Victory Outreach International Corporation v. Twitter, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Victory Outreach International Corporation
Defendant: Twitter, Inc. and Victory Outreach Ministries Church
Case Number: 4:2013cv01501
Filed: August 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Arthur K. Shaffer ADR Completion Deadline due by 6/30/2014. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 7/14/2014. Designation of Neutral due by 4/18/2014. ADR Conference Report Schedule due by 4/18/2014.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 12/10/13. (CEL)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: standard Motion to Join Parties due by 3/24/2014. Discovery Completion due by 6/14/2014. ADR Future Reference 3/28/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2014. Jury Trial set for 1/5/2015 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry E. Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 12/9/13. (CLA)
December 5, 2013 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry E. Autrey: Rule 16 Conference held on 12/5/2013. Conference held in person. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (Court Reporter:none.) (FTR Gold: No.) (CLA)
December 2, 2013 Filing 21 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Victory Outreach International Corporation, Defendant Victory Outreach Ministries Church. and Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Ash, Bryant)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/2/2013. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/5/2013 11:15 AM in Chambers before District Judge Henry E. Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 11/14/13. (CLA)
October 31, 2013 Filing 19 First ANSWER to Complaint by Victory Outreach Ministries Church. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dictionary Definition of Outreach, # 2 Exhibit Internet Search on Victory)(Heller, Annette)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 17 Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Twitter, Inc. ORDERED SO ORDERED HEA, Twitter, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 10/29/2013. (CLK)
October 28, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Victory Outreach International Corporation against Twitter, Inc. (Shaffer, Arthur) Modified on 10/29/2013 (CEL).
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or otherwise plead, by Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Sableman, Mark) filed by Twitter, Inc.; GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 10/9/13. (CLA)
October 7, 2013 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or otherwise plead, by Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Sableman, Mark)
October 7, 2013 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Sableman for Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Sableman, Mark)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: as to Victory Outreach Ministries Church Re: 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Victory Outreach Ministries Church.; ORDERED : EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED, Victory Outreach Ministries Church answer due 10/31/2013.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 9/27/13. (CEL)
September 26, 2013 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Victory Outreach Ministries Church. (Heller, Annette)
September 26, 2013 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Annette P. Heller for Defendant Victory Outreach Ministries Church. (Heller, Annette)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: 9 ; ORDERED : LEAVE For extension of time to answer or respond to 10/10/13 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 9/23/13. (CEL)
September 20, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Victory Outreach International Corporation (Shaffer, Arthur)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Courts consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice. Response to Court due by 10/2/2013.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 9/18/13. (CEL)
September 13, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Victory Outreach International Corporation. Victory Outreach Ministries Church served on 8/21/2013, answer due 9/11/2013. (Ash, Bryant) (edited service to read 8/21 from 8/23 - Modified on 9/16/2013 (CEL).
September 13, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Victory Outreach International Corporation. Twitter, Inc. served on 8/9/2013, answer due 8/30/2013. (Ash, Bryant)
August 14, 2013 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Arthur K. Shaffer for Plaintiff Victory Outreach International Corporation. (Shaffer, Arthur)
August 2, 2013 Filing 4 REPORT to Commissioner of the filing of an action regarding trademark. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (DLT)
August 2, 2013 Case Opening Notification, 2 Summons(es) issued, Disclosure of Corporate Interest to be filed by all corporations.. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. The summonses was emailed to BAsh@theipcenter.com. (DLT)
August 2, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Victory Outreach International Corporation Process Server: D and B Legal Services, Inc. (DLT)
August 2, 2013 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Victory Outreach International Corporation.. (DLT)
August 1, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-3925413, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Victory Outreach International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Original Filing Form, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons Twitter, Inc., # 11 Summons Victory Outreach Ministries Church, (Ash, Bryant) Modified on 8/2/2013 (DLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victory Outreach International Corporation v. Twitter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Outreach International Corporation
Represented By: Bryant Steven Ash
Represented By: Arthur K. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory Outreach Ministries Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?