Hazlett v. Pine Lawn, City of, et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Hazlett
Defendant: Pine Lawn, City of and Steve Lowman
Case Number: 4:2012cv01715
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Appeal Out of Time (Doc. 63 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Doc. 65 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/29/15. (JWD)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 52 is GRANTED. An appropriate Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 48 , Plainti ff's Request for Subpoenas of Officer Lowmans Disciplinary and Complaint Files from Various Police Departments 55 , and Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 56 are DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Time 59 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss 45 is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/30/14. (JWD)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the trial date of May 5, 2014 is VACATED. The Court will hold a conference with the parties after it rules on the pending motions, regarding setting a new trial date and new deadlines for the parties to file their pretrial motions, if necessary. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/7/14. (JWD)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Request Pro Bono Public Service 42 is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/13/13. (LGK)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint 7 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted ten (10) days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/19/13. (LGK)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Alternative Motion of Plaintiffs Attorneys to Withdraw 15 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. The Court denies Plaintiffs request for a stay of th is action. Plaintiffs counsels Motion to Withdraw is set for hearing on April 19, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in the undersigneds courtroom. At that time, Plaintiffs counsel must provide Plaintiffs position regarding the Motion to Withdraw. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide a copy of this order to Gregory Hazlett, 1538 Somerset Terrace Dr., St. Louis, MO 63136 and Gregory Hazlett, Inmate No. 48575, St. Louis County Justice Center, P.O. Box 16060, Clayton, MO 63105. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/26/2013. COPY OF THIS MEMORANDUM AND ORDER MAILED TO GREGORY HAZLETT. (RAK)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable John A. Ross, United States District Judge for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by (JGW) on 09/25/2012. (DLT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazlett v. Pine Lawn, City of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hazlett
Represented By: Maria V. Perron
Represented By: Martin L. Perron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Lawn, City of
Represented By: Timothy J. Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lowman
Represented By: Timothy J. Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?