 2012, to file a response to plaintiff's complaint and request for an accounting [Doc. #78 ] is granted; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/27/2012. (DJO)
February 24, 2012 Filing 78 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint and Request for Accounting by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lamping, Brian)
February 22, 2012 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #76 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Sale of Certain Personal Property filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Lamping, Brian)
February 22, 2012 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to Receiver's Motion for Sale of Certain Personal Property by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Lamping, Brian)
February 17, 2012 Filing 75 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission; ORDERED GRANTED; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/17/2012; (DJO)
February 16, 2012 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
February 16, 2012 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hanaway, Catherine)
February 16, 2012 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to For Entry Of An Order Confirming That Insureds Are Entitled To Advancement Of Defense Expenses Under Insurance Policy Notwithstanding Asset Freeze Order by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanaway, Catherine)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of the receiver for extension of time until February 28, 2012, to respond to the complaint and request for an accounting [Doc. #70] is granted. #70 Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 2/10/12. (KXS)
February 8, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint, First Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Accounting by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(Lamping, Brian) (Main Document 70 replaced on 2/8/2012) (KXS).
February 8, 2012 Filing 69 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #65 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint, Request For Production of Documents and Personal Accounting by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss; ORDERED GRANTED; Extension up to and including 02/28/2012; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/08/2012; (DJO)
February 8, 2012 Filing 68 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #64 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, First Request for Production of Documents and Accounting by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC.; ORDERED GRANTED; Extension up to and including 02/28/2012; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/08/2012; (DJO)
February 8, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Direct Clerk's Office to Post on District Court's Website (I) Summary Information About Receivership and (II) Hyperlink to Receiverships External Website by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lamping, Brian)
February 7, 2012 Filing 65 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint, Request For Production of Documents and Personal Accounting by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanaway, Catherine)
February 7, 2012 Filing 64 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, First Request for Production of Documents and Accounting by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
February 2, 2012 Filing 66 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #63 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; attorney/firm Kevin M. Carnie Jr. by Receiver Claire M Schenk; ORDERED GRANTED; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/07/2012; (DJO)
February 1, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Kevin M. Carnie Jr. by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Carnie, Kevin)
January 30, 2012 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT proceedings of ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on JANUARY 27, 2012 before HONORABLE CAROL E. JACKSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber GARY BOND, RMR, RPR, Telephone number 314.244.7980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2012. (DJO)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receiver's motion for order approving and confirming the First Interim Status Report [Doc. #51] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the First Interim Status Report of the Receiver, and every act and transaction reported therein, are approved and confirmed. #51 Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/27/12. (KXS)
January 27, 2012 Filing 60 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #42 Emergency MOTION to Preclude Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings from Testifying at Show Cause Hearing by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission ; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/27/12. (KXS)
January 27, 2012 Filing 59 ASSET FREEZE ORDER AND OTHER EMERGENCY RELIEF. SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/27/12. (KXS)
January 27, 2012 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Carol E. Jackson: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/27/2012; motion to continue the show cause hearing #55 filed by defendant Morriss Holdings is denied; plaintiff's motion for order continuing the asset freeze is granted. (Court Reporter:Gary Bond.) (FTR Gold: No.) (KXS)
January 27, 2012 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 EX PARTE MOTION Emergency Motion for Asset Freeze Order and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
January 26, 2012 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #42 Emergency MOTION to Preclude Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings from Testifying at Show Cause Hearing filed by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
January 26, 2012 Filing 55 MOTION for Relief of Defendant, Morriss Holdings, LLC to Continue the Show Cause Hearing by Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
January 26, 2012 Filing 54 ENTRY of Appearance by Vicki L. Little for Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Little, Vicki)
January 26, 2012 Filing 53 ENTRY of Appearance by David S. Corwin for Defendant Morriss Holdings, LLC. (Corwin, David)
January 26, 2012 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #51 MOTION for Relief by Receiver for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's First Interim Status Report filed by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Higgins, Stephen)
January 26, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION for Relief by Receiver for Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming the Receiver's First Interim Status Report by Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Higgins, Stephen)
January 26, 2012 Filing 50 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission of Michelle Lama. (Schwartz, Adam)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Burton Douglas Morriss for extension of time until February 7, 2012, to submit sworn accountings [Doc. #45] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant's motion to continue the show cause hearing [Doc. #43] is denied. #43 #45 Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/26/12. (KXS)
January 25, 2012 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 First MOTION to Continue the Show Cause Hearing filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam)
January 25, 2012 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian A. Lamping for Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Lamping, Brian)
January 24, 2012 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #45 MOTION for Extension of: Unopposed Additional Time filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
January 24, 2012 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of: Unopposed Additional Time by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
January 24, 2012 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #43 First MOTION to Continue the Show Cause Hearing filed by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
January 24, 2012 Filing 43 First MOTION to Continue the Show Cause Hearing by Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
January 24, 2012 Filing 42 Emergency MOTION to Preclude Relief Defendant Morriss Holdings from Testifying at Show Cause Hearing by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Levenson, Robert)
January 24, 2012 Filing 41 ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine L. Hanaway for Defendant Burton Douglas Morriss. (Hanaway, Catherine)
January 24, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE Filing Declaration of Edward A. Labry, III: by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Edward A. Labry, III)(Schwartz, Adam)
January 23, 2012 Filing 39 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #35 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/23/12. (KXS)
January 23, 2012 Filing 38 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin Carnie for Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Carnie, Kevin)
January 20, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission of Filing Redacted Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 28)(Schwartz, Adam)
January 20, 2012 Filing 36 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted pages of Ex 5, 28, 34, 35 and 36, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 25 part 1, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 25 part 2)(Schwartz, Adam)
January 20, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
January 19, 2012 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen B. Higgins for Receiver Claire M Schenk. (Higgins, Stephen)
January 19, 2012 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Morriss Holdings, LLC served on 1/18/2012, answer due 2/8/2012. (Schwartz, Adam)
January 19, 2012 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Burton Douglas Morriss served on 1/18/2012, answer due 2/8/2012. (Schwartz, Adam)
January 19, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE Appearnce of Counsel: by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (James, Brian)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's emergency motion to amend the Asset Freeze Order entered on January 17, 2012, [Doc. # 23] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Section III of the Asset Freeze Order [Doc. #17] is amended as follows: III. RECORDS PRESERVATION IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pending determination of the Commission's request for an Asset Freeze, the Defendants and Relief Defendant, their directors, officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, depositories, banks, and those persons in active concert or participation with any one or more of them, and each of them, be and they hereby are restrained and enjoined from, directly or indirectly, destroying, mutilating, concealing, altering, disposing of, or otherwise rendering illegible in any manner, any of the books, records, documents, correspondence, brochures, manuals, papers, ledgers, accounts, statements, obligations, files and other property of or pertaining to the Defendants and Relief Defendant wherever located, until further order of this Court. #23 Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/19/12. (KXS)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall strike from the docket record the letter filed as Document No. 28 for noncompliance with Local Rul 7-4.04(A). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further documents or pleadings are to be submitted or filed in this case by any attorney who is not admitted to practice in this Court and who has not entered an appearance on behalf of a party. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/19/12. (KXS)
January 19, 2012 ***REMARK - copy of order [#29] mailed to Attorney Mark Jacobs, 380 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor, New York, New York 10017 (KXS)
January 18, 2012 Filing 28 (STRIKEN PER ORDER ENTERED 1/19/12) First MOTION to Set Aside Order/Judgment Letter Format by Defendant Acartha Group LLC. (Marxkors, Michele) Modified on 1/19/2012 (KXS).
January 18, 2012 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. MIC VII, LLC served on 1/17/2012, answer due 2/7/2012. (Schwartz, Adam)
January 18, 2012 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Gryphon Investments III, LLC served on 1/17/2012, answer due 2/7/2012. (Schwartz, Adam)
January 18, 2012 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Acartha Technology Partners, LP served on 1/17/2012, answer due 2/7/2012. (Schwartz, Adam)
January 18, 2012 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Acartha Group LLC served on 1/17/2012, answer due 2/7/2012. (Schwartz, Adam)
January 18, 2012 Filing 23 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct Asset Freeze Order and Other Relief by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the documents that were previously filed ex parte. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/18/12. (KXS)
January 18, 2012 Filing 21 Notice That Clerk's Office May Unseal This Case by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levenson, Robert) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Filing 20 Minutes re: hearing on plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order; pending ex parte motions granted; show cause hearing set on 1/27/12 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Carol E. Jackson, courtroom 14 North; Court reporter: Gary Bond (KXS) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE Appearrance of Counsel: by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Levenson, Robert)
January 17, 2012 Filing 18 Documents re: #6 Emergency Motion for Asset Freeze Order and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 1, #6 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 2, #7 Exhibit Ex 5 part 3, #8 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 4, #9 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 5, #10 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 6, #11 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 7, #12 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 8, #13 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 9, #14 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 10, #15 Exhibit Ex 5 Part 11, #16 Exhibit Ex 6, #17 Exhibit Ex 7, #18 Exhibit Ex 8, #19 Exhibit Ex 9, #20 Exhibit Ex 10, #21 Exhibit Ex 11, #22 Exhibit Ex 12, #23 Exhibit Ex 13, #24 Exhibit Ex 14, #25 Exhibit Ex 15, #26 Exhibit Ex 16 Part 1, #27 Exhibit Ex 16 Part 2, #28 Exhibit Ex 17, #29 Exhibit Ex 18, #30 Exhibit Ex 19, #31 Exhibit Ex 20, #32 Exhibit Ex 21, #33 Exhibit Ex 22, #34 Exhibit Ex 23, #35 Exhibit Ex 24, #36 Exhibit Ex 25 part 1, #37 Exhibit Ex 25 Part 2, #38 Exhibit Ex 26, #39 Exhibit Ex 27 Part 1, #40 Exhibit Ex 27 part 2, #41 Exhibit Ex 28 (SEALED PER COUNSEL DUE TO PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS), #42 Exhibit Ex 29, #43 Exhibit Ex 30, #44 Exhibit Ex 31, #45 Exhibit Ex 32, #46 Exhibit Ex 33, #47 Exhibit Ex 34, #48 Exhibit Ex 35, #49 Exhibit Ex 36, #50 Exhibit Ex 37)(Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS). Modified on 1/19/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/17/12. (KXS) (copy hand delivered to counsel for plaintiff) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/17/12. (KXS) (copy hand delivered to counsel for plaintiff) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/17/12. (KXS) (copy hand delivered to counsel for plaintiff) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Securites and Exchange Commission Process Server: HPS Process & Investigation, Inc. as to defendants B. Douglas Morriss and Morriss Holdings, LLC. (DLB)
January 17, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Securites and Exchange Commission Process Server: DM Professional Services as to defendants Acartha Group, LLC, MIC VII, LLC, Acartha Technology Parnters, LP and Gryphon Investments III, LLC (DLB)
January 17, 2012 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Asset Freeze Order and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support by Plaintiff Securites and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Filing 5 Certificate Purusant to rule 65(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Plaintiff Securites and Exchange Commission. (Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 1/17/2012 (KXS). Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Filing 4 Exhibits to Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Appointment of Receiver and Memorandum of Law in Suuport by Plaintiff Securites and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Receiver Motion, #2 Exhibit)(Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 1/17/2012 (KXS). Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS). Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Appointment of Receiver and memorandum of Law in Support by Plaintiff Securites and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Motion With supporting Memorandum In Excess of fifteen Page Limit by Plaintiff Securites and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Adam) Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS). Modified on 1/18/2012 (KXS).
January 17, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Inunctive and Other Relief against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Securites and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Burton Morriss, #4 Summons Acartha Group, #5 Summons MIC VII, #6 Summons Acartha Technology, #7 Summons Gryphon, #8 Summons Morriss Holdings, #9 Supplement Intent to Use Process Server, #10 Supplement Intent to Use Process Server)(Schwartz, Adam)
January 17, 2012 Case Opening Notification 6 Summons(es) issued, Disclosure of Corporate Interest issued to defendants. Judge Assigned: Honorable Carol E. Jackson. The summons was hand delivered to Plaintiff's Attorney. (KCM)
January 17, 2012 Case Opening Notification: Summonses issued, 6 at 21 days. Judge Assigned: Hon. Carol E. Jackson, U.S. District Judge. The summonses were emailed to Adam L. Schwartz. (DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securites and Exchange Commission v.Morriss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Adam L. Schwartz
Represented By: Brian T. James
Represented By: Robert K. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claimant 93 and 124
Represented By: Brian M. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton Douglas Morriss
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway
Represented By: John R. Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acartha Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIC VII, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acartha Technology Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gryphon Investments III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morriss Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David S. Corwin
Represented By: Vicki L. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ameet Patel
Represented By: Robert J.A. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mike McDaniel
Represented By: David S. Corwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Blink Marketing Group, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence W. Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: UHY Advisors MO, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan David King
Represented By: Joseph Anton Roselius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hany Teylouni
Represented By: Robert J.A. Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Claire M Schenk
Represented By: Stephen B. Higgins
Represented By: Brian A. Lamping
Represented By: Kathleen E. Kraft
Represented By: Kevin M. Carnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?