Ghattas v. First National Bank of Layton
Plaintiff: |
Ghattas M. Ghattas |
Defendant: |
First National Bank of Layton and Daniela M Spiridon |
Cross_claimant: |
First National Bank of Layton |
Cross_defendant: |
Daniela M Spiridon |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv02348 |
Filed: |
December 19, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles A. Shaw |
Nature of Suit: |
Fraud or Truth-In-Lending |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
83
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Daniela M. Spiridons motion for an Extension of time to respond to plaintiffs partial motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 79.]IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is STAYED as to de fendant Daniela M. Spiridon only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, counsel for Daniela M. Spiridon shall file with the Court a written status report notifying the Court of Daniela M. Spiridons st atus and her ability to respondto plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment. Counsel for defendant Spiridon shall provide the Court with monthly written status reports until such time as the stay is lifted in this case, or counsel is otherwise ordered. ( Response to Court due by 6/25/2014.). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/27/14. (JWJ)
|
January 21, 2014 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Doc. 43 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that consistent with the terms of this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that complies wit h the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court on or before January 24, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant First National Bank of Laytons motion to file its response to plaintiffs motion for leave to amend out of time is DENIED as moot. Doc. 47 . Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/21/2014. (RAK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?