Rice v. Interfood, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Larry Rice |
Defendant: |
Interfood, Inc., Jason Medcalf, Dirk Neerhoff, Nick Sharp and F.C.G.M. (Frank) van Stipdonk |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv01171 |
Filed: |
June 19, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Franklin |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry E. Autrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 7, 2022 |
Filing
214
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Entry of Default Judgment is granted. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/7/22. (HMA)
|
October 20, 2022 |
Filing
209
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Michael Husmann, President of DF Ingredients, Inc., shall, within 10 days from the date of this Opinion, show cause why default judgement in the amount requested by Defendant s shall not be entered against DF Ingredients, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to show cause will result in a default judgment in the requested amount being entered against DF Ingredients, Inc. (Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2022). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/20/2022. (HMA)
|
June 22, 2017 |
Filing
146
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, [Doc. No. 143 ], is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are awarded $78,496.74 in attorneys fees as damages resulting from the need to file their counterclaim. An Amended Judgment will be entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/22/17. (KJS)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing
102
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER 61 78 ( Response to Court due by 2/6/2015.)IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for SummaryJudgment, [Doc.61], is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 78 ], is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall, within 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order, submit a detailed statement of the rates, times expended and subject matter of their attorneys fees to the Court for review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff shall, within 7 days from the filing of Defendants statement, file any objections he may have. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/23/15. (CLA)
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 8 10 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, [Doc. 8], is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, [Doc. No. 10], is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Counterclaim in this matter remains for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 3/10/14. (CEL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?