Ahmed v. Aviss
Plaintiff: Shakeel Ahmed
Defendant: Darrell Aviss
Case Number: 4:2012cv01120
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER The parties having dismissed their claims against one another with prejudice, the case is closed. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/24/14. (CLA)
April 22, 2014 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENTAL Correspondence and Proposed Order by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Docket Text ORDER: ; ORDERED : SO ORDERED - Dismissal of counterclaim by deft, doc. #79 . Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/4/14. (CEL)
March 3, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darrell Aviss of Counterclaim (Press, Allen)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #77 Plaintiff's Dismissal of Claims With prejudice. ORDERED SO ORDERED JCH, Case Closed. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 02/28/2014. (CLK)
February 27, 2014 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Darrell Aviss by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 2/16/2014. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/16/13. (CLA)
December 16, 2013 Filing 75 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Winters, Bradley. Date of Conference: 12/12/13. The parties participated in good faith. The parties achieved a settlement.(CEL)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #51 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 51) is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/22/13. (CEL)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #71 MOTION for Leave to Participate in Mediation by Video Conference by Defendant Darrell Aviss. ; ORDERED : DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/19/13. (CEL)
November 19, 2013 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION for Leave to Participate in Mediation by Video Conference filed by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
November 18, 2013 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Participate in Mediation by Video Conference by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
November 1, 2013 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
October 29, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Winters, Bradley Neutral selected by Parties (email copy sent to neutral)(LSD)
October 29, 2013 Filing 68 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed, Defendant Darrell Aviss Neutral: Winters, Bradley Date of Conference: 12/12/13 time: 9:30 AM Location: Sher Corwin Winters, LLC(Hongs, John)
October 22, 2013 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Statement of Material Facts re #53 Statement of Material Facts filed by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Hongs, John)
October 22, 2013 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #64 Joint MOTION to Vacate ADR by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed, Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Hongs, John) filed by Darrell Aviss, Shakeel Ahmed ; ORDERED DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/17/13. (CLA)
October 16, 2013 Filing 64 Joint MOTION to Vacate ADR by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed, Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Hongs, John)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re #62 #60 ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Vacate and Generally Continue Referral to ADR (ECF No. 60) is GRANTED in part, and the ADR conference in this matter shall be concluded no later than Friday, November 8, 2013. Not later than Tuesday, October 15, 2013, lead counsel John M. Hongs shall notify the clerk of the agreed choice of neutral selected by the parties, and the date, time and location of the ADR conference. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time in which to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 62) is GRANTED. ( ADR Completion Deadline due by 11/8/2013., ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 11/22/2013., ADR Conference Report Schedule due by 10/15/2013., Designation of Neutral due by 10/15/2013.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/8/13. (CEL)
October 8, 2013 Filing 62 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
October 1, 2013 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton: Status Conference held on 10/1/2013. Parties to advise the court of a date certain regarding ADR (Court Reporter:D. Kriegshauser.) (FTR Gold: No.) (CEL)
September 27, 2013 Filing 60 Joint MOTION to Vacate ADR AND GENERALLY CONTINUE by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed, Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Hongs, John)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #57 MOTION to Withdraw #54 MOTION for Order to Show Cause AND MOTION for Sanctions ; ORDERED : SO ORDERED,. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/18/13. (CEL)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #55 MOTION to Stay re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AND/OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; ORDERED : GRANTED in part. Pltff granted to 10/15/13 to file response to deft's motion for partial summary judgment.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/18/13. (CEL)
September 16, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw #54 MOTION for Order to Show Cause AND MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #54 ORDERED that Defendant Darrell Aviss is granted until 12:00 p.m. on Thursday, September 19, 2013, within which to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause and for Sanctions (ECF No. 54). Failure to do so will result in the Courts ruling on Plaintiff's unopposed motion. Response to Court due by 9/19/2013 by noon.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/13/13. (CEL)
September 13, 2013 Filing 55 MOTION to Stay re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AND/OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
September 12, 2013 Filing 54 MOTION for Order to Show Cause AND, MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hongs, John)
August 30, 2013 Filing 53 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Press, Allen)
August 30, 2013 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
August 30, 2013 Filing 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
August 14, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Winters, Bradley Neutral selected by Parties (copy emailed to neutral)(LSD)
August 13, 2013 Filing 49 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed, Defendant Darrell Aviss Neutral: Winters, Bradley Date of Conference: 10/02/2013 time: 9 am Location: 190 Carondelet, Suite 1100, St. Louis, MO 63105(Hongs, John)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #45 MOTION for Extension of: Deadline for ADR by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John); ORDERED SO ORDERED JCH, ( ADR Completion Deadline due by 10/2/2013., ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 10/16/2013.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 08/09/2013. (CLK)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #42 MOTION to Compel Written Discovery Responses and Defendant's Compliance with ADR Order by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed, Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. ; ORDERED : DENIED as moot per telephone conference held #46 . Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/8/13. (CEL)
August 8, 2013 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton: Telephone Conference held on 8/8/2013 re: Motion to compel #42 . Deft. requests 2 weeks to respond to discovery and finalize ADR. (Court Reporter:D. Kriegshauser.) (FTR Gold: No.) (CEL)
August 8, 2013 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of: Deadline for ADR by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
August 8, 2013 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION to Compel Written Discovery Responses and Defendant's Compliance with ADR Order filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #42 MOTION to Compel Written Discovery Responses and Defendant's Compliance with ADR Order by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed, Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. ; ORDERED : A telephone conference is set for Thursday, August 8, 2013 at 12:45pm regarding Motion to Compel, doc. #45 . Pltff is to initiate the phone call. The phone number for Judge Hamilton's chambers is 314-244-7600., ( Telephone Conference set for 8/8/2013 12:45 PM by Telephone before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/6/13. (CEL)
August 5, 2013 Filing 42 MOTION to Compel Written Discovery Responses and Defendant's Compliance with ADR Order by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed, Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Hongs, John)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF ADR TIMELINESS: ORDERED the deadlines set forth are to be met timely with the appropriate forms filed with the Clerk of the District Court as indicated in the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution. If a deadline cannot be met, the designated lead counsel shall file a motion requesting an extension of the deadline prior to the expiration of that deadline. FURTHER ORDERED that if compliance with a deadline set forth in the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution has not occurred, such noncompliance may result in the imposition of sanctions to the appropriate party or parties.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/09/2013. (CLK)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: JohnM.Hongs ADR Completion Deadline due by 9/8/2013. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 9/22/2013. Designation of Neutral due by 7/29/2013. ADR Conference Report Schedule due by 7/29/2013. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/09/2013. (CLK)
March 7, 2013 Filing 39 ANSWER to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Shakeel Ahmed.(Hongs, John)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #27 ORDERED that Plaintiff ShakeelAhmed's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim (ECF No. 27) is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant is granted until Friday, March 8, 2013, within which to file an Amended Counterclaim. ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2013.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/26/13. (CEL)
February 11, 2013 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim filed by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed, Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hongs, John)
February 8, 2013 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #34 MOTION to withdraw #31 Response in Opposition to Motion by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed, Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim by Defendant Darrell Aviss. ; ORDERED : Motion to withdraw SO ORDERED; Motion for extension of time SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/5/13. (CEL)
February 5, 2013 Filing 34 MOTION to withdraw #31 Response in Opposition to Motion by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed, Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John) Modified on 2/5/2013 (CEL).
February 4, 2013 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
February 4, 2013 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen) Modified on 2/4/2013 (CLA). SCANNED DOCUMENT INCOMPLETE RESPONSE TO BE RESCANNED AND REFILED. Modified on 2/4/2013 (CLA).
February 4, 2013 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim filed by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed, Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
February 4, 2013 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
February 4, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen) (wrong document attached - see motion #30 - Modified on 2/4/2013 (CEL).
January 23, 2013 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim filed by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hongs, John)
January 23, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Nathan Ross by Defendant Darrell Aviss. ORDERED : GRANTED, Attorney Nathan E. Ross terminated.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/11/13. (CEL)
January 11, 2013 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed by Darrell Aviss.(Press, Allen)
January 11, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Nathan Ross by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Ross, Nathan)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: as to Darrell Aviss Re: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Darrell Aviss. ORDERED SO ORDERED JCH, Darrell Aviss answer due 1/11/2013. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 01/03/13. (CLK)
January 2, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #5 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECFNo. 5) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Transfer (ECF No. 5) is DENIED without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/19/12. (CEL)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (see order for additional details). Motion to Join Parties due by 1/15/2013. Discovery Completion due by 8/16/2013. ADR Future Reference 7/1/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2013. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/5/12. (TRC)
December 4, 2012 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton: Parties Present for Rule 16 Conference held on 12/4/2012. Conference held by phone. CMO to issue. (Court Reporter:none.) (FTR Gold: No.) (CLK)
December 3, 2012 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan E. Ross for Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Ross, Nathan)
November 23, 2012 Filing 17 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. . (Hongs, John)
November 1, 2012 Filing 16 SURREPLY to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by leave of Court filed by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. ; ORDERED : LEAVE GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/30/12. (CEL)
October 29, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
October 26, 2012 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen) filed by Darrell Aviss ; ORDERED SO ORDERED, (Response to Court due by 10/26/2012). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/22/12. (TRC)
October 18, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/23/2012. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/4/2012 10:30 AM in Telephone before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/18/12. (CLA)
October 12, 2012 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed)(Hongs, John)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - BY CONSENT by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John) filed by Shakeel Ahmed ; ORDERED SO ORDERED, (Response to Court due by 10/12/2012). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/28/12. (TRC)
September 27, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - BY CONSENT by Plaintiff Shakeel Ahmed. (Hongs, John)
September 20, 2012 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Press, Allen)
September 20, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Darrell Aviss. ; ORDERED : SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/22/12. (CEL)
August 17, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Darrell Aviss. (Press, Allen)
July 16, 2012 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shakeel Ahmed Darrell Aviss waiver signed on 6/21/2012, answer due 8/20/2012. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Executed Waiver of Service)(Hongs, John)
June 21, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Darrell Aviss with receipt number 0865-3338052, in the amount of $350 Jury Demand,, filed by Shakeel Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service)(Hongs, John)
June 21, 2012 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued - 1 at 60 days. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Aviss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakeel Ahmed
Represented By: John M. Hongs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Aviss
Represented By: Nathan E. Ross
Represented By: Allen P. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?