Von Rohr v. Reliance Bank et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Von Rohr
Defendant: Reliance Bank and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2013cv00232
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 05:75(2) Contract - Reduction in Grade
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion for summary judgment [Doc. # 43 ] is granted. A separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will be entered. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/28/15. (JAB)
December 15, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for entry of final judgment or interlocutory appeal [Doc. #30] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/15/2014. (KMS)
May 20, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the decision of the FDIC that the contract damages plaintiff seeks would constitute a golden parachute payment requiring prior written approval from the FDIC is upheld. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for oral argument [Doc. #21] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/20/2014. (KMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Rohr v. Reliance Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Von Rohr
Represented By: Elkin L. Kistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?