Brown v. Maryland National Processing Center
Plaintiff: Gloria Blair Brown
Defendant: Maryland National Processing Center
Case Number: 4:2012cv01012
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Jean C. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 14 15 17 , 16 ORDERED that plaintiffs post-dismissal motions to reopen her case [Doc. #14 and #15] are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #16 and #17] are DENIED AS MOOT.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/13/13. (CEL)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint because the Court lacks jurisdiction over the present action. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(h)(3). An appropriate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum andOrder. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/13/12. (TRC)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide plaintiff the courtprovided CJA Form 23 financial affidavit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty (20) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit a completed CJA Form 23 financial affidavit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to submit a CJA Form 23 within twenty (20) days, the Court will order the Clerk of Court to dismiss the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon plaintiffs submission of completed CJA Form 23 financial affidavit, the Clerk shall resubmit this case to the Court for review pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1915. Response to Court due by 6/27/2012. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/7/12. cc: CJA mailed to pltff.(CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Maryland National Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland National Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Blair Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?