TLC Vision (USA) Corporation, et al. v. Freeman et al
Plaintiff: TLC Vision (USA) Corporation and TLC Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Jared Christopher Freeman, Dawn Holsted, Mary Jo'el Sturm, Stephanie Soles, Stephanie Goins and NJoy Vision!, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv01855
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Adair
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Dawn Holsted and Mary Jo'el Sturm's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [ECF Nos. 76 and 78 ] are DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 05/20/2013. (CBL)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - (see Memorandum and Order for further details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dissolve and Amend Temporary Restraining Order [ECF No. 96] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' Motion is granted as to Defendant nJoy, but denied as to Defendants Sturm, Freeman, Goins, and Soles. As to nJoy, the Court dissolves the TRO, with the exception that nJoy and all other persons who are in active concert or participation with it who rece ive actual notice of the Court's Order, be enjoined from divulging, or causing to be divulged, communicating or causing to be communicated, publishing or causing to be published, or otherwise disclosing or causing to be disclosed to any per son, firm, corporation, association, or entity, any confidential information as detailed in the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing will be held in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri, Courtroom 10 South , on Tuesday, May 21, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. The parties will present argument concerning the legal merits of enjoining Defendants Sturm, Freeman, Soles, and Goins for the one-year term of Defendants' contractual post-employment restrictions, commencing from the date of the entry of the TRO in this matter.( Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge E. Richard Webber.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on May 6, 2013. (MCB)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant nJoy Vision!, LLCs Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 26 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on January 22, 2013. (MCB)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 4 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Discovery 5 is granted. Temporary Restraining Order shall not be effective until Plainiffs execute and file with the Court, a bond, in conformity with the law, in the amount o f ten thousand dollars ($10,000). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on preliminary injunctive relief will be held in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri, Courtroom 10 South, on Tuesday, November 13, 2012, at 8:30 a.m. Counsel for all parties affected by possible injunctive relief shall be present. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on November 2, 2012. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on November 2, 2012. (MCB)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [ECF No. 4 ] is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Discovery [ECF No. 5 ] is GRANTED. Temporary Restrai ning Order shall not be effective until Plaintiffs execute and file with the Court, a bond, in conformity with the law, in the amount of ten thousand dollars ($10,000). Preliminary Injunction Hearing will be held in Courtroom 10 South on Tuesday, November 13, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. ( In Court Hearing set for 11/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge E. Richard Webber.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/24/2012. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TLC Vision (USA) Corporation, et al. v. Freeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TLC Vision (USA) Corporation
Represented By: Eric A. Todd
Represented By: Ann Marie Piana
Represented By: Meredith A. Lopez
Represented By: Rodney A. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TLC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Rodney A. Harrison
Represented By: Meredith A. Lopez
Represented By: Ann Marie Piana
Represented By: Eric A. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Christopher Freeman
Represented By: John H. Quinn, III
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Sheena R Hamilton
Represented By: Mark D Folger
Represented By: Robert W Dace
Represented By: William M. Corrigan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Holsted
Represented By: John H. Quinn, III
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Sheena R Hamilton
Represented By: Mark D Folger
Represented By: Robert W Dace
Represented By: William M. Corrigan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jo'el Sturm
Represented By: John H. Quinn, III
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Sheena R Hamilton
Represented By: Mark D Folger
Represented By: Robert W Dace
Represented By: William M. Corrigan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Soles
Represented By: John H. Quinn, III
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Sheena R Hamilton
Represented By: Mark D Folger
Represented By: Robert W Dace
Represented By: William M. Corrigan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Goins
Represented By: John H. Quinn, III
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Sheena R Hamilton
Represented By: Mark D Folger
Represented By: Robert W Dace
Represented By: William M. Corrigan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJoy Vision!, LLC
Represented By: Sheena R Hamilton
Represented By: Mark D Folger
Represented By: Robert W Dace
Represented By: William M. Corrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: John H. Quinn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?