Holmes v. Slay et al
Plaintiff: Michael Holmes
Defendant: Francis G. Slay, Bettye Battle-Turner, Richard Gray, Jerome D. Lee, Thomas Irwin, Bobby Lee Garrett and Shell Sharp
Case Number: 4:2012cv02333
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Adair
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 OPINNION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for New Trial, [Doc. No. 263], is denied. 263 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/11/17. (CLA)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Slay, Battle-Turner, Gray, Lee and Irwin's Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 114 ] is GRANTED.A separate judgment will be entered upon the resolution of the remaining issues herein. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 03/26/2015. (CLK)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Garrett's Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 105 ], is granted in part and denied in part;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Sharp's Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 108 ], is granted in part and denied in part.A separate judgment will be entered upon the resolution of the remaining issues herein. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 03/25/2015. (CLK)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Slay, Battle-Turner, Gray, Lee and Irwin's Motion to Dismiss Counts V, VI and VII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED, and Counts V, VI and VII will be DISMISSED as to these defendants. [Doc. 52] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Sharp's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. [Doc. 58] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Garrett's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. [Doc. 56] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Sharp and Garrett shall file their Answers to the Amended Complaint within the time permitted by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Rule 12(a)(4)(A), Fed. R. Civ. P. An appropriate order of partial dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/7/2013. (NCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Slay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Holmes
Represented By: Richard K. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis G. Slay
Represented By: Christopher R. Hoell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettye Battle-Turner
Represented By: Christopher R. Hoell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gray
Represented By: Christopher R. Hoell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome D. Lee
Represented By: Christopher R. Hoell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Irwin
Represented By: Christopher R. Hoell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lee Garrett
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Sharp
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?