Goins v. Dickey et al
Plaintiff: Donahue Goins
Defendant: Derek Dickey, Thomas L. Bromley, Terry Russell and Unknown Roper
Case Number: 4:2012cv01584
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Donahue Goins's Motion to Reopen Case [ECF No. 21 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Donahue Goins's Motion to Appoint Counsel [ECF No. 22 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 06/17/2014. (CBL)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 17 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Donahue Goins motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff Donahoe Goins the Court's form for filing a Complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1983. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on April 16, 2014. (Memordandum and Order and form 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 sent to plaintiff this date.)(MCB)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-styled action is DISMISSED without prejudice; Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on August 22, 2013. (MCB)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 6 ] is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue on the first amended comp laint [Doc. # 5 ] as to plaintiff's claims for monetary relief for Eighth Amendment violations against defendants Derek Dickey and Thomas L. Bromley in their individual capacities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims for injunc tive relief are DISMISSED as moot. See Smith v. Hundley, 190 F.3d 852, 855 (8th Cir. 1999). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment substantive due process claims against defendants Derek Dickey and Thomas L. Bromley are DI SMISSED, without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, defendants Derek Dickey and Thomas L. Bromley sh all file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's claims for monetary relief for Eighth Amendment violations, as set forth in the first amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, as to defendants Terry Russell, Randy Roper, Unknown Luster, Unk nown Kitchell, and John Doe (Inspector General from Jefferson City), the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue, because the amended complaint is legally frivolous and fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Unknown Green and Unknown Morgan are DISMISSED without prejudice, because they are not properly joined in this action under Rule 20(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this case as Donahue Goins v. Derek Dickey, Thomas L. Bromley, Terry Russell, Randy Roper, Unknown Luster, Unknown Kitchell, Unknown Green, Unknown Morgan, and John Doe #1 (Inspector General fro m Jefferson City). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). A separate Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on January 30, 2013. (BRP)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, in accordance with the specific instructions set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shal l mail to plaintiff the Court's form for filing a complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to amend his complaint in accordance with this Court's instructions will result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to him. (Response to Court due by 11/3/2012.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/04/2012. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goins v. Dickey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donahue Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?