Taylor v. Carich

Petitioner: Stanley Taylor
Respondent: Mark Carich
Case Number: 4:2013cv00961
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Terry I. Adelman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) After consideration of the issues and review of the record, the Court hereby sustains, adopts, and incorporates herein the Magistrate's Report and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Stanley Taylor's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF No. 6 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 9/28/2016. (CBL)
December 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Docket No. 19) is DENIED. If the Court later determines that counsel is required, it will issue an appropriate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 12/20/2013. (KMS)
May 31, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Stanley Taylor; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to petitioner a copy of his petition for writ of habeas corpus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner must sign and return the petition to the Court within 30 days of the date of this Order. Response to Court due 7/1/2013; (ORIGINAL COMPLAINT MAILED TO PETITIONER); Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 05/31/2013; (DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Carich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Carich
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?