Shannon v. Russell

Respondent: Terry Russell
Petitioner: William Shannon
Case Number: 4:2013cv00817
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Shirley P. Mensah
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 10 ORDERED that petitioner's motion for reconsideration [ECF No. 10] is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 11/6/13. (CEL)
June 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 6 , 2 ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to file an amended petition [ECF No. 6] is GRANTED . FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. A separate Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 6/3/13. (CEL)
May 8, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 1 ORDERED that petitioner shall show cause, in writing and no later than thirty days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed as time-barred. FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to comply with this Order, this action will be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 6/8/2013.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 5/8/13. (CEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Russell
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?