Lupo v. Hooter's of St. Peters, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Sandra Lupo |
Defendant: |
Hooter's of America, LLC and Hooter's of St. Peters, LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00601 |
Filed: |
March 29, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Charles |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles A. Shaw |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 24, 2013 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff is awarded attorneys fees in the amount of Three Thousand Five Hundred Forty-Two Dollars and Fifty Cents ($3,542.50), and costs of Thirty-Three Dollars and Ninety Cents ($33.9 0), against defendants Hooters of St. Peters, LLC, and Hooters ofAmerica, LLC, jointly and severally. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Hooters of St. Peters, LLC, and Hooters of America, LLC shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, pay the foregoing amountsfor attorneys fees and costs to plaintiffs attorney, Mr. Larry A. Bagsby, and file a Notice with this Court stating they have done so. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/24/2013. (KSH)
|
April 12, 2013 |
Filing
9
ORDER CONCERNING REMOVAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by April 19, 2013, defendants shall file an amended Notice of Removal which shall allege facts establishing the states of citizenship of each of the defendants members, both at the time of filing an d the time of removal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if defendants do not timely and fully comply with this order, this matter will be remanded to the state court from which it was removed, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other proceedings in this case are STAYED pending further order of this Court. ( Response to Court due by 4/19/2013.), Case stayed. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/12/13. (JWJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?