Rayburn v. Lezgi Motors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miranda Rayburn
Defendant: Lezgi Motors, Inc. and Zamir Kurbanaliev
Case Number: 4:2012cv01410
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant ATN to strike certain testimony and opinions of plaintiffs expert Christina Kelly [Doc. # 90 ] is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for an extension of time to respond to defendants motion to strike [Doc. # 101 ] is moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/13/14. (KJS)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to strike or, in the alternative, to name a rebuttal expert [Doc. #112] is moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to file a surreply to defendants motion to strike [Doc. #123] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/22/2014. (KMS)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant ATN Express, Inc. for leave to file cross-claims against defendants Kurbanaliev and Lezgi Motors, Inc. [Doc. #86] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery in this case shall be completed by April 28, 2014. ( Discovery Completion due by 4/28/2014.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/14/2014. (KMS)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for sanctions [Doc. # 73 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall have until April 25, 2014, to submit signed answers to plaintiffs first set of interrogatories accompanied by an affidavit as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 33. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition ofsanctions authorized under Rule 37(b)(2).. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/10/14. (KKS)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to compel [Doc. # 57 ] and supplemental motion to compel [Doc. # 59 ] are granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall hav e until December 10, 2013 to execute the medical authorizations attached to defendants' motions that are directed to the treatment providers that have treated plaintiffs head, neck, back, spine, left shoulder, and left hip.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/3/13. (KKS)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for sanctions [Doc. #52] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/16/13. (KXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayburn v. Lezgi Motors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Rayburn
Represented By: Aaron M. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lezgi Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zamir Kurbanaliev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?