Traditionalist American Knights of the Ku Klux Klan et al v. Desloge, City of, Missouri

Plaintiff: Traditionalist American Knights of the Ku Klux Klan and Frank Ancona
Defendant: Desloge, City of, Missouri
Case Number: 4:2013cv00810
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Nannette A. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2016 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss is GRANTED. [Doc. 110.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs refile this action, Plaintiffs must pay Defendants court costs, less any expenses for work that c an be reused, and that evidence admitted at the preliminary injunction hearing will be admissible to the same extent in any refiled action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by agreement of Plaintiffs, the Court will impose the following conditions: 1. Any refiled action will be filed in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri; 2. Any amendments to the solicitation provisions of the ordinance to bring it in line with Reed v. Town of Gilbert, Arizona, 135 S. Ct. 2218, 192 L. Ed. 2d 236 (2015), will not trigger refilling; and 3. Any facial challenge to the ordinance must be refiled no later than December 19, 2017, at which point this dismissal shall convert into a dismissal with prejudice with respect to a facial challenge. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. 110 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 9/21/16. (CLA)
February 23, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. [Doc. 73.] The motion is GRANTED with respect to Counts I and II of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. The motion is DENIED with r espect to Count III. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts I and II of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint are dismissed as moot. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that a Rule 16 Conferenc e is set on Tuesday, March 8, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned. An order setting forth the Rule 16 will accompany this Memorandum and Order.[Doc. 75.] 73 75 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 2/23/16. (CLA)
August 22, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Continue is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is RESET to Wednesday, September 11, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 North in t he Thomas F. Eagleton Courthouse. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief no later than August 29, 2013. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file its sur-reply no later than September 5, 2013. In Court Hearing set for 9/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/22/13. (CEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traditionalist American Knights of the Ku Klux Klan et al v. Desloge, City of, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traditionalist American Knights of the Ku Klux Klan
Represented By: Grant R. Doty
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ancona
Represented By: Grant R. Doty
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desloge, City of, Missouri
Represented By: Joseph L. Goff, Sr.
Represented By: John G. Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?