Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. A.L.L. Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Brandon Flinn, Raymond Linehan, Pasquale Lopiccolo, Charles Bean, Donald Willey, Gary Elliott, Jay Schultehenrich, David A. Gillick, Brad Grant, Rich Ledbetter, Adam Knoebel, Norman Merlo, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Jeffrey O'Connell, Richard McLaughlin, Joseph W. Beetz, Joseph Leritz, Doug Wachsnicht, Joe Hoette, William L. Luth, Donald C. Grant, St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan, AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Traning Fund, Larry Bloomer, Perri Pryor, Richard McGuire, John B. Morgan, Phil Hocher, Robert J. Wesolich, Francis R. Wojehowski, Cliff Land, John J. Smith, Sr. and Local Union Nos. 42-53-110, Laborers Internationnal Unionof North America, AFL-CIO
Defendant: A.L.L. Construction, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv01511
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery is GRANTED. [Doc. 47 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Anton Lumpkins, as a representative of A.L.L. Construction, LLC, shall appear for depo sition and produce the records requested in the Notice of Rule 69 Deposition and Request for Production of Documents, at the offices of plaintiffs' counsel on Thursday, June 28, 2016, at 3:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the C lerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order by UPS Signature, in addition to first class U.S. Mail, on Mr. Anton Lumpkins, A.L.L. Construction, LLC, 3821 Melba Place, St. Louis, Missouri 63121. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/18/18. (JWD)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DEFAULT JUDGMENT IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Second Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 31] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that plaintiffs shall recover from defendant A.L.L. Construction, LLC, the total of Eighty-Eight Thousand Six Hundred Sixty Dollars and Fifty-Four Cents ($88,660.54). SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 7/23/2014. (NCL)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED and is stricken from the record. [Doc. 33]IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will proceed to address plaintiffs SecondMotion for Default Judgment. Filed by Defendant A.L.L. Construction, LLC. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/2/14. (JWJ)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for default judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Doc. 27 . Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/23/2014. (RAK)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant A.L.L. Construction, LLC and its officer Anton Lumpkins are ordered to show cause in writing why they should not be held in contempt of court for failure to produce records as ordered by the Court on October 25, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing is set for Thursday, February 7, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 3-North of the Thomas F. Eagleton United States Courthouse, at which defendant A.L.L. Construction, L LC and its officer Anton Lumpkins may show cause why civil contempt sanctions should not be imposed against them for failure to comply with the Courts Order of October 25, 2012. Because incarceration is a possible civil contempt sanction, defendant and Mr. Lumpkins have the right to representation by counsel. Failure to appear for the hearing as ordered may subject Mr. Lumpkins to arrest by the United States Marshals Service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order by first class mail and by certified mail, return receipt requested, to A.L.L. Construction, LLC, at the following three addresses: 4427 Geraldine Avenue, St. Louis, Missouri 63115; 3821 Melba Place, St. Louis, Missouri 63121; and 625 N. Euclid, Suite 401, St. Louis, Missouri 63112, and to A.L.L. Construction, LLC, c/o Anton L. Lumpkins, by first class mail and by certified mail, return receipt requested, at the same three addresses. In Court Hearing set for 2/7/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Charles A. Shaw. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/2/2013. (KSM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. A.L.L. Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Flinn
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Linehan
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasquale Lopiccolo
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bean
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Willey
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Elliott
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Schultehenrich
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Gillick
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Grant
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Ledbetter
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Knoebel
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Merlo
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey O'Connell
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Beetz
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Leritz
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Wachsnicht
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hoette
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Luth
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C. Grant
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Traning Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Bloomer
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perri Pryor
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McGuire
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Morgan
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Hocher
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Wesolich
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis R. Wojehowski
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Land
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Smith, Sr.
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union Nos. 42-53-110, Laborers Internationnal Unionof North America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.L.L. Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?