Muhammad v. Steele
Petitioner: Rasheed I. Muhammad
Respondent: Troy Steele
Case Number: 4:2013cv00311
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Rasheed Muhammad's Motion to Amend Judgment (Doc. No. 25 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/15/16. (KXS)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition of Rasheed I. Muhammad for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability shall not be issued in this case. A separate Judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/16/2016. (NEB)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Doc. No. 4.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents motion for additional time to file a responsive brief is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 10.) Respondent shall file his brief on or before May 27, 2013. (Response to Court due by 5/27/2013.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/20/2013. (KSH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rasheed I. Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy Steele
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?