Williamson v. Steele et al
Plaintiff: Lamont Williamson
Defendant: Troy Steele, Unknown Null, Unknown Morris, William McKinney, Unknown Tamry, Jean Unknown, Robin Unknown, Unknown Casey and Unknown Breniun
Case Number: 4:2012cv01548
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court on plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Plaintiff did not submit a copy of his prison account statement with his motion, and therefore, the Court ordered him to file one no later than May 29, 2017. On May 25, 2017, plaintiff notified the Court that he would not comply with the Order. As a result, the motion is denied. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED. (Doc. 216). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/2/2017. (MRC)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must submit a copy of his prison trust account statement for the six-month period before the filing of the notice of appeal. Response to Court due by 5/29/2017.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/15/2017. (MRC)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Lamont Williamson's Motion for New Trial is DENIED. [Doc. 197]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/16/2016. (MRC)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Lola Ann Brannum, Charles Lawson, and Charles Sullenss motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Lola Ann Brannum is entitled to summary judgm ent as to all claims against her. Defendants Charles Lawson and Charles Sullens are entitled to summary judgment as to claims against them in their official capacities. The motion is denied in all other respects. [Doc. 102] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Corizon, Inc.,William McKinney, and Jean Daugherty's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 106] An appropriate Partial Judgment will accompany this memorandum and order.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/9/2015. (MRC)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's motion for compensation of services is GRANTED in the amount of Two Thousand Seven Hundred Seventy-Nine Dollars and Seventy-Two Cents ($2,779.72). [Doc. 68] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall promptly disburse the sum of Two Thousand Seven Hundred Seventy-Nine Dollars and Seventy-Two Cents ($2,779.72) from the Attorney Admission Fee Non-Appropriated Fund, payable to: Eleanor Devereux Braun Devereux and Murphy101 S. Hanley Rd. Suite 400 Saint Louis, MO 63105. The Court wishes to express its appreciation to appointed counsel for her efforts on behalf of plaintiff.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/7/2014. (MRC)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Missouri Department of Corrections, Troy Steele, and George Lombardis motion to dismiss is GRANTED. [Doc. 45] An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/12/14. (JWJ)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall delete the amended complaint [Doc. 25] from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs appointed counsel shall file an amended complaint on or before May 24, 2013. The amended complaint shall comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, in that the caption of the amended complaint must name all defendants to the civil action, and plaintiffs appointed counsel shall provide the full name and addresses of all defendants so that the Court can issue and serve process pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). Response to Court due by 5/24/2013. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/20/2013. (KSH)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is GRANTED. [Doc. 3] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Eleanor D. Braun of Devereux and Murphy, 190 Carondelet Plaza, Eleventh Floor, St. Louis, MO 63105, telephone number 314-721-1516, is hereby appointed as counsel for the plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide appointed counsel with a copy of the complete Court file. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file an amended complaint within 30 daysof the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 3/13/2013. (NCL)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff is directed to provide the Court with both the first and last names of Jean Unknown and Unknown Casey. Plaintiff must also provide the Court with information where these defendants can be served, such as their home addresses or their currentplaces of employment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to provide the Court with the names and addresses of defendants Jean Unknown and Unknown Casey within the time specif ied, plaintiffs claims against these defendants will be dismissed, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff may proceed in this action without paying any portion of the filing fee. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(4). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/11/2013. (KSM)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED.,[Doc. 2] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.70 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants William McKinney, Jean Unknown (Nurse), and Unknown Casey (Nurse). These are alleged to have worked for Corizon or Correctional Medical Services at Poto si Correctional Center during 2011. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants William McKinney, Jean Unknown, and Casey Unknown shall reply to plaintiffs claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Troy Steele, Unknown Null, Unknown Morris, Unknown T amry, Robin Unknown, Unknown Breniun, or William Milam because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. (Response to Court due by 1/4/2013.) Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/5/2012. (KSM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Steele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Null
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tamry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Breniun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?