Roberts v. General Motors LLC

Plaintiff: Lauretta Roberts
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv00541
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2016 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Quash Depositions of Matthew Hinnant and Rodney Rucker and for Protective Order is GRANTED. [Doc. 127] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that GM LLC shall not notice any further depositions in this case absent leave of Court.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/20/2016. (MRC)
November 20, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Strike is DENIED. [Doc. 86 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant New GMs Motion for Continuance is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 89 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that by November 27, 2015, plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant New GM may file a new motion for continuance of the trial, if appropriate, after plaintiff files a second amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/20/15. (JWD)
November 10, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that General Motors, LLCs motion to exclude expert testimony of Joseph Burton, M.D. is DENIED. [Doc. 69] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that General Motors, LLCs motion to exclude expert testimony of Larry Sicher is DENIED. [Doc. 70] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to exclude expert testimony of Jeya Padmanaban is GRANTED. [Doc. 66]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/10/2015. (MRC)
October 1, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING JURISDICTION -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by October 8, 2015, plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of all parties to this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff does not timely and fully comply with this Order, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Response to Court due by 10/1/2015.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/1/2015. (MRC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauretta Roberts
Represented By: Kevin M. Carnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?