A.J. et al v. Tanksley et al
Plaintiff: A.J., D.M., B.M. and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson
Defendant: Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner, Perri A. Johnson, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Erwin O. Switzer, Francis G. Slay and Bettye Battle-Turner
Intervenor Plaintiff: Deborah Lee Johnson
Not Classified By Court: Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs
Case Number: 4:2013cv01514
Filed: August 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2016 Filing 189 MANDATE of USCA as to #178 Notice of Appeal filed by D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson, A.J., B.M. - In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 05/16/2016, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. USCA #:15-1536 The judgment of the district court is affirmed (MRC)
May 16, 2016 Filing 188 OPINION from USCA re #178 Notice of Appeal : USCA Appeal #: 15-1536 The judgment of the district court is affirmed. (MRC)
May 13, 2016 Filing 187 NOTIFICATION OF DESIGNATED CLERK'S RECORD regarding #105 Sealed Document, #104 Sealed Document, #86 Sealed Document, #159 Sealed Document, #150 Sealed Document, #6 Sealed Document, #160 Sealed Document, #89 Sealed Document, #28 Sealed Document, #151 Sealed Document, #85 Sealed Document, #102 Sealed Document, #154 Sealed Document, #152 Sealed Document, #161 Sealed Document, #157 Sealed Document, #153 Sealed Document, #103 Sealed Document, #108 Sealed Document, #88 Sealed Document, #156 Sealed Document, #155 Sealed Document, #158 Sealed Document, #29 Sealed Document, #106 Sealed Document, #107 Sealed Document, #84 Sealed Document, #149 Sealed Document, , #87 Sealed Document, #121 Sealed Document, USCA Appeal Number: 15-1536(MFG) Modified on 5/13/2016 to correct docketing event used. NEF regenerated to parties (MFG).
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Docket Text ORDER re: Doc. #185 , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, and Erwin O. Switzer, filed by attorney Philip Sholtz; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on December 14, 2015. (LTR)
December 14, 2015 Filing 185 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Philip Sholtz by Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, Erwin O. Switzer. (Sholtz, Philip)
December 11, 2015 Filing 184 ENTRY of Appearance by Deborah Bell Yates for Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, Erwin O. Switzer. (Yates, Deborah)
April 7, 2015 Filing 183 Bill of Costs #182 Taxed in amount of $ $1,265.45 in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (KXS)
March 16, 2015 Filing 182 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Itemized Transcript Costs)(Schute, Karin)
March 12, 2015 Filing 181 Briefing Schedule from USCA for #178 Notice of Appeal filed by D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson, A.J., B.M. USCA Appeal Number: 15-1536 Method of Appendix due: 14 days from today Notice of Appeal forwarded to panel: No Transcript due: 4/21/2015 Designation of record due: Designation & Statement of Issues-Appellant: 14 days from today; Designation of Record-Appelle: 10 days from service of appellant Briefs due: Appellant Brief with addendum:5/1/2015; Appellee Brief:30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief. Reply Brief:.14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief.(MRC)
March 12, 2015 Filing 180 Initial Notification from USCA for #178 Notice of Appeal filed by D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson, A.J., B.M. USCA Appeal Number: 15-1536 Notice of Appeal forwarded to panel: No(MRC)
March 9, 2015 Filing 179 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #178 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed on 03/04/2015 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(DLT)
March 4, 2015 Filing 178 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #177 Judgment - (Case),, #113 Order,,,, #135 Order,,, #74 Order,, by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0865-4759484.
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 JUDGMENT IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner and against A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson's Motion on all claims asserted in plaintiffs' complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner and against intervenor plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson on all claims asserted in intervenor plaintiff's complaint. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 3/3/15. (KXS)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. #117 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 29 through 38 of Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts is DENIED. [Doc. #133 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson's Motion for Leave to file Exhibits 22 and 31 to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs' Additional Undisputed Material Facts under seal is GRANTED. [Doc. #148 ] An appropriate judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 3/3/15. (KXS)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Order dated February 12, 2014 [Doc. #44 ], and all further amendments to the Case Management Order, if any, are hereby amended to include the following language under Section II - Order Relating to Trial: The attorneys shall, not less than twenty (20) days prior to the date set for trial: Trial Brief: Submit to the Court and opposing counsel a trial brief stating the legal and factual issues and authorities relied on and discussing any anticipated substantive or procedural problems. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/8/15. (KXS)
January 8, 2015 Filing 174 RESPONSE in opposition to #147 Statement of Material Facts and Plaintiffs' Additional Undisputed Material Facts filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin) Modified on 1/9/2015 (KXS).
January 8, 2015 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summay Judgment filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #171 , MOTION to Withdraw Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply Memorandum, filed by defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner; ORDERED GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall remove defendants' reply memorandum, Doc. 170 , from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file a reply memorandum on or before January 8, 2015. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on December 29, 2014. (LTR)
December 29, 2014 Filing 171 MOTION to Withdraw 170 Reply to Response to Motion, and Motion for Extension of Time to File their Reply Brief in Support of Summary Judgment by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
December 23, 2014 Filing 170 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson, Defendants Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin) (DOCUMENT DELETED PER DOCKET TEXT ORDER #172) Modified on 12/30/2014 (KXS).
December 16, 2014 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (KXS)
December 16, 2014 Filing 168 EXHIBIT 16 to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts #147 filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson (EXHIBIT WILL BE MAINTAINED IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE IN CD FORMAT). (KXS)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #166 , Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation, filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson; ORDERED GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall detach and docket Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, which was attached as an exhibit to their motion for leave. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on December 16, 2014. (LTR)
December 16, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiffs Proposed Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment)(Schottel, James)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #163 , Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson; ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson shall file a memorandum in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment on or before December 17, 2014. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on December 15, 2014. (LTR)
December 15, 2014 Filing 164 RESPONSE to Motion re #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Opposition filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. (Reinhold, Brian)
December 14, 2014 Filing 163 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ;Proposed extension date December 17, 2014 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE Service of Sealed Documents and CD: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 161 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 30 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 160 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 29 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 159 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 28 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 158 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 24 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 157 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 15 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 156 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 13 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 155 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 5 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 154 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 153 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 3 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 152 SEALED DOCUMENT re #147 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 151 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 19 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts(Under Protective Order) by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 150 SEALED DOCUMENT re #148 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document -Exhibit 22 and Exhibit 31 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts (Exhibit 31 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts) by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 149 SEALED DOCUMENT re #148 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document -Exhibit 22 and Exhibit 31 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts (Exhibit 22 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts) by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document -Exhibit 22 and Exhibit 31 to Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts in Which a Genuine Issue Exists and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 12, 2014 Filing 147 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment , and Plaintiffs Additional Undisputed Material Facts filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wrongful Death Case Trial Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Yolanda Diggs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Bryant Howard, #4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Bryant Howard in Wrongful Death Case, #5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Defendant Donnell W. Tanksley in Wrongful Death Case, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendant Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit 7 - Affidavit of Plaintiffs Attorney, James W. Schottel, Jr., #8 Exhibit 8 - Collision Scene Photo No. 1, #9 Exhibit 9 - Collision Scene Photo No. 2, #10 Exhibit 10 - Deposition of Defendant Matthew J. Waggoner, #11 Exhibit 11 - St. Louis City Police Department Special Order 9-02 Index, #12 Exhibit 12 - St. Louis City Police Department Special Order 9-02 Section I, #13 Exhibit 13 - Deposition of Defendant Matthew Waggoner in Wrongful Death Case, #14 Exhibit 14 - Defendant Tanksleys Answers to Plaintiffs First Request for Admissions, #15 Exhibit 15 - Deposition of Yolanda Diggs in Wrongful Death Case, #16 Form Notice of Filing Exhibit 16 in CD Form, #17 Exhibit 17 - Defendant Tanksley April 28, 2011 Deposition Photo, #18 Exhibit 18 - Defendant Waggoner Photo, #19 Form Notice of Filing Exhibit 19 Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 20 - Bryant Howard September 24, 2014 Deposition Photo, #21 Exhibit 21 - Yolanda Diggs September 24, 2014 Deposition Photo, #22 Form Notice of Filing Exhibit 22 Under Seal, #23 Exhibit 23 - Weather Underground June 1, 2008 Historical Weather Report, #24 Exhibit 24 - Deposition of Defendant Donnell W. Tanksley, #25 Exhibit 25 - Defendant Waggoners Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #26 Exhibit 26 - Google Map of Natural Bridge, #27 Exhibit 27 - St. Louis City Police Department Special Order 9-02 Section II, #28 Exhibit 28 - Deposition of Defendant Perri A. Johnson, #29 Exhibit 29 - Deposition of Brian Waltman, #30 Exhibit 30 - Deposition of Tracy McKenzie, #31 Form Notice of Filing Exhibit 31 Under Seal, #32 Exhibit 32 - Defendant Tanksleys Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories)(Schottel, James)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #145 , Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson, ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson shall respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment on or before December 12, 2014. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on December 8, 2014. (LTR)
December 8, 2014 Filing 145 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
December 5, 2014 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT of #112 (MOTION HEARING) held on September 9, 2014 before Judge Charles A. Shaw. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patti Dunn Wecke, Patti_Dunn_Wecke@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7984. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2015. (MRC)
December 2, 2014 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re #133 MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 29 through 38 of Defendants Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Defendants Counsels September 25, 2014 Email, #2 Exhibit 3 - November 18, 2014 Motion Hearing Transcript)(Schottel, James)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #141 , Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson, ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson shall respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment on or before December 8, 2014. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on December 2, 2014. (LTR)
December 2, 2014 Filing 141 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
November 26, 2014 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT of #73 (MOTION HEARING) held on July 17, 2014 before Judge Charles A. Shaw. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan Moran, Susan_Moran@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7983. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2015. (MRC)
November 25, 2014 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 29 through 38 of Defendants Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures)(Schute, Karin)
November 24, 2014 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT of #132 (MOTION HEARING) held on November 18, 2014 before Judge Shaw. Court Reporter/Transcriber Angela Daley, Angela_Daley@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7978. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2015. (KXS)
November 19, 2014 ***REMARK - Transcript Order Request(s) Doc. Nos. #134 , #136 , and #137 forwarded via email to Court Reporters (MRC)
November 18, 2014 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for #73 (MOTION HEARING) by A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson for proceedings held on 7/17/2014 court reporter Sue Moran before Judge Charles A. Shaw.. (Schottel, James)
November 18, 2014 Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for #132 (MOTION HEARING) by A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson for proceedings held on 11/18/2014 court reporter Angie Daley before Judge Charles A. Shaw.. (Schottel, James)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs A.J., B.M., DM., and the Estate of Robert Jason Johnson's and intervenor plaintiff Deborah Johnson's motion for leave to take deposition of Meghan K. Wherley, now known as Meghan K. Hall, and to issue a subpoena duces tecum on the St. Louis Police Department is DENIED. [Doc. 120] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before December 2, 2014, plaintiffs A.J., B.M., DM., and the Estate of Robert Jason Johnson and intervenor plaintiff Deborah Johnson shall respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants shall file a reply memorandum in support of their motion for summary judgment on or before December 12, 2014.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/18/2014. (MRC)
November 18, 2014 Filing 134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST for #112 (MOTION HEARING) by A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson for proceedings held on 9/9/2014 court reporter Patti Dunn Wecke before Judge Charles A. Shaw.. (Schottel, James)
November 18, 2014 Filing 133 MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 29 through 38 of Defendants Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Rule 26 Initial Disclosures)(Schottel, James)
November 18, 2014 Filing 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Charles A. Shaw: Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2014 Parties present for hearing on Plaintiffs' and Intervenor Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department. [Doc. 120] Motion heard and argued. Court denies Motion For Leave To Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Whereley. Court denies Motion To Issue A Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:Angie Daley.) (FTR Gold: No.) (MRC)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #130 , Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson; ORDERED GRANTED. The Court shall determine the date to respond at the hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum, which is set for November 18, 2014. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on November 12, 2014. (LTR)
November 10, 2014 Filing 130 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
November 6, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE Hearing(for November 18, 2014 at 1:00 pm) on Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson re #120 MOTION for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department (Schottel, James) [Docket text expanded. Modified on 11/7/2014 (MRC).]
November 3, 2014 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs Rule 26 Initial Disclosures)(Schottel, James)
October 27, 2014 Filing 127 RESPONSE to Motion re #120 MOTION for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL NUNC PRO TUNC -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that all claims of plaintiffs against defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Erwin O. Switzer, Francis G. Slay, and the Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED,ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that to the extent plaintiffs are attempting in Counts I and II of their Complaint to state a claim under 42 USC 1983 against defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner based on allegations that these defendants gave false testimony, these claims are DISMISSED.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/20/2014. (MRC)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL -..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED,ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that to the extent intervenor plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson is attempting in Counts I and II of her Intervenor Complaint to state a claim under 42 USC 1983 against defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner based on allegations that these defendants gave false testimony, these claims are DISMISSED.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/20/2014. (MRC)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that consistent with the terms of this Memorandum and Order, defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The motion is GRANTED to the extent intervenor plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson is attempting to state a claim under 42 USC 1983 based on allegations that these defendants gave false testimony. [Doc. 63] An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/20/2014. (MRC)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #119 Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal; filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 20, 2014. (LTR)
October 17, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE Service of Exhibit 2 (Doc. #121) to Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson re #121 Sealed Document, (Schottel, James)
October 17, 2014 Filing 121 SEALED DOCUMENT re #120 MOTION for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department - Exhibit 2 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
October 17, 2014 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum on the St. Louis City Police Department by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Counsels October 9, 2014 Email, #2 Form Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Brian Waltman, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants Rule 26 Initial Disclosures)(Schottel, James)
October 17, 2014 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document -Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Witness Meghan K. Wherley n/k/a Meghan K. Hall and to Issue a Subpoena Duces Tecum by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
October 15, 2014 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #117 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A-Deposition-Donnell Tanksley, #3 Exhibit B-Uniform Accident Report, #4 Exhibit C-Deposition Perri Johnson, #5 Exhibit D-Deposition Matthew Waggoner, #6 Exhibit E-Deposition Brian Waltman, #7 Exhibit F-Deposition Bryant Howard, #8 Exhibit G-Deposition Yolanda Diggs)(Schute, Karin)
October 15, 2014 Filing 117 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Docket Text ORDER re: Doc. #115 , Joint motion for leave to take deposition after discovery deadline, and for extension of the dispositive motion deadline; ORDERED GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs counsel may take the deposition of the police officer on October 6, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motion to dismiss, motion for judgment on the pleadings, or motion for summary judgment shall be filed with the Clerk by October 15, 2014. The memorandum in opposition shall be filed with the Clerk by November 17, 2014 (or within 30 days of the filing of the dispositive motion, whichever date is earlier). The reply brief, if any, shall be filed with the Clerk by November 28, 2014 (or within 10 days of the filing of the opposition, whichever date is earlier). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on September 29, 2014. (LTR)
September 26, 2014 Filing 115 Joint MOTION for Leave to Take Deposition and Extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PROTECTIVE ORDER - {see Order for complete details}. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/9/2014. (MRC)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner's motion for a protective order is GRANTED.[Doc. 75] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs A.J., B.M., DM., and the Estate of Robert Jason Johnson's motion for costs and attorney's fees against Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner is DENIED as moot.[Doc. 79] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs A.J., B.M., DM., and the Estate of Robert Jason Johnson's motion for contempt and for sanctions against nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs, and their attorney John A. Mazzei and the law firm Brinker&Doyen, L.L.P isDENIED.[Doc. 82] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs A.J., B.M., DM., and the Estate of Robert Jason Johnson's motion to supplement response in opposition to defendants' motion for protective order is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 96]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/9/2014. (MRC)
September 9, 2014 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Charles A. Shaw: Motion Hearing held on 9/9/2014. Parties present for hearing on defendants' "Motion For Protective Order" Doc. #75 . Motion heard and argued. Court grants defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Counsel for plaintiff advises the Court that plaintiffs' "Motion For Costs and Attorney's Fees" Doc. #79 is moot. Plaintiffs' " Motion for Contempt and For Sanctions Against NonParties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or Their Attorney, John A. Mazzei and Brinker&Doyen: Doc. #82 heard and argued. Court denies plaintiffs' "Motion For Contempt and For Sanctions". Written order to issue. (Court Reporter:Patti Dunn Wecke.) (FTR Gold: No.) (MRC)
September 5, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE by Interpleader Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson Service of Objections and Responses to Defendants' Discovery Requests (Reinhold, Brian) [Attorney filing error. Discovery not filed. Attorney advised of EDMO Local Rule 3.02 Filing of Discovery and Disclosure Materials Modified on 9/8/2014 (MRC).]
September 5, 2014 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM Rule 26 Disclosures by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. (Reinhold, Brian) [Attorney filing error. Discovery not filed. Attorney advised of EDMO Local Rule 3.02 Filing of Discovery and Disclosure Materials. Modified on 9/8/2014 (MRC).]
September 1, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE Service: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson re #105 Sealed Document, #104 Sealed Document, #102 Sealed Document, #103 Sealed Document, #108 Sealed Document, #106 Sealed Document, #107 Sealed Document (Schottel, James)
September 1, 2014 Filing 108 SEALED DOCUMENT re #101 Reply to Response to Motion,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 21 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
September 1, 2014 Filing 107 SEALED DOCUMENT re #101 Reply to Response to Motion,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 20 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
September 1, 2014 Filing 106 SEALED DOCUMENT re #101 Reply to Response to Motion,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 19 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
September 1, 2014 Filing 105 SEALED DOCUMENT re #101 Reply to Response to Motion,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 18 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
September 1, 2014 Filing 104 SEALED DOCUMENT re #101 Reply to Response to Motion,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 17 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
September 1, 2014 Filing 103 SEALED DOCUMENT re #101 Reply to Response to Motion,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 16 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
September 1, 2014 Filing 102 SEALED DOCUMENT re #101 Reply to Response to Motion,,, - Unredacted Exhibit 14 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
September 1, 2014 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 - Scott C. Harper October 22, 2009 Letter, #2 Exhibit 15 - State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Companys Certificate of Coverage for Bryant Howard, #3 Exhibit 16 - James W. Schottel, Jr. March 30, 2011 Letter, #4 Exhibit 17 - Wrongful Death Case Docket Sheets, #5 Exhibit 18 - Nathan A. Steimel March 4, 2010 Letter, #6 Exhibit 19 - Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Bryant Howard and Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Yolanda Diggs, #7 Exhibit 20 - James W. Schottel, Jr. December 17, 2010 Letter, #8 Exhibit 21 - Second Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Yolanda Diggs)(Schottel, James)
August 28, 2014 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Motion re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. filed by witnesses Yolanda Diggs and Bryant Howard. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Harper, Scott) Modified on 8/28/2014 (KXS).
August 27, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE Hearing: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P., #79 MOTION for Costs and Attorney's Fees (Schottel, James)
August 27, 2014 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Costs and Attorney's Fees re #79 MOTION for Costs and Attorney's Fees filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (MRC)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #95 , MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Costs and Attorney's Fees Out of Time, filed by defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner; ORDERED GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall detach and docket defendants response memorandum, which was submitted as an attachment to the Motion for Leave. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on August 27, 2014. (LTR)
August 27, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION to Supplement #76 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Donnell W. Tanksley)(Schottel, James)
August 26, 2014 Filing 95 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Their Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Costs and Attorney's Fees by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Costs and Attorney's Fees Against Defendants)(Schute, Karin)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #92 , Motion to Supplement Motion for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties and Their Attorney; filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on August 26, 2014. (LTR)
August 25, 2014 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. (Reinhold, Brian)
August 25, 2014 Filing 92 MOTION to Supplement #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 - Email and Invoice from Midwest Legal Video Services, LLC)(Schottel, James)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #81 , Consent Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Deborah Johnson After The Close of Discovery, filed by defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoner; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on August 25, 2014. (LTR)
August 24, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE Service of Sealed Documents: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson re #86 Sealed Document, #89 Sealed Document, #85 Sealed Document, #88 Sealed Document, #84 Sealed Document, #87 Sealed Document, (Schottel, James)
August 24, 2014 Filing 89 SEALED DOCUMENT re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. - Unredacted Exhibit 8 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 24, 2014 Filing 88 SEALED DOCUMENT re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. - Unredacted Exhibit 7 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 24, 2014 Filing 87 SEALED DOCUMENT re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. - Unredacted Exhibit 6 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 24, 2014 Filing 86 SEALED DOCUMENT re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. - Unredacted Exhibit 5 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 24, 2014 Filing 85 SEALED DOCUMENT re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. - Unredacted Exhibit 2 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 24, 2014 Filing 84 SEALED DOCUMENT re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. - Unredacted Exhibit 1 by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 24, 2014 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 24, 2014 Filing 82 MOTION for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Nonparties Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs and/or their attorney John A. Mazzie and/or Brinker & Doyen, L.L.P. by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action for Bryant Howard, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action for Yolanda Diggs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to Take Deposition of Bryant Howard, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice to Take Deposition of Yolanda Diggs, #5 Exhibit 5 - Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Bryant Howard, #6 Exhibit 6 - Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Yolanda Diggs, #7 Exhibit 7 - August 22, 2014 9:48 a.m. John A. Mazzei email, #8 Exhibit 8 - August 22, 2014 Three Consecutive John A. Mazzei emails, #9 Exhibit 9 - August 22, 2014 Bryant Howard Deposition Record of Nonappearance, #10 Exhibit 10 - August 22, 2014 Yolanda Diggs Deposition Record of Nonappearance, #11 Exhibit 11 - Invoice for Bryant Howard Deposition Record of Nonappearance, #12 Exhibit 12 - Invoice for Yolanda Diggs Deposition Record of Nonappearance)(Schottel, James)
August 22, 2014 Filing 81 Consent MOTION for Leave to Take Deposition After The Close of Discovery by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
August 14, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE Hearing: by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner re #75 MOTION for Protective Order and Suggestions in Support (Schute, Karin)
August 13, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION for Costs and Attorney's Fees by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proofs of Service of Subpoenas for Brant Howard and Yolanda Diggs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs August 11, 2014 Letter)(Schottel, James)
August 12, 2014 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION for Protective Order and Suggestions in Support filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
August 5, 2014 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #75 MOTION for Protective Order and Suggestions in Support filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. (Reinhold, Brian)
August 5, 2014 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION for Protective Order and Suggestions in Support filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Answers to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Internet Pages of the St. Louis Police Department Website, #3 Exhibit 3 - St. Louis Police Departments Facebook Page, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs Amended Notices of Depositions of Bryant Howard and Yolanda Diggs)(Schottel, James)
August 4, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION for Protective Order and Suggestions in Support by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Protective Order)(Schute, Karin)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. [Doc. 54] The motion is granted to the extent that defendants shall respond to Interrogatory No. 16 and Requests for Production Nos. 6 and 7 after the Court has issued a ruling on defendants' motion for summary judgment, which defendants anticipate filing prior to the October 3, 2014 deadline. The motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 7/17/2014. (NCL)
July 17, 2014 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Charles A. Shaw: Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2014 The Court rules on the plaintiff motions after brief argument. Order to issue. re #54 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson, A.J., B.M.. (Court Reporter:Sue Moran.) (FTR Gold: No.) (JWJ)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #71 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #66 Order Referring Case to ADR by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson; ORDERED GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order issued July 2, 2014 referring the case to ADR is vacated. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on July 17, 2014. (MBP)
July 11, 2014 Filing 71 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #66 Order Referring Case to ADR, by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
July 9, 2014 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss :Intervenor's Complaint Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Intervenor's Complaint filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
July 3, 2014 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Dismiss :Intervenor's Complaint filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. (Reinhold, Brian)
July 2, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE Amended Certificate of Service: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson re #67 Reply to Response to Motion (Schottel, James)
July 2, 2014 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Mr. James W. Schottel, Jr. ADR Completion Deadline due by 9/2/2014. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 9/16/2014. Designation of Neutral due by 7/12/2014. ADR Conference Report Schedule due by 7/12/2014. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 7/2/2014. (NCL)
June 25, 2014 Filing 65 ANSWER TO INTERVENORS COMPLAINT by DEFENDANTS TANKSLEY, WAGGONER, AND JOHNSONS re #60 Intervenor's Complaint (Schute, Karin) Modified on 6/25/2014 to change the document title (JWJ).
June 25, 2014 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss :Intervenor's Complaint filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
June 25, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss :Intervenor's Complaint by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
June 25, 2014 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Against Defendants Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner and Perri A. Johnson, is rescheduled for 1:00 p.m. on Thursday, July 17, 2014. This is a time change only. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/20/14. (KXS)
June 13, 2014 Filing 60 Intervenor's Complaint by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. Amendment to 57 Order on Motion to Intervene,,, Deborah Johnson. (Reinhold, Brian) Modified on 6/13/2014 changed document title (JWJ).
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including June 25, 2014 to respond to plaintiffs' motion to compel. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on June 13, 2014. (MBP)
June 12, 2014 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Docket Text ORDER re: Doc. #53 , Third MOTION to Intervene, filed by intervenor plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unopposed Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. The Court will not direct the Clerk to docket the proposed Intervenor Complaint attached to intervenor plaintiffs motion, however, because it is entitled [Proposed] Intervenor Complaint. Documents that require leave of Court for filing should not be entitled Proposed, as the Clerk is unable to change the title in a PDF document. Intervenor plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson shall promptly file her Intervenor Complaint without Proposed in the title. The Intervenor Complaint shall also contain an appropriate Certificate of Service. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on June 10, 2014. (LTR)
June 9, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson re #54 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Schottel, James)
June 6, 2014 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #54 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
June 6, 2014 Filing 54 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant Tanksley's Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant Waggoner's Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendant Johnson's Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendant Tanksley's Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Production, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendant Waggoner's Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Production, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendant Johnson's Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Production, #7 Exhibit 7 - Defendant Tanksley's Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Admission)(Schottel, James)
May 28, 2014 Filing 53 Third MOTION to Intervene Deborah Johnson by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Intervernor's Complaint)(Reinhold, Brian)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Deborah Lee Johnson's second motion to intervene as a party plaintiff is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 51] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before May 28, 2014, Deborah Lee Johnson shall file a third motion to intervene, attached to which shall be a proposed intervenor complaint that complies with the terms of this Order. (Response to Court due by 5/28/2014.) Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/21/2014. (NCL)
May 21, 2014 Filing 51 Second MOTION to Intervene Deborah Johnson by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Intervener's Proposed Petition)(Reinhold, Brian)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Deborah Lee Johnson's motion to intervene as a party plaintiff is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 45] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/12/2014. (NCL)
May 8, 2014 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner.(Schute, Karin)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that all claims of plaintiffs against defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Erwin O. Switzer, Francis G. Slay, and the Board of Police commissioners of the City of St. Louis are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/24/2014. (NCL) Modified docket text on 4/25/2014 (NCL).
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Erwin O. Switzer, Mayor Francis G. Slay, and the Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. [Doc. 23] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that consist with the terms of this Memorandum and Order, defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, and Matthew J. Waggoners motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED to the extent plaintiffs are attempting to state a claim under 42 U.S.C. 1983 based on allegations that these defendants gave false testimony. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. [Doc. 33] An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 4/24/2014. (NCL)
April 2, 2014 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION to Intervene as Party Plaintiff filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
April 1, 2014 Filing 45 MOTION to Intervene as Party Plaintiff by Intervenor Plaintiff Deborah Lee Johnson. (Reinhold, Brian)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Standard Motion to Join Parties due by 4/25/2014. Discovery Completion due by 9/5/2014. ADR Future Reference 6/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2014. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2015 09:00 AM before District Judge Charles A. Shaw. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Charles A. Shaw. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/10/2015.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/12/14. (JWJ)
November 25, 2013 Filing 43 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson, Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Perri A. Johnson, Francis G. Slay, Erwin O. Switzer, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. . (Schottel, James)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/10/2013. Upon review of the joint proposed scheduling plan described, the Court will consider whether a Scheduling Conference is necessary or advisable prior to the issuance of a Case Management Order. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/19/2013. (NCL) Modified docket text on 11/19/2013 (NCL).
November 6, 2013 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
October 29, 2013 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, Erwin O. Switzer. (Sholtz, Philip)
October 28, 2013 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #33 MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson, A.J., and B.M.; ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including November 1, 2013 to file their response to defendants Perri Johnson, Donnell Tanksley, and Matthew Waggoner's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 25, 2013. (MBP)
October 25, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Docket Text ORDER re: Doc. #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed by defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, and Erwin O. Switzer; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendants shall file their reply memorandum on or before October 29, 2013. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 23, 2013. (LTR)
October 22, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, Erwin O. Switzer. (Sholtz, Philip)
October 18, 2013 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
October 18, 2013 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #27 Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal; filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 15, 2013. (LTR)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #25 , Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 15, 2013. (LTR)
October 12, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Certificate of Service (Schottel, James)
October 12, 2013 Filing 29 SEALED DOCUMENT re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document , unredacted Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
October 12, 2013 Filing 28 SEALED DOCUMENT re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document ,unredacted Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
October 12, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
October 12, 2013 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant Donnell W. Tanksley April 28, 2011 Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant Matthew J. Waggoner June 28, 2011 Deposition)(Schottel, James)
October 11, 2013 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
October 4, 2013 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, Erwin O. Switzer. (Sholtz, Philip)
October 4, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, Erwin O. Switzer. (Sholtz, Philip)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendants Tanksley, Waggoner, and Johnson shall have until October 18, 2013 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 4, 2013. (MBP)
October 3, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Responsive Pleadings ;Proposed extension date October 18, 2013 by Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
October 3, 2013 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Karin A. Schute for Defendants Perri A. Johnson, Donnell W. Tanksley, Matthew J. Waggoner. (Schute, Karin)
October 2, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE Certificate of Service: by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson re 17 Order on Motion to Seal Document,,, (Schottel, James)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HERE BY ORDERED that the motion for appointment of next friend for plaintiff A.J. is GRANTED. Ms. Lori Dixon is appointed as next friend for A.J. Doc. #2 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for appointment of next friend for plaintiff D.M. is GRANTED. Ms. Shannon Mers is appointed as next friend for D.M. Doc. #3 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for appointment of next friend for plaintiff B.M. is GRANTED. Ms. Shannon Mers is appointed as next friend for B.M. Doc. #4 . Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/2/2013. (RAK)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #5 , Motion to for Leave to File Document #6 Under Seal, filed by plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., and The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson; ORDERED GRANTED. The Court notes, however, that the sealed document filed by plaintiffs lacks an adequate certificate of service. Section VI.B. of the Courts CM/ECF Administrative Procedures states, The attorney filing the sealed motion or sealed document will have to serve opposing counsel by other means as service will not occur via the CM/ECF System. Plaintiffs are HEREBY ORDERED to file a certificate of service stating that Document #6 has been served by means other than CM/ECF, and to include such a certificate of service on all sealed motions or documents filed in the future. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 2, 2013.(LTR)
September 27, 2013 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip Sholtz for Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, Erwin O. Switzer. (Sholtz, Philip)
September 18, 2013 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
September 18, 2013 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Bettye Battle-Turner waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
September 18, 2013 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Francis G. Slay waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
September 18, 2013 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Erwin O. Switzer waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
September 18, 2013 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Thomas Irwin waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
September 18, 2013 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Richard Gray waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
September 18, 2013 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Perri A. Johnson waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
September 18, 2013 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Matthew J. Waggoner waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
September 18, 2013 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson Donnell W. Tanksley waiver signed on 8/5/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Schottel, James)
August 5, 2013 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT re #5 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' unredacted Complaint by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 5, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document by Plaintiffs A.J., B.M., D.M., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Schottel, James)
August 5, 2013 ***REMARK - Left message with attorney re: filing an unredacted copy of complaint and waiver of service for defendant Board of Police Commissioners. (BAK)
August 5, 2013 Case Opening Notification - Waivers issued: 8, Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Charles A. Shaw. (BAK)
August 3, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to B.M. ; relationship to minor:Mother by Movant Shannon Mers. (Schottel, James)
August 3, 2013 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to D.M. ; relationship to minor:Mother by Movant Shannon Mers. (Schottel, James)
August 3, 2013 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to A.J. ; relationship to minor:Mother by Movant Lori Dixon. (Schottel, James)
August 3, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-3927108, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by B.M., D.M., A.J., The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Police Accident Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - UNUM Life Insurance Company of America December 3, 2009 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - AJ, et al. vs. Bryant Howard St. Louis City Court Judgment, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Waiver of Service Defendant Donnell W. Tanksley, #7 Waiver of Service Defendant Matthew J. Waggoner, #8 Waiver of Service Defendant Perri A. Johnson, #9 Waiver of Service Defendant Richard Gray, #10 Waiver of Service Defendant Thomas Irwin, #11 Waiver of Service Defendant Erwin O. Switzer, #12 Waiver of Service Defendant Mayor Francis G. Slay, #13 Waiver of Service Defendant Bettye Battle-Turner)(Schottel, James) Modified on 8/5/2013 (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.J. et al v. Tanksley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.J.
Represented By: James W. Schottel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.
Represented By: James W. Schottel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.
Represented By: James W. Schottel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Robert Jason Johnson
Represented By: James W. Schottel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Deborah Lee Johnson
Represented By: Brian F. Reinhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnell W. Tanksley
Represented By: Karin Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Waggoner
Represented By: Karin Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perri A. Johnson
Represented By: Karin Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Police Commissioners of the City of St. Louis
Represented By: Deborah Bell Yates
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gray
Represented By: Deborah Bell Yates
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Irwin
Represented By: Deborah Bell Yates
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erwin O. Switzer
Represented By: Deborah Bell Yates
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis G. Slay
Represented By: Deborah Bell Yates
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettye Battle-Turner
Represented By: Deborah Bell Yates
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bryant Howard
Represented By: John A. Mazzei
Represented By: Scott C. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Yolanda Diggs
Represented By: John A. Mazzei
Represented By: Scott C. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?